Gretchen Alexander v. Pella Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1828

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 2:53 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Nicholas J. Nelson for Pella Corporation.[999648396] [15-1828] Nicholas Nelson
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Aaron D. Van Oort for Pella Corporation.[999643239] [15-1828] Aaron Van Oort
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1828] (LP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
        Returned mail received from counsel Jordan Chaikin for Appellant Gretchen Alexander re [9] transcript order acknowledgement. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? address updated and document resent [999640888] [15-1828]--[Edited 08/14/2015 by DL] (DL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael T. Cole for Pella Corporation.[999635325] [15-1828] Michael Cole
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
            TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Amy Diaz. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 6/29/15 status conference on motion for reconsideration oral argument. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Gretchen Alexander. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00540-DCN, 2:14-mn-00001-DCN. Transcript due from Amy Diaz, Official Court Reporter on 10/13/2015. [15-1828] (BHR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Pella Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999635273] [15-1828] John Mandler
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Gretchen Alexander. [15-1828] Gary Mason
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Gretchen Alexander. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999634871] [15-1828] Gary Mason
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gary E. Mason for Gretchen Alexander.[999634870] [15-1828] Gary Mason
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Daniel K. Bryson for Gretchen Alexander.[999634810] [15-1828] Daniel Bryson
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John Mandler for Pella Corporation.[999634719] [15-1828] John Mandler
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00540-DCN. Mailed to: Shane Anderson, Jordan Chaikin, Scott George, Matthew Lee, John Mandler, Bradley Moore, Kevin Morrow, Mark Winebrenner. [15-1828] (BHR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                            Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00540-DCN. Case manager: BarbaraRowe. [15-1828] (BHR)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 136 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?