Baez v. The State of New York
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-3984

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 11:44 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 3400 - STATUTES-State Reapportionment
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York State Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance and State of New York, FILED. Service date 11/06/2014 by US mail. [1364540] [14-3984] [Entered: 11/06/2014 05:24 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sarah Baez, FILED. Service date 11/04/2014 by US mail.[1362540] [14-3984] [Entered: 11/05/2014 09:47 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
      FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Baez, FILED. Service date 11/04/2014 by US mail.[1362539] [14-3984] [Entered: 11/05/2014 09:47 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
        INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1356956] [14-3984] [Entered: 10/29/2014 11:20 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION ORDER, granting motion to be relieved as attorney [9] filed by Appellant Sarah Baez, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED. [1356934][12] [14-3984] [Entered: 10/29/2014 11:12 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION, to be relieved as attorney, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Baez, FILED. Service date 10/28/2014 by email, US mail.[1356704] [14-3984] [Entered: 10/29/2014 09:56 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
              PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Baez, district court receipt # 465401108007, FILED.[1353425] [14-3984] [Entered: 10/24/2014 12:39 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1353418] [14-3984] [Entered: 10/24/2014 12:36 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                  DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/30/2014, RECEIVED.[1353413] [14-3984] [Entered: 10/24/2014 12:34 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 124 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?