Sanders, et al v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02874-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheryl A. Sanders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
No Logo Steven P. Sanders, Plaintiff
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Represented by Gordon Feinblatt LLC

United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo Donna J. Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo Donna M. Douglas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo John Winfield, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo Timothy J. Parsons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo Unknown Employees of Bank of America, N.A., Defendant
No Logo William S. Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/22/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 1/23/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 56 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Correspondence
CORRESPONDENCE by Dennis J. Sysko RE: Entering his Appearance on behalf of Emile Joseph Henault, Jr. for the Limited Purpose of the Sanctions Hearing. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 55 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER DIRECTING Mr. Henault pay to the Bank of America the sum of $3,500 within 30 days of the date of this order as the appropriate sanction ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 3/26/01) (c/m 3/26/01 skp) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Remark
      Oral Order J.Smalkin entering sanctions in the sum of Thirty-Five Hundred DOllars ($3500.00) in favor of Bank of America and against Emile Joseph Henault, Jr. as part of the Attorney's fees or other expenses, for reasons stated in open Court. (rhl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/26/2001
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Motion Hearing
        Motion hearing re: [49-1] motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Court Reporter/ER: Paul Mackaro)) (rhl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 54 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER SETTING Date for hearing. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 3/6/01 ) (c/m 3/6/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 53 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Response in Opposition
            RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [49-1] motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Curtis Pearil, Hugh McColl, Bank of America and Exhibits 1-6. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 52 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Correspondence
              CORRESPONDENCE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders RE: The Motions for Sanctions dispute between the Federal Defendants and the Plaintiff's has been resolved. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 51 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING [51-1] motion of Federal Defendants to Withdraw Motion for Sanctions. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/27/01 ) (c/m 2/27/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 51 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2001 Motion to Withdraw
                  MOTION by USA, William S. Cohen (Federal Defendants) to Withdraw Motion for Sanctions and Attachment. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Clerk's Order Taxing Cost
                    Clerk's Order taxing costs for bill of costs, in favor of Bank of America against Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in the sum of $88.20 (c/i 2/28/01) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 49 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Motion for Sanctions
                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Bank of America, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Exhibits A-H. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 48 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Correspondence
                        CORRESPONDENCE from Emile Henault, Jr. RE: Order of 2/6/01. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 47 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER CLARIFYING Court's letter of 2/6/01 ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/7/01) (c/m 2/7/01 skp) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 46 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER DIRECTING that Plaintiffs and/or their counsel file any opposition to both sanction motions no later than 21 claendar days from the date of this letter. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/6/01 ) (c/m 2/6/01-skp) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 45 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001, Terminated: 2/6/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              LETTER/MOTION by USA for clarification as to the status of motion for sanctions (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 44 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Bill of Costs
                                Bill of costs by Bank of America USA, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil. (c/s Chambers & Staff Atty) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 43 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MARGINAL ORDER GRANTING in substance by Memorandum and Order which this date Granted [40-2] motion for Summary Judgment in favor of all Defendants. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/23/00 ) (c/m 1/23/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 42 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
                                    FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING the Motions of all remaining Defendants for Summary Judgment on all remaining claims; DENYING the Defendants' "Motion to Strike, etc." filed 12/18/00; ENTERED FINAL JUDGMENT in faovr of all Defendants, with costs awarded to them and DIRECTING this case be Closed. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/23/01 ) (c/m 1/23/01-Chambers) (MICROFILMED 1/23/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/23/01 ) (c/m 1/23/01-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated Case
                                        Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION by Department Defense, National Security to Dismiss , or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                            RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [27-1] motion to Dismiss, [27-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants; Memorandum and Attachments. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                              RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [26-1] motion to Strike the Affidavit of Plaintiff Steven P. Sanders and Counts III and IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendants. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [25-1] motion for More Definite Statement by defendants. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Motion for Sanctions
                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, Department Defense, National Security, Timothy J. Parsons, Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson for Sanctions against Emile J. Henault, Jr., Esq. Counsel for Plaintiffs ; Request for Hearing and Exhibits 1-13. (c/s) (EXHIBITS FILED SEPARATELY) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                      RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [28-1] motion to Dismiss, [28-2] motion for Summary Judgment of Counts I, II, III, and IV of Complaint by Bank of America USA; Memorandum and APP. 1-4. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER DENYING [31-1] motion of Plaintiffs to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment and DIRECTING Plaintiff's shall file with the Court their Oppositions to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (USA)'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment of Counts I, II, III and IV of Plainitffs' Complaint on or before 1/16/01 and DIRECTING No Further Extensions will be granted for said filing. (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/10/01) (c/m 1/10/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE by Bank of America USA to [31-1] motion to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Cheryl A. Sanders, Steven P. Sanders. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/11/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                            MOTION by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative for Summary Judgment; Motion to Strike and Motion for a More Definite Statement no later than 1/22/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/26/00 ) (c/m 12/27/00-Chambers) (c/m) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 12/27/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                MOTION by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative for Summary Judgment; Motion to Strike and Motion for a More Definite Statement . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Bank of America USA to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment of Counts I, II, III, and IV of Complaint . (c/s) (Corrected Page 6 of Memorandum of Law - Received 1/17/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, National Security, Timothy J. Parsons, Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson, John Winfield Jr. to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-5. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Motion to Strike
