Johnnie Smith v. Bank of America
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1573

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 7:17 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 06/11/2015 [15-1573] (CH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
    INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Johnnie and Charnell Smith and Kelly Gring. Informal Opening Brief due 06/22/2015 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [15-1573] (CH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
      FEE NOTICE issued to Charnell Larosa Smith and Johnnie Junior Smith - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 06/29/2015 Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00635-RAJ-TEM. Mailed to: Johnnie and Charnell Smith and Kelly Gring. [15-1573] (CH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
        Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00635-RAJ-TEM. Case manager: CHalupa. [15-1573] (CH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 69 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?