Hicks v. Vane Line Bunkering, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-1976

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 9:55 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[1487303] [13-1976] [Entered: 04/17/2015 09:12 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
    OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by RKW, CJS, PWH, FILED.[1487296] [13-1976] [Entered: 04/17/2015 09:07 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
      LETTER, inquiring about status of disposition, on behalf of Appellee Ciro Charles Hicks, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2015 by US mail.[1417247] [13-1976]--[Edited 01/16/2015 by DE] [Entered: 01/15/2015 05:11 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
        SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1115806] [13-1976] [Entered: 12/16/2013 03:50 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Vane Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/09/2013 by CM/ECF. [1062380] [13-1976] [Entered: 10/09/2013 03:54 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
            CAPTION, editing spelling of Appellee's name from "Van Line Bunkering, Inc." to "Vane Line Bunkering, Inc." per district court docket, AMENDED.[1062277] [13-1976] [Entered: 10/09/2013 03:06 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Ciro Charles Hicks, FILED. Service date 09/25/2013 by CM/ECF. [1050681] [13-1976] [Entered: 09/25/2013 11:33 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion to extend time [38] filed by Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. [1043194][69] [13-1976] [Entered: 09/17/2013 11:56 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                  SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Ciro Charles Hicks Brief due date as 09/30/2013, FILED.[1037500] [13-1976] [Entered: 09/10/2013 03:06 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                    SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Ciro Charles Hicks, informing Court of proposed due date 09/30/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2013 by CM/ECF.[1022664] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/21/2013 03:04 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                      JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 12, (pp. 3301-3322), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018225] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 06:16 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 12, (pp. 3001-3300), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018223] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 06:15 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 12, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018222] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 06:12 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                            JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 12, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018221] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 06:09 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                              JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 12, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018220] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 06:06 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 12, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018219] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 06:02 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                  JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 12, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018218] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:59 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                    JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 12, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018215] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:56 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                      JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 12, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018212] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:52 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 12, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018209] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:48 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 12, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018205] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:44 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                            JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 12, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1018202] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:43 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1018200] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/15/2013 05:40 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1014882] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/13/2013 10:38 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007785] [13-1976] [Entered: 08/05/2013 01:00 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[977857] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:45 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                      SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc. Brief due date as 08/15/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 08/15/2013, FILED.[977854] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:42 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                        SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 08/15/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 06/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[977085] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/27/2013 12:27 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ciro Charles Hicks, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[955592] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/04/2013 02:59 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                            CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/27/2013, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[955014] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/04/2013 10:11 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE, to Appellee Ciro Charles Hicks , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[954783] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/04/2013 08:58 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[954777] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/04/2013 08:56 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[954287] [13-1976] [Entered: 06/03/2013 02:25 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED.[950266] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/29/2013 02:13 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[949942] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/29/2013 11:50 AM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[949935] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/29/2013 11:48 AM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[942401] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/20/2013 11:37 AM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED JUDGMENT, dated 04/15/2013, RECEIVED.[942396] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/20/2013 11:36 AM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER (CORRECTED), dated 04/15/2013, RECEIVED.[942393] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/20/2013 11:35 AM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/15/2013, RECEIVED.[942390] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/20/2013 11:34 AM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER, dated 04/15/2013, RECEIVED.[942381] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/20/2013 11:31 AM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Van Line Bunkering, Inc., FILED. [942313] [13-1976] [Entered: 05/20/2013 11:06 AM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?