Universal Trading & Investment v. Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-1639

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 9:01 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 04/22/2014, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1207344] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/22/2014 11:51 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
    STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Julia Rosalind Church, Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield and Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant, FILED.[1207337] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/22/2014 11:50 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1205015] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/17/2014 04:49 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
        ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Julia Rosalind Church, Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield and Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant, FILED. Service date 04/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1194914] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/04/2014 12:46 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
          SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming judgment of the district court, by BDP, GEL, CFD, FILED.[1183655] [13-1639] [Entered: 03/21/2014 09:42 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1183637] [13-1639] [Entered: 03/21/2014 09:39 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION, for judicial notice, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 02/28/2014 by CM/ECF, email. [1168242] [13-1639] [Entered: 02/28/2014 05:04 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 02/26/2014 by CM/ECF, email. [1165449] [13-1639] [Entered: 02/26/2014 09:11 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [87], on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED.[1165397] [13-1639] [Entered: 02/26/2014 08:48 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                    SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1151631] [13-1639] [Entered: 02/06/2014 02:51 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                      SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1150709] [13-1639] [Entered: 02/05/2014 04:48 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental documents [75] filed by Appellant Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc. and Foundation Honesty International, Inc., FILED. [1142269][80] [13-1639] [Entered: 01/27/2014 01:05 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION, to file supplemental documents, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 01/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1127605] [13-1639] [Entered: 01/07/2014 02:45 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [72], on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED.[1126820] [13-1639] [Entered: 01/07/2014 09:04 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. George A Lambert, Esq. for Appellant Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc. and Foundation Honesty International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [1121726] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/26/2013 07:04 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Julie A North, Esq. for Appellee Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield, Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant and Julia Rosalind Church, FILED. Service date 12/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1117098] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/17/2013 05:01 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                  LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., RECEIVED. Service date 12/06/2013 by CM/ECF.[1109188] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/06/2013 04:32 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [60] filed by Appellant Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc. and Foundation Honesty International, Inc., FILED. [1108540][64] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/06/2013 10:53 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                      MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 12/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1108118] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/05/2013 04:14 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to extend time, [57], on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED.[1107971] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/05/2013 03:27 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [1107110] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/04/2013 07:42 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [52] filed by Appellee Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., FILED. [1107066][55] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/04/2013 05:28 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [1106019] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/03/2013 07:49 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [1106017] [13-1639] [Entered: 12/03/2013 07:41 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                  SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Julia Rosalind Church, Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield and Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant Brief due date as 12/03/2013, FILED.[1050774] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/25/2013 12:22 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                    SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Julia Rosalind Church, Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield and Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant, informing Court of proposed due date 12/16/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 09/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[1043882] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/17/2013 04:23 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                      APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, (pp. 787-1059), on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 09/15/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[1041300] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/15/2013 11:34 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                        APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, (pp. 536-786), on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 09/15/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[1041299] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/15/2013 11:28 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                          APPENDIX, volume 2 of 4, (pp. 257-535), on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 09/15/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[1041298] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/15/2013 11:24 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                            APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-256), on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 09/15/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[1041297] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/15/2013 11:12 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                              BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 09/15/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF. [1041296] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/15/2013 11:00 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Special Appendix, [32], on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED.[1039072] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/12/2013 09:51 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Julia Rosalind Church, Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield and Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant, RECEIVED. Service date 09/11/2013 by CM/ECF.[1038648] [13-1639] [Entered: 09/11/2013 03:29 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[994465] [13-1639] [Entered: 07/18/2013 05:13 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc. Brief due date as 09/03/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 09/03/2013, FILED.[994463] [13-1639] [Entered: 07/18/2013 05:13 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 09/08/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 07/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[991082] [13-1639] [Entered: 07/16/2013 11:41 AM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/12/2013, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Conference Note: Conference date and time changed to 7/12/13 at 10:30AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[972768] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/24/2013 09:21 AM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Gay, ASSIGNED.[960415] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/10/2013 02:56 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/28/2013, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[959229] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/07/2013 02:04 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 06/07/2013 by CM/ECF.[959155] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/07/2013 01:14 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER, dismissing appeal by 6/21/2013, unless Appellant Foundation Honestly International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investement Co., Inc., submits an acknowledgment/appearance,FILED.[959129] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/07/2013 12:50 PM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 06/05/2013 by email.[957244] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/05/2013 10:31 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [9], on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED.[955468] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/04/2013 01:59 PM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by US mail.[954846] [13-1639] [Entered: 06/04/2013 09:18 AM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Julia Rosalind Church, Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Trust, Ltd., Philip John Glanfield and Pamela Freda Kay Le Cheminant, FILED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF.[933982] [13-1639] [Entered: 05/10/2013 01:20 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/05/2013, RECEIVED.[930199] [13-1639] [Entered: 05/07/2013 03:30 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED.[930193] [13-1639] [Entered: 05/07/2013 03:27 PM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[922850] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/30/2013 12:38 PM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., district court receipt # 465401065957, FILED.[922847] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/30/2013 12:37 PM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/05/2013, RECEIVED.[922843] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/30/2013 12:35 PM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Foundation Honesty International, Inc. and Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc., FILED. [922835] [13-1639] [Entered: 04/30/2013 12:31 PM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?