Gate Guard Services, L.P., et al v. Thomas Perez, Secretary
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 14-40585

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 11:25 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2710 - Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503102958 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [14-40585] (JRS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503102926 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [14-40585 Reversed and Remanded] Judge: EHJ , Judge: CH , Judge: MAC. Mandate pull date is 08/24/2015 [14-40585] (JRS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502900586 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
      CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 03/02/2015. [14-40585] (GAM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502867030 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
        CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0. XA/Pet Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/17/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Bert Steindorf. [14-40585]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Mr. Bert Steindorf Date of service: 12/11/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Frieden, Romhilt; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone [14-40585] (Nolan Cornelius Knight )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502847724 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
          CROSS APPELLEE 'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 XE/Res Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Reply Brief due on 12/11/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Bert Steindorf. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/01/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. [14-40585]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: CROSS APPELLEE 'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor Date of service: 11/24/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone; 3rd party - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone [14-40585] (Dean Andrew Romhilt )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502797935 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
            CROSS APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Mr. Bert Steindorf. Date of service: 10/08/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Frieden, Romhilt; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone [14-40585] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. XA/Pet Brief deadline satisfied. XE/Res's Brief due on 11/10/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. Paper Copies of Brief due on 10/14/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Bert Steindorf. [14-40585] (Nolan Cornelius Knight )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502758459 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
              RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Mr. Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. Date of service: 09/05/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Frieden, Johnson, Romhilt; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone; 3rd party - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone [14-40585] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/10/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. [14-40585] (Dean Andrew Romhilt )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502758441 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. Date of service: 09/05/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Frieden, Johnson, Romhilt; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone; 3rd party - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone [14-40585] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Brief due on 10/08/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Bert Steindorf.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/10/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. [14-40585] (Dean Andrew Romhilt )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502692732 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                  BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/19/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor. [14-40585] (MRB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502672912 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                    INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process (as to cross appeal docketed 6/16/14) . [7664325-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [14-40585] (RJd)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502668943 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Mr. Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 06/18/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knight, Pipitone [14-40585] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Electronic ROA due on 07/07/2014. [14-40585] (Dean Andrew Romhilt )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502664228 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                        CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [7658409-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor, Appellees Cross-Appellants Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Bert Steindorf in 14-40585. NOA filed by Appellees Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Mr. Bert Steindorf. [7658409-1] [14-40585] (ADB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502660779 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7655853-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 06/26/2014 for Appellant Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor [14-40585] (MAS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502656983 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                            US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas E. Perez, Secretary, Department of Labor [14-40585] (MAS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 76 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?