Anthony W. Perry v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1727

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 11:24 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Perry. Informal Opening Brief due 07/24/2015 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [15-1727] (TF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
    FEE NOTICE issued to Anthony W. Perry - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 07/30/2015 Originating case number: 8:14-cv-02862-TDC. Mailed to: Perry. [15-1727] (TF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
      RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/14/2015 [15-1727] (TF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
        Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:14-cv-02862-TDC. Case manager: TFischer. [15-1727] (TF)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 69 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?