Steven Gavic, et al v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-56583

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:18 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LBS) Appellants’ unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of the case under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) is granted. The appeal is dismissed with prejudice. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [9291445] (SM) [Entered: 10/27/2014 02:08 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellants Joyce Miller and Kristina K. Newman Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/24/2014. [9289066] (SAM) [Entered: 10/24/2014 09:48 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The Court is in receipt of appellants’ motion to dismiss the appeal without prejudice. Appellants are informed that dismissal without prejudice is limited to instances where dismissal would be without prejudice to reinstatement upon the occurrence of a specific condition or event. See General Orders, Appendix A(45). Within 14 days after the date of this order, appellants shall either move for dismissal with prejudice or file a motion to dismiss that proposes the conditions under which reinstatement would occur. The briefing schedule is unchanged. [9288640] (SM) [Entered: 10/23/2014 04:48 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Appellants Joyce Miller and Kristina K. Newman Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/15/2014. [9277874] (SAM) [Entered: 10/15/2014 02:51 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
          Received copy of first amended notice of appeal from district court. [9272364] (RL) [Entered: 10/09/2014 05:31 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/08/2014. [9270731] (AEK) [Entered: 10/08/2014 03:41 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellants Joyce Miller and Kristina K. Newman Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/08/2014. [9270714] (SAM) [Entered: 10/08/2014 03:35 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of BENJAMIN G. SHATZ for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Date of service: 10/03/2014. [9265787] (BGS) [Entered: 10/03/2014 04:49 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/08/2014. Transcript ordered by 10/30/2014. Transcript due 01/28/2015. Appellants Joyce Miller and Kristina K. Newman opening brief due 03/09/2015. Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan answering brief due 04/08/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9261091] (BG) [Entered: 10/01/2014 10:38 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 92 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?