Steven Gavic, et al v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-56532

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:51 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory F. Coleman for Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan. Date of service: 10/16/2014. [9278811] (GFC) [Entered: 10/16/2014 10:48 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
    Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LJ) Appellant’s motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Pursuant to agreement, the parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [9278577] (OC) [Entered: 10/16/2014 09:33 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellant Patrick S. Sweeney Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/14/2014. [9275757] (JDP) [Entered: 10/14/2014 01:16 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/08/2014. [9270728] (AEK) [Entered: 10/08/2014 03:40 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
          Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 10/2/14. [9264458] (CW) [Entered: 10/03/2014 10:13 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of BENJAMIN G. SHATZ for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Date of service: 10/02/2014. [9262865] (BGS) [Entered: 10/02/2014 10:52 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Patrick S. Sweeney Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/26/2014. [9255180] (JDP) [Entered: 09/26/2014 10:48 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael T. Williams for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Date of service: 09/25/2014. [9254131] (MTW) [Entered: 09/25/2014 02:29 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kenneth E. Stalzer for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Date of service: 09/25/2014. [9254017] (KES) [Entered: 09/25/2014 02:01 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [9253383] (TSP) [Entered: 09/25/2014 09:41 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dawn M. Goulet for Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan. Date of service: 09/18/2014. [9245119] (DMG) [Entered: 09/18/2014 01:03 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amy E. Keller for Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan. Date of service: 09/18/2014. [9245114] (AEK) [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:59 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Edward A. Wallace for Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan. Date of service: 09/18/2014. [9245106] (EAW) [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:55 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed representation notice of Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant. Served on 09/17/2014. [9243753] (BG) [Entered: 09/17/2014 12:51 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Patrick S. Sweeney on 09/16/2014. Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/24/2014. Transcript ordered by 10/16/2014. Transcript due 01/14/2015. Appellant Patrick S. Sweeney opening brief due 02/23/2015. Appellees Shannon Carty, Matthew Downs, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Steven Gavic, Tammie Humphrey and Michelle McGowan answering brief due 03/25/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9243750] (BG) [Entered: 09/17/2014 12:48 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?