Rondal Kindrick v. Today's Design & Mfg. Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 12-15501

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 2:55 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106932864 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Today's Design and Manufacturing, Inc.'s motion for voluntary dismissal (joint stipulation of the parties), FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106929052 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal without prejudice filed by Larry Branam, Diversified Integrated Systems Corp. and Today's Design and Manufacturing, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [6819837-1] (ECF: Charles Crook)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106901583 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
      filed by Attorney Charles McDowell Crook, Jr. for Appellants Today's Design and Manufacturing, Inc., Diversified Integrated Systems Corp. and Larry Branam. (ECF: Charles Crook)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106855873 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
        Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Larry Branam, Diversified Integrated Systems Corp., Today's Design and Manufacturing, Inc. and Appellee Rondal J. Kindrick. The appellants brief and record excerpts are due on or before 02/20/2013.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106853936 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
          TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Risa Entrekin, Filer: Today's Design and Manufacturing, Inc., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 01/11/2013, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 11/04/2011 - 11/17/2011, Pre-Trial Proceedings 11/07/2011
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106827275 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
            ORDER: Motion for extension to file transcripts filed by Risa Entrekin is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6747824-2] Transcript is due on or before 01/14/2013. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Risa Entrekin, Ct. Rptr. Fee Waiver: granted, Discount Invoked: n, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 12/14/2012.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106819404 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
              Motion for extension of time to file a transcript to 01/14/2013 at 05:00 pm filed by Court Reporter Risa Entrekin. [6747824-1]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106806403 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Larry Branam, Diversified Integrated Systems Corp. and Today's Design and Manufacturing, Inc..
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?