Target Training Intl, Ltd v. Extended DISC Intl, Ltd
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-20358

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 5:46 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503119092 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
COURT ORDER granting appellant's unopposed motion to transfer appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit filed by Appellant Target Training International, Limited [7958486-2]. Judge: JES, Judge: JLD, Judge: PRO [15-20358] (DMS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503112091 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
    UNOPPOSED MOTION to transfer appeal to Court of Appeals for the Federla Circuit. [15-20358]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellant Target Training International, Limited to transfer appeal to Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Date of service: 07/10/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Sease; Attorney for Appellee: Ajamie; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Ajamie [15-20358] (Edmund J. Sease )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503107066 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
      INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7955519-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 07/22/2015 for Appellant Target Training International, Limited [15-20358] (RSM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503097553 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
        PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Target Training International, Limited [15-20358] (RJd)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 110 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?