                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, National Security, Timothy J. Parsons, Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson, John Winfield Jr. to Strike the Affidavit of Plaintiff Steven P. Sanders and Counts III and IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, National Security, Timothy J. Parsons, Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson, John Winfield Jr. for More Definite Statement . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER DIRECTING the Complaint stands DISMISSED as against Bank of America, N.A. (USA) as to Counts 5,6,7 and 8 Only, but DISMISSED as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. in its Entirety. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/12/00) (c/m 12/12/00-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Reply to Response
                                                                            REPLY by Bank of America, Bank of America USA, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil in support of the entry of Final Judgment of Dismissal with prejudice as to Bank of America, N.A.(USA), Bank of America, N.A., Hugh McColl and Curtis Pearil. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                              RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [21-1] motion for Entry of Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Bank of America, N.A.(USA), Bank of America, N.A., Hugh McColl and Curtis Pearil by Curtis Pearil, Hugh McColl, Bank of America, Bank of America USA (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000, Terminated: 1/23/2001 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Bank of America USA, Bank of America, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil for Entry of Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Bank of America, N.A.(USA), Bank of America, N.A., Hugh McColl and Curtis Pearil . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [10-1] motion to Dismiss with prejudice as to Hugh McColl and Curtis Pearil. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/13/00 ) (c/m 11/13/00) (MICROFILMED 11/13/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/13/00 ) (c/m 11/13/00-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                                      RESPONSE by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders in opposition to [10-1] motion to Dismiss, [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Curtis Pearil, Hugh McColl, Bank of America USA, Bank of America and Exhibits A-C. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [17-1] motion of Bank of America, N.A. for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Count I, Count II, Count III and Count IV of Complaint and DIRECTING that, if necessary, Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall respond to Count I, Count II, Count III and Count IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint 10 days after the date on which the Bank of America Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motions for Summary Judgment are resolved. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/30/00 ) (c/m 10/30/00-Chambers ) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000, Terminated: 10/30/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                          MOTION by Bank of America, N.A. for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Count I, Count II, Count III and Count IV of Complaint . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Local Rule
                                                                                            Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure by Bank of America, Bank of America USA (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the pending 12(b) [12-1] joint motion for More Definite Statement (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/25/00) (c/m 10/25/00 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/26/2000
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying [11-1] joint motion to Strike the affidavit of plaintiff Steven P. Sanders and count III and count IV of complaint (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/25/00) (c/m 10/25/00 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil, Bank of America, Bank of America USA in support of their [10-1] motion to Dismiss and their [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 10/25/2000 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by Bank of America, Bank of America USA, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil for More Definite Statement (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 10/25/2000 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by Bank of America, Bank of America USA, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil to Strike the affidavit of plaintiff Steven P. Sanders and count III and count IV of complaint (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 11/13/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Bank of America, Bank of America USA, Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and Exhibits A-C. (c/s) (AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT D- Received 11/9/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/09/2000
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [8-1] motion to Extend Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading SET Answer deadline to 12/18/00 for John Winfield Jr., for Donna J. Johnson, for Donna M. Douglas, for Timothy J. Parsons, for National Security, for Department Defense, for Michael V. Hayden, for William S. Cohen, for USA ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/19/00 nunc pro tunc to 10/18/00 ) (c/m 10/19/00-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, National Security, Timothy J. Parsons, Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson, John Winfield Jr. to Extend Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Attorney General 10/4/00; as to U. S. Attorney 10/2/00. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to William S. Cohen 10/4/00 Answer due on 12/4/00 for William S. Cohen (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Michael V. Hayden, National Security 10/3/00 Answer due on 12/3/00 for National Security, for Michael V. Hayden (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Curtis Pearil, Bank of America, Bank of America (DE), Bank of America USA, Bank of America USDE 10/2/00 Answer due on 10/22/00 for Curtis Pearil, for Bank of America, for Bank of America (DE), for Bank of America USA, for Bank of America USDE (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson 9/30/00 Answer due on 11/20/00 for Donna M. Douglas, for Donna J. Johnson (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Hugh McColl, Curtis Pearil, Bank of America, Bank of America, Bank of America, N.A, Bank of America, N.A (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, National Security, Timothy J. Parsons, Donna M. Douglas, Donna J. Johnson, John Winfield Jr. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                            DEMAND for jury trial by Steven P. Sanders, Cheryl A. Sanders (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT and affidavit filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1170126 (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?