District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Virginia Western District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. v. Penny Bradley
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2334

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2017 at 11:41 AM EDT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bradley, Penny L., Defendant - Appellant
Officially listed as "Penny L. Bradley"

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Dean Domonoske +1 540 442 7706 tom@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shelley & Schulte PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Earl Cupp +1 540 432 9988 +1 540 432 9557 cupp@scs-work.com
No Logo Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by JORDAN, COYNE & SAVITS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Carstens +1 703 246 0900 j.carstens@jocs-law.com
Space Virginia M. Sadler +1 703 246 0900 +1 703 591 3673 v.sadler@jocs-law.com
Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
Case Type Civil Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW
Lower Court Case https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405589799 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mandate issued. Referencing: [28] Judgment Order , [27] Unpublished per curiam Opinion. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW.. [14-2334] (MR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405589795 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER filed [999643002] granting bill of costs [29] in the amount of $86.40. Copies to all parties.. [14-2334] (MR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405584856 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      OBJECTION TO BILL OF COSTS (FRAP 39) by Appellant Penny L. Bradley.[999640764] [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405567901 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BILL OF COSTS by Appellee Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. Date and method of service: 07/31/2015 ecf. [14-2334] Virginia Sadler
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405560932 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 14-2334 opn.u.sub. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW. Entered on Docket Date: 07/28/2015. [999629196] Copies to all parties and the district court. [14-2334] (TW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405560926 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW. Copies to all parties and the district court. [999629194]. [14-2334] (TW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405524215 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE ISSUED RE: Rule 34 pre-argument review. [14-2334] (DD)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Penny L. Bradley. Number of pages: [14]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/16/2015. [999546211] [14-2334] --[Edited 03/16/2015 by MR to correct filing date] (MR)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405378095 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BRIEF by Appellant Penny L. Bradley in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/12/2015. [999544784] [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. Number of pages: [72]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 02/24/2015. [999534399] [14-2334] (MR)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405353386 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      BRIEF by Appellee Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/23/2015. [999533448] [14-2334] Virginia Sadler
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Appendix [17] released to public. [14-2334] (MR)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405316396 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER filed [999516234] sealing. Joint Appendix Volume III. Copies to all parties.. [14-2334] (MR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Penny L. Bradley. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 3. Total number of pages in all volumes: 608. Total number of sealed volumes: 1 (vol. III). Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: [6 of vols. I and II, 4 copies of vol. III]. Entered on Docket Date: 01/23/2015. [999516230] [14-2334] (MR)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Penny L. Bradley. Number of pages: [62]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 01/23/2015. [999516223] [14-2334] (MR)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) by Appellant Penny L. Bradley in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 01/20/2015.. Filed Ex parte: N. [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405311376 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Penny L. Bradley. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/20/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999513820] [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405311353 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        BRIEF by Appellant Penny L. Bradley in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/20/2015. [999513810] [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405310707 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) by Appellant Penny L. Bradley in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 01/20/2015.. Filed Ex parte: N. [14-2334]--[Edited 01/23/2015 by MR] Thomas Domonoske
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405310698 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Penny L. Bradley. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/20/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999513477] [14-2334] --[Edited 01/23/2015 by MR] Thomas Domonoske
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405310679 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Penny L. Bradley. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Volume 3 of the Joint Appendix. [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405310673 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - BRIEF by Appellant Penny L. Bradley in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/20/2015. [999513468] [14-2334]--[Edited 01/23/2015 by MR] Thomas Domonoske
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405263739 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John H. Carstens for Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..[999491731] [14-2334] Virginia Sadler
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405263734 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999491729] [14-2334] Virginia Sadler
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405263719 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Virginia M. Sadler for Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..[999491724] [14-2334] Virginia Sadler
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405262641 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2334] (SLW)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405262007 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/20/2015. Response Brief due 02/23/2015 [14-2334] (MR)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405261864 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Timothy E. Cupp for Penny L. Bradley.[999490824] [14-2334] Timothy Cupp
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405261840 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Penny L. Bradley. [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405261590 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Penny L. Bradley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999490681] [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405261587 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Thomas D. Domonoske for Penny L. Bradley.[999490678] [14-2334] Thomas Domonoske
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW.. [14-2334] (MR)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405257299 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW.. [14-2334] (MR)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW. Case manager: MRadday. [14-2334] (MR)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405257291 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW. Case manager: MRadday. [14-2334] (MR)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?