Arlene Smith-Scott v. U.S. National Bank Association
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1738

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:09 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405584099 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellant Arlene A. Smith-Scott in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [999640418] [15-1738] Arlene Smith-Scott
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405569578 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Arlene A. Smith-Scott. [15-1738] Arlene Smith-Scott
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
      Mandate issued. Referencing: [28] Judgment Order , [27] court Order. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-01157-JFM.. [15-1738] (JSN)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method:. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-01157-JFM. Entered on Docket Date: 11/05/2015. [999693722] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [15-1738] (JSN)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
          COURT ORDER filed [999693716] granting Motion to dismiss appeal [20]; terminating Motion to dismiss appeal [23]. Copies to all parties.. [15-1738] (JSN)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
            ORDER filed [999655690] suspending briefing; terminating Motion to extend filing time [25]. Copies to all parties.. [15-1738] (JSN)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
              MOTION by Appellees Cohen Financial Services, LLC and U.S. National Bank Association to extend filing time for response brief. Date and method of service: 09/08/2015 ecf. [999655619] [15-1738] Gary Adler
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                RESPONSE/ANSWER by Arlene A. Smith-Scott to Motion to dismiss appeal [20]. Nature of response: in opposition. [15-1738] Arlene Smith-Scott
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                  MOTION by Appellees Cohen Financial Services, LLC and U.S. National Bank Association to dismiss appeal [23]. Date and method of service: 08/26/2015 ecf. [999648018] [15-1738] Gary Adler
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cohen Financial Services, LLC and U.S. National Bank Association to Motion to dismiss appeal [20]. [15-1738] Gary Adler
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE ISSUED to Arlene A. Smith-Scott and Mr. Gary C. Adler for U.S. National Bank Association and Cohen Financial Services, LLC requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [20] Responses due: 09/03/2015.[999645688].. [15-1738] (JSN)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                        MOTION by George W. Liebmann, Chapter 7 Trustee in bankruptcy of Arlene A. Smith-Scott to dismiss appeal [20]. Date and method of service: 08/21/2015 US mail. [999645257] [15-1738] Orbie Shively
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                          Docket correction requested from Arlene A. Smith-Scott for Arlene A. Smith-Scott. Re: [15] Brief, Joint Appendix. Access to Brief has been restricted to case participants... [15-1738] (JSN)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                            ORDER filed [999641338] granting Motion for leave to file brief out of time [14], extending filing time for response brief until 9/16/2015. Copies to all parties.. [15-1738] (JSN)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                              DISTRICT COURT UPDATE: 08/14/2015 104 ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF APPEAL by Arlene A. Smith-Scott re: order granting motion to substitute party. (Smith Scott, Arlene) Modified on 8/14/2015 (sls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/14/2015) [15-1738] (JSN)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Appellant Arlene A. Smith-Scott for a Filing of the Appellant's Brief Out of Time. Date and method of service: 08/13/2015 ecf. [999640417] [15-1738] Arlene Smith-Scott
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gary C. Adler for Cohen Financial Services, LLC and U.S. National Bank Association.[999639464] [15-1738] Gary Adler
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Cohen Financial Services, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999639453] [15-1738] Gary Adler
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee U.S. National Bank Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999639451] [15-1738] Gary Adler
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1738] (MRB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Arlene A. Smith-Scott.[999633409] [15-1738] Arlene Smith-Scott
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Arlene A. Smith-Scott. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999633354] [15-1738] Arlene Smith-Scott
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                              RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Arlene A. Smith-Scott re: filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)), filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1), filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [15-1738] (JSN)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Mr. Gary C. Adler for Appellees U.S. National Bank Association and Cohen Financial Services, LLC re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1), filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Forms due on 07/30/2015 from Gary C. Adler.. [15-1738] (JSN)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                  DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Arlene A. Smith-Scott for Appellant Arlene A. Smith-Scott re: filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)), filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g))., filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) forms due on 07/30/2015. [15-1738] (JSN)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Arlene Smith-Scott. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/11/2015. Response Brief due 09/14/2015 [15-1738] (JSN)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                      DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-01157-JFM. Mailed to: Arlene Smith-Scott. [15-1738] (JSN)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-01157-JFM. Case manager: JeffNeal. [15-1738] (JSN)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?