District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Estate of Ernest Gottdiener v. Sater
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-1313

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 10:20 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ervin Tausky, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Estate Of Ernest Gottdiener, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Estate Of Judit Gottdiener, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Suan Investments, Plaintiff - Appellant
No Logo Sater, Felix H., Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Felix Sater"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Canales

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Canales

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert S. Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Wolf
No Logo Salvatore Lauria, Defendant - Appellee
Nature of Suit 3470 - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations (RICO)
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=13-cv-1824
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=13-cv-1824
  Entries (198) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1540368] [14-1313] [Entered: 06/25/2015 11:50 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc [185] from the docket, FILED.[1533503] [14-1313] [Entered: 06/16/2015 12:36 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION ORDER, denying motion to amended petition for rehearing [188] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, by RCW, FILED. [1533422][198] [14-1313] [Entered: 06/16/2015 11:50 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY TO OPPOSITION [191], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/12/2015 by CM/ECF.[1531649][194] [14-1313] [Entered: 06/12/2015 02:32 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to file supplemental documents [188], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 06/10/2015 by CM/ECF. [1529330] [14-1313] [Entered: 06/10/2015 11:55 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION, to file supplemental documents, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1522056] [14-1313] [Entered: 06/01/2015 11:51 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 05/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1521111] [14-1313] [Entered: 05/29/2015 11:55 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc, [183], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1517964] [14-1313] [Entered: 05/27/2015 08:52 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204156584 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1540368] [14-1313]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204138585 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc [185] from the docket, FILED.[1533503] [14-1313]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204138334 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION ORDER, denying motion to amended petition for rehearing [188] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, by RCW, FILED. [1533422][198] [14-1313]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204133590 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY TO OPPOSITION [191], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/12/2015 by CM/ECF.[1531649][194] [14-1313]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204127426 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to file supplemental documents [188], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 06/10/2015 by CM/ECF. [1529330] [14-1313]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204108136 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION, to file supplemental documents, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1522056] [14-1313]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CURED DEFECTIVE, petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc, [182], [184], [185], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1521334] [14-1313]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204105654 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 05/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1521111] [14-1313]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204097485 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc, [183], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1517964] [14-1313]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 05/26/2015 by CM/ECF.[1517932] [14-1313]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204093352 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc, [181], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1516431] [14-1313]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 05/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1516116] [14-1313]
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[1510281] [14-1313]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204072058 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM R. LERNER, with fee, RECEIVED.[1508449] [14-1313]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204059153 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, the judgment of the District Court is affirmed, by RCW, DAL, DC, FILED.[1503636] [14-1313]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204059137 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1503628] [14-1313]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 28(j) LETTER [170], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1503105] [14-1313]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204057352 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 05/05/2015, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, RECEIVED. Service date 05/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502980] [14-1313]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204055638 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter[168], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1502325] [14-1313]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, RECEIVED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1502118] [14-1313]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Kerwyn Welch.[1510113] [14-1313]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ARGUMENT CD, to Martin Domb,TRANSMITTED.[1509937] [14-1313]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204042468 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/29/2015, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, RECEIVED. Service date 04/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1497356] [14-1313]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CASE, before RCW, DAL, DC, C.JJ., HEARD.[1492164] [14-1313]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204026125 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 04/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1491182] [14-1313]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204025218 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 04/21/2015 by CM/ECF. [1490849] [14-1313]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203953632 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1463812] [14-1313]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      **REVISED**CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 04/23/2015, SET.[1460523] [14-1313]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY BRIEF[156], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1459801] [14-1313]
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, reply brief[155], [153], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1459797] [14-1313]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203943093 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 03/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1459782] [14-1313]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 03/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1459781] [14-1313]
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY BRIEF[153], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1459237] [14-1313]
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 03/09/2015 by CM/ECF. [1456282] [14-1313]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203927911 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, reply to opposition[151], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1454060] [14-1313]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY TO OPPOSITION [126], [124], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 03/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1454022][151] [14-1313]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203923226 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion for permission to file reply brief late, [146] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, FILED. [1452271][150] [14-1313]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 04/24/2015, SET.[1446065] [14-1313]
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203883314 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION, to file late reply brief, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 02/11/2015 by CM/ECF. [1437226] [14-1313]--[Edited 02/13/2015 by JW]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203875119 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, reply brief[142], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1434135] [14-1313]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/20/2015, PROPOSED.[1431760] [14-1313]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 02/03/2015 by email, CM/ECF. [1428416] [14-1313]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Jason Canales for Felix Sater, in case 14-1313 , [140], ADDED.[1428132] [14-1313]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203859383 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 02/02/2015 by CM/ECF. [1428059] [14-1313]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203854512 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION ORDER, denying motion for hearing en banc [109] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, FILED. [1426166][139] [14-1313]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT[136], on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED.[1419364] [14-1313]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203836736 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Joshua Liston, Esq. for Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED. Service date 01/20/2015 by CM/ECF. [1419327] [14-1313]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203835031 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, oral argument statement[134], on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED.