Moran Towing Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-482

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 11:24 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
LETTER, advising the Court of unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellant Moran Towing Corporation, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316569] [14-482]--[Edited 09/11/2014 by JW] [Entered: 09/10/2014 01:42 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMENDED, [65], on behalf of Appellant Moran Towing Corporation, FILED.[1315798] [14-482] [Entered: 09/09/2014 04:30 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
      ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel O. Rose, Esq. for Appellee Avril A. Young, FILED. Service date 08/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1308104] [14-482] [Entered: 08/29/2014 10:20 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney John McElligott, Esq. for Appellant Moran Towing Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1306348] [14-482] [Entered: 08/27/2014 03:01 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [52] filed by Appellee Avril A. Young, FILED. [1306261][60] [14-482] [Entered: 08/27/2014 02:10 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
            REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Moran Towing Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1305814] [14-482] [Entered: 08/27/2014 10:29 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Avril A. Young, FILED. Service date 08/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1296692] [14-482] [Entered: 08/15/2014 03:35 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Avril A. Young, FILED. Service date 08/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1296689] [14-482] [Entered: 08/15/2014 03:34 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 40 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?