Lopez v. Mathely
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-1410

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 4:42 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 08/20/2015 by CM/ECF.[1581225] [15-1410] [Entered: 08/20/2015 03:30 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, [36], on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED.[1580382] [15-1410] [Entered: 08/19/2015 04:23 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
      FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1526156] [15-1410] [Entered: 06/05/2015 03:30 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
        CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/02/2015, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[1513446] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/19/2015 12:07 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
          SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Damaris Lopez Brief due date as 08/17/2015;. Joint Appendix due date as 08/17/2015, FILED.[1512413] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/18/2015 12:47 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bourdeau Bros. Inc. and Ricky D. Mathely, FILED. Service date 05/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1511589] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/15/2015 02:14 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
              LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, informing Court of proposed due date 08/15/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 05/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1511295] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/15/2015 11:22 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [23], on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED.[1511266] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/15/2015 11:14 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Deborah Holmes, ASSIGNED.[1502104] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/05/2015 04:54 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1501629] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/05/2015 02:13 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                      FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1501628] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/05/2015 02:12 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1501627] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/05/2015 02:11 PM]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, FORMS C AND D, [11], [12], [13], on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED.[1501503] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/05/2015 12:41 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED. Service date 05/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1499465] [15-1410] [Entered: 05/01/2015 03:00 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                              ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1497828] [15-1410] [Entered: 04/30/2015 11:27 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1497816] [15-1410] [Entered: 04/30/2015 11:25 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                  DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1497814] [15-1410] [Entered: 04/30/2015 11:24 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Damaris Lopez, FILED. [1497800] [15-1410] [Entered: 04/30/2015 11:21 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?