Del Webb Communities, Inc. v. Roger Carlson
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1385

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 12:40 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405657475 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
(ENTRY RESTRICTED) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Counsel arguing: Michael S. Seekings Answering argument time: 20 minutes Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: W. Jefferson Leath, Jr. Phillip W. Segui [999674694] [15-1385]--[Edited 10/08/2015 by ALC] William Leath
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405657117 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
    (ENTRY RESTRICTED) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated. Counsel arguing: Robert L. Widener Opening argument time: 10 Rebuttal argument time: 10 Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: A. Victor Rawl, Jr. Henry Frampton, IV [999674538] [15-1385]--[Edited 10/08/2015 by ALC] Robert Widener
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
      ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Counsel arguing: Michael S. Seekings Answering argument time: 20 minutes Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: W. Jefferson Leath, Jr. Phillip Segui [999674719] [15-1385]--[Document Replaced 10/08/2015 by ALC] William Leath
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
        ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated. Counsel arguing: Robert L. Widener Opening argument time: 10 Rebuttal argument time: 10 Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: A. Victor Rawl, Jr. Henry Frampton, IV [999674538] [15-1385]--[Document Restriction Removed 11/30/2015 by ALC] Robert Widener
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
          COURT ORDER filed [999674278] denying Motion to lift stay [33]. Copies to all parties. [15-1385] (ALC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
            CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/09/2015. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00 a.m.. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30 a.m.. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [15-1385] (JLE)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
              RESPONSE/ANSWER by Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated to notice requesting response [34]. Nature of response: in opposition. [15-1385] Robert Widener
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE ISSUED to Henry W. Frampton, IV, Alfred V. Rawl, Jr., and Robert L. Widener for PulteGroup, Incorporated and Del Webb Communities, Inc. requesting response to Motion for other relief [33]. Response due: 09/28/2015.[999664220].. [15-1385] (ALC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                  MOTION by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson for Motion by Appellees to Lift Stay. Date and method of service: 09/21/2015 ecf. [999664164] [15-1385] Michael Seekings
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                    CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 12/8/15 - 12/10/15 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 09/14/2015 [15-1385] (JLC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed [999619941] granting Motion to file supplemental appendix [24]. Copies to all parties. [15-1385] (ALC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE/ANSWER by Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated to Motion to file supplemental appendix [24], Motion to file supplemental brief(s) [24]. [15-1385] Robert Widener
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                          BRIEF by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/13/2015. [999619791] [15-1385] Robert Widener
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405476222 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                            (ENTRY RESTRICTED) BRIEF by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/26/2015. [999590310] [15-1385]--[Edited 05/27/2015 by ALC] Alfred Rawl
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE ISSUED to Henry W. Frampton, IV, A. Victor Rawl, Jr., and Robert L. Widener for PulteGroup, Inc. and Del Webb Communities, Inc. requesting response to Motion to file supplemental appendix [24]. Response due: 07/13/2015.[999611921]. [15-1385] (ALC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson to file supplemental appendix. Date and method of service: 06/29/2015 ecf. [999611584] [15-1385]--[Edited 06/30/2015 by ALC to Correct Relief] Michael Seekings
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                  Supplemental FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/30/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999611583] [15-1385] Michael Seekings
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/30/2015. [999611580] [15-1385] Michael Seekings
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael S. Seekings for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[999610619] [15-1385] Michael Seekings
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                        BRIEF by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/26/2015. [15-1385] Alfred Rawl
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                          Docket correction requested from Alfred Victor Rawl, Jr. for PulteGroup, Incorporated and Del Webb Communities, Inc. Re: [16] Brief. Filing Correction due 05/28/2015. [15-1385] (ALC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                            FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc., PulteGroup, Incorporated and Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/26/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999590092] [15-1385] Alfred Rawl
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Phillip W. Segui, Jr. for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[999572245] [15-1385] Phillip Segui
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1385] (LP)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Amanda M. Blundy for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[999570770] [15-1385] Amanda Blundy
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert L. Widener for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[999569339] [15-1385] Robert Widener
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[999569334] [15-1385] Henry Frampton
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated. [15-1385] Alfred Rawl
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant PulteGroup, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999569286] [15-1385] Alfred Rawl
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Del Webb Communities, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999569282] [15-1385]--[Name of Filer Edited 04/21/2015 by ALC] Alfred Rawl
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by A. Victor Rawl, Jr. for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[999569244] [15-1385] Alfred Rawl
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999566312] [15-1385] William Leath
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by W. Jefferson Leath, Jr. for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[999566310] [15-1385] William Leath
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Phillip Segui, Jr. and John Chakeris. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/26/2015. Response Brief due 06/29/2015. [15-1385] (ALC)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB. Mailed to: Phillip Segui, Jr. and John T. Chakeris [15-1385] (ALC)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB. Case manager: ACarlheim. [15-1385] (ALC)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?