Franklin v. McHugh
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-4096

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 1:04 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
MOTION ORDER, denying as mooot motion to amend document [52] filed by Appellant Luther Franklin, by ALK, DAL, SLC, FILED. [1631590][91] [14-4096] [Entered: 10/30/2015 10:11 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
    NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1631554] [14-4096] [Entered: 10/30/2015 10:03 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
      OPINION, we therefore grant the Secretary's motion to dismiss, deny as moot Franklin's cross-motion and dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction, by ALK, DAL, SLC, FILED.[1631548] [14-4096] [Entered: 10/30/2015 10:01 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Peter J. Tomao for Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 09/25/2015 by CM/ECF. [1606949] [14-4096] [Entered: 09/25/2015 01:15 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Peter J. Tomao for Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 06/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1535296] [14-4096] [Entered: 06/18/2015 10:52 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Peter J. Tomao for Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 04/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1476942] [14-4096] [Entered: 04/03/2015 03:51 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Peter J. Tomao for Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 03/11/2015 by CM/ECF. [1457859] [14-4096] [Entered: 03/11/2015 11:53 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None
                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Peter J. Tomao for Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 02/08/2015 by CM/ECF. [1433342] [14-4096] [Entered: 02/08/2015 06:30 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None
                  REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 02/08/2015 by CM/ECF. [1433341] [14-4096] [Entered: 02/08/2015 05:02 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                    ARGUMENT/SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1427192] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/30/2015 02:05 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                      ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jolie Apicella, Esq. for Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 01/29/2015 by CM/ECF. [1425495] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/29/2015 09:56 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423904] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/26/2015 03:22 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                          SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423603] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/26/2015 12:00 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                            REPLY TO OPPOSITION , [54] on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 01/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1416342][56] [14-4096]--[Edited 01/20/2015 by EM] [Entered: 01/15/2015 10:38 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                              OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [39], [52] , on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 01/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1416027] [14-4096]--[Edited 01/20/2015 by EM] [Entered: 01/14/2015 05:10 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                REPLY TO OPPOSITION , [51], [39] on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 01/14/2015 by CM/ECF.[1415975][53] [14-4096]--[Edited 01/20/2015 by EM] [Entered: 01/14/2015 04:31 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION, to amend document, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 01/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1414262] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/13/2015 12:10 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                    OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [39], on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 01/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1414231] [14-4096]--[Edited 01/20/2015 by EM] [Entered: 01/13/2015 11:59 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to amend, opposition to motion, [48], [49], on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED.[1413850] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/13/2015 09:40 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                        MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1407272] [14-4096] [Entered: 01/05/2015 02:03 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief & Appendix, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by US mail.[1402652] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/24/2014 10:11 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-183), on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1402109] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/23/2014 03:54 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1402088] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/23/2014 03:48 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1397012] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/17/2014 06:31 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1395374] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/16/2014 03:15 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[1389599] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/10/2014 09:26 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 12/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1384806] [14-4096] [Entered: 12/04/2014 12:23 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John McHugh, FILED. Service date 11/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1375358] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/20/2014 05:23 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE, to Appellee John McHugh, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1372452] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/18/2014 12:44 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                            LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 12/23/2014, appellee's brief due date as 01/27/2015, TRANSMITTED.[1372436] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/18/2014 12:38 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1371522] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/17/2014 03:37 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 11/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1367841] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/12/2014 04:38 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 11/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1367838] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/12/2014 04:37 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. Service date 11/12/2014 by CM/ECF. [1366895] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/12/2014 10:02 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1366804] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/12/2014 09:34 AM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 08/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1360381] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/03/2014 10:47 AM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Luther Franklin, FILED. [1360369] [14-4096] [Entered: 11/03/2014 10:44 AM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?