Woodard v. Corcoran, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02814-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Calvin Woodard, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo L. Bethea, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
Space David P Kennedy +1 410 576 6424 +1 410 576 6880
No Logo Rick Henry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo Thomas R. Corcoran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
Space David P Kennedy +1 410 576 6424 +1 410 576 6880
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/20/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 4/25/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [20-1] motion of defendant Henry to Dismiss, or in the alternative, [20-2] motion for Summary Judgment; DIRECTING Clerk to amend the docket to substitute the name of Warden Thomas R. Corcoran for that of defendant Goran; granting [25-1] motion of defendants Corcoran and Bethea to Dismiss, or in the alternative, [25-2] motion for Summary Judgment; and ENTERING judgment in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/24/01 ) (c/m & microfilmed 4/25/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/24/01) (c/m: 4/25/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Rule
        Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed To Parties. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendants Thomas R. Corcoran, L. Bethea to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment , and Exhibits #1 and #2. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Further Extend Time to File a Response to the Complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/2/01 for L. Bethea, for Thomas R. Corcoran ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/28/01 ) (c/m 2/28/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              MOTION by Defendants Thomas R. Corcoran, L. Bethea to Further Extend Time to File a Response to the Complaint . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [19-1] motion of DOC defendants to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/26/01 for L. Bethea, for Thomas R. Corcoran ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/4/01 ) (c/m 1/5/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Rule
                  Rule 12/56 letter mailed to parties. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001, Terminated: 4/25/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Rick Henry to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment ; and Exhibits 1-3. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001, Terminated: 1/5/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION by defendants Thomas R. Corcoran and L. Bethea to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER "granting" [12-1] motion of Defendants to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint no later than February 19, 2001. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/27/00 ) (c/m 11/27/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER "granting" [13-1] motion of Defendant Rick Henry to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/19/01 for Rick Henry . ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/27/00 ) (c/m 11/27/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER "denying" [9-1] motion of Plaintiff to Dismiss Criminal Charges; "denying" [10-1] motion of Plaintiff for Injunctive Relief; and "denying" [11-1] motion of Plaintiff to Amend [1-1] Complaint Without Prejudice. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/20/00 ) (c/m 11/21/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Correspondence
                              CORRESPONDENCE by AAG Stephanie Lane-Weber to Staff Attorneys Dated 11/17/00 Accepting Service on Behalf of Defendant Thomas R. Corcoran; but Refusing Service on Behalf of Defendants L. Bethea, Rick Henry. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000, Terminated: 4/25/2001 Response in Opposition
                                RESPONSE by Calvin Woodard Jr. in opposition to [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint by Rick Henry, [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint by Rick Henry (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000, Terminated: 11/27/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                  MOTION (REVISED) by Rick Henry to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000, Terminated: 11/27/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by Rick Henry to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Woodard Jr. to Amend [1-1] Complaint . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Woodard Jr. for Injunctive Relief . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Woodard Jr. to Dismiss . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to L. Bethea 10/24/00 Answer due on 11/13/00 for L. Bethea (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to amend the docket to substitute the name of Thomas R. Corcoran for that of defendant Thomas R. Goran; granting [1-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and DIRECTING defendants to respond to the complaint within 60 days. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/18/00 ) (c/m 10/20/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying [4-1] motion of plaintiff for Injunctive Relief; and denying without prejudice [5-1] motion of plaintiff for Appointment of Legal Counsel ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/18/00 ) (c/m 10/18/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000, Terminated: 10/18/2000 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Woodard Jr. for Appointment of Legal Counsel . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000, Terminated: 10/18/2000 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Woodard Jr. for Injunctive Relief . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Calvin Woodard Jr. , amending [1-1] complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 9/25/00 ) "directing" the Fiscal Administrator at M.C.A.C. to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration within twenty (20) days; and "directing" the Fiscal Administrator shall also file a certificate, as indicated and as therein set forth. (c/m 9/26/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                          MOTION by Calvin Woodard Jr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT filed; (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?