Woodard v. Lawrence, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02815-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Calvin Woodard, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Horace Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karpinski Colaresi and Karp PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Bock Karpinski +1 410 727 5000 +1 410 727 0861 bkcklaw@aol.com
Space Victoria M. Shearer +1 410 727 5000 +1 410 727 0861 vshearer@bkcklaw.com
No Logo Lawrence DiNisio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karpinski Colaresi and Karp PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Bock Karpinski +1 410 727 5000 +1 410 727 0861 bkcklaw@aol.com
Space Victoria M. Shearer +1 410 727 5000 +1 410 727 0861 vshearer@bkcklaw.com
No Logo Rick Henry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/20/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 2/21/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [14-1] motion of defendants Dinisio and Johnson for Summary Judgment; granting [16-1] motion of defendant Henry to Dismiss, or in the alternative, [16-2] motion for Summary Judgment; and ENTERING judgment in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/20/01 ) (c/m & microfilmed 2/22/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUN ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/20/01) (c/m: 2/22/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Rule
        Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed To Parties. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendant Rick Henry to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment , and Exhibits #1, #2 and #3. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 Rule
            Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed To Parties. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendants Lawrence DiNisio, Horace Johnson for Summary Judgment , and Exhibits #1 thru #7. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Response in Opposition
                RESPONSE by Calvin Woodard Jr. in opposition to [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint by Rick Henry, [7-1] motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Horace Johnson, Lawrence DiNisio (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [7-1] motion of defendants Dinisio and Johnson to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint reset Answer deadline to 1/2/01 for Horace Johnson, for Lawrence DiNisio ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/20/00) (c/m 11/22/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion Rick Henry to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/19/01 for Rick Henry ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/20/00) (c/m 11/22/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion of defendant Henry to Extend Time to respond to the complaint, reset Answer deadline to 2/19/00 for Rick Henry ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Young 11/16/00 ) (c/m 11/17/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000, Terminated: 11/17/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        MOTION (Revised) by Rick Henry to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          MOTION by defendant Rick Henry to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000, Terminated: 11/21/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION by Defendants Lawrence DiNisio, Horace Johnson to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying [4-1] motion of plaintiff for Appointment of Legal Counsel ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/18/00 ) (c/m 10/20/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to inform this Court and all counsel of any change of address; granting [1-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and DIRECTING Clerk to mail copies and withhold service. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/18/00) (c/m 10/20/00 bh ) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Woodard Jr. for Appointment of Legal Counsel . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Amended Complaint
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Calvin Woodard Jr. , amending [1-1] complaint (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 9/25/00 ) "directing" the Fiscal Administrator at M.C.A.C. to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration within twenty (20) days; and "directing" the Fiscal Administrator shall also file a certificate, as indicated and as therein set forth. (c/m 9/26/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                        MOTION by Calvin Woodard Jr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT filed; (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?