Stratton v. Wallace
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-3113

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 10:56 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Blank 35
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Michael P. Stratton, FILED. Service date 09/12/2014 by email, CM/ECF.[1319057] [14-3113]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Michael P. Stratton, FILED. Service date 09/12/2014 by CM/ECF. [1318980] [14-3113]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance [23], on behalf of Appellee Michael P. Stratton, FILED.[1318839] [14-3113]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1318413] [14-3113]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                            INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant Great River Leasing, LLC, past due material(s) to be submitted by 09/22/2014, SENT.[1315982] [14-3113]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE, to Appellee Michael P. Stratton , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1315976] [14-3113]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1315956] [14-3113]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Blank 12
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?