Bilinski v. The Keith Haring Foundation, I
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-1121

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 6:19 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Judith Cox, Tom Eccles, Julia Gruen, Allen Haring, Kristen Haring, David Stark, The Estate of Keith Haring, The Keith Haring Foundation, Inc., The Keith Haring Studio, LLC and Gilbert Vazquez, FILED. Service date 07/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1552547] [15-1121] [Entered: 07/13/2015 06:53 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
    CORRECTED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, (pp. 704-870), on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1533778] [15-1121]--[Edited 06/16/2015 by JW] [Entered: 06/16/2015 03:35 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
      CORRECTED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, (pp. 569-703), on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1533772] [15-1121]--[Edited 06/16/2015 by JW] [Entered: 06/16/2015 03:33 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
        CORRECTED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 4, (pp. 273-568), on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1533767] [15-1121]--[Edited 06/16/2015 by JW] [Entered: 06/16/2015 03:31 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
          CORRECTED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 4, (pp. 1-272), on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1533764] [15-1121]--[Edited 06/16/2015 by JW] [Entered: 06/16/2015 03:29 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
            CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1533752] [15-1121]--[Edited 06/16/2015 by JW] [Entered: 06/16/2015 03:24 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
              SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1533706] [15-1121] [Entered: 06/16/2015 03:03 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend document [25] filed by Appellant Elizabeth Bilinski, George Lathouras, Lisa Cubisino, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Arthur Canario, Geraldine Biehl, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Tami Sturm, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, Dianne Duncan, Randy Nichols, Inez Strysick, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Khristos Karastathis, Eva Karastathis and Geri Berman, FILED. [1533467][29] [15-1121] [Entered: 06/16/2015 12:08 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                  MOTION, to amend document, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 06/15/2015 by CM/ECF. [1532969] [15-1121] [Entered: 06/15/2015 05:46 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion[23], on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED.[1532921] [15-1121] [Entered: 06/15/2015 04:48 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, brief & appendix, and corrected brief [21], [20], on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED.[1531794] [15-1121] [Entered: 06/12/2015 03:36 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                        NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1500660] [15-1121] [Entered: 05/04/2015 04:09 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                          LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief due date as June 8, 2015, appellee's brief due date as July 13, 2015,TRANSMITTED.[1500137] [15-1121] [Entered: 05/04/2015 11:47 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 04/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1492776] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/23/2015 05:15 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                              FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 04/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1492775] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/23/2015 05:13 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. Service date 04/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1492773] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/23/2015 05:01 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Judith Cox, Tom Eccles, Julia Gruen, Kristen Haring, Allen Haring, David Stark, The Estate of Keith Haring, The Keith Haring Foundation, Inc., The Keith Haring Studio, LLC and Gilbert Vazquez, FILED. Service date 04/20/2015 by CM/ECF. [1489086] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/20/2015 01:59 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                    ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1482948] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/13/2015 10:58 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                      PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, district court receipt # 0208-10798705, FILED.[1482947] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/13/2015 10:58 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                        DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/10/2015, RECEIVED.[1482940] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/13/2015 10:57 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Geri Berman, Geraldine Biehl, Elizabeth Bilinski, Arthur Canario, Beverly Costello, Brendan Costello, Lisa Cubisino, Dianne Duncan, Eva Karastathis, Khristos Karastathis, Maxine Kobley, Stephen Kobley, George Lathouras, Randy Nichols, Jacqueline Petruzzelli, Jesus Ramos, Lucas Schoormans, Inez Strysick and Tami Sturm, FILED. [1482931] [15-1121] [Entered: 04/13/2015 10:54 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?