[1418668] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Joshua Liston, Esq. for Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED. Service date 01/20/2015 by CM/ECF. [1418618] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203832391 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert S. Wolf, Esq. for Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1417705] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203831041 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [121] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, by CFD, FILED. [1417178][131] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CURED DEFECTIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION [126], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1416337] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203828810 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION TO MOTION, , on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/15/2015 by CM/ECF. [1416316] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203828357 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, opposition to motion[124], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1416142] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION TO MOTION, , on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1416057] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203825160 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 01/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1414947] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203825148 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Frederick M. Oberlander, Esq. for Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 01/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1414943] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [113], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1411309] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Robert David Lillienstein for Felix Sater, in case 14-1313 , [113], ADDED.[1411304] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203814560 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/08/2015 by CM/ECF. [1410859] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203812957 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[106], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1410246] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203812935 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION, for hearing en banc, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 01/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1410236] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203812898 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            LETTER, adopting the brief submitted by Appellee Felix Sater, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, RECEIVED. Service date 01/07/2015 by CM/ECF.[1410225] [14-1313]--[Edited 01/09/2015 by JW]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203812895 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1410223] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1410203] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203812454 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance [104], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1410060] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 01/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1409994] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203560166 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Salvatore Lauria Brief due date as 01/07/2015, FILED.[1349806] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203558116 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, informing Court of proposed due date 01/07/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 10/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1349021] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203553322 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Felix Sater Brief due date as 01/07/2015, FILED.[1346997] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203552171 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, informing Court of proposed due date 01/07/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2014 by email.[1346544] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              CURED DEFECTIVE CORRECTED BRIEF AND SPECIAL APPENDIX[87], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1341129] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief and special appendix[73], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1341127] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203535186 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED BRIEF AND SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 10/08/2014 by CM/ECF. [1340132] [14-1313]--[Edited 10/09/2014 by JW]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203533398 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION ORDER, granting motion that the Court accept corrected brief and appellee's briefing deadling shall be adjusted accordingly[72] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, by RKW, FILED. [1339464][85] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203532202 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO OPPOSITION [78], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 10/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1339030][81] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203515993 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file document [74], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 09/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1332903][78] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion[74], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1330688] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Richard E. Lerner for Estate of Judit Gottdiener Suan Investments Ervin Tausky Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, in case 14-1313 , [71], ADDED.[1330632] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1330591] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/26/2014 by CM/ECF. [1330590] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203509776 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/26/2014 by CM/ECF. [1330589] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203509773 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/26/2014 by CM/ECF. [1330588] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203501810 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, brief, special appendix, and corrected appendix, corrected brief[69], [68], [64], [63], [62], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1327665] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1327555] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1327554] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203494653 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX, volume 3 of 3, (pp. 525-786), on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1324957] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203494625 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX, volume 2 of 3, (pp. 262-524), on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1324948] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203494597 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX, volume 1 of 3, (pp. 1-262), on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1324935] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1324859] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1324841] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1324834] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203493761 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, brief and appendix [60], [59], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1324631] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1321537] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              , volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-900), on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 09/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1321536] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203357906 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to remove the appeal from the Expedited appeals calendar, granting motion to extend time [47] filed by Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Ervin Tausky and Suan Investments, by RKW, FILED. [1273381][57] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203347739 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO OPPOSITION [50], on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 07/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1269533][53] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203342563 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION TO MOTION to extend time [46], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1267587][50] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203335651 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 07/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1265004] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203335591 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 07/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1264982] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [43], on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED.[1251927] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY, Joshua Liston for Salvatore Lauria, in case 14-1313 , [43], ADDED.[1251925] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203300469 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1251853] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203300441 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF.[1251841] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203300391 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[36], on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED.[1251822] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [37], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1251818] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, Robert S. Wolf [37], in place of attorney Nader Mobargha, SUBSTITUTED.[1251816] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203300366 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER, dated 06/18/2014, withdrawing appearance for one appellee, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, RECEIVED. No Service.[1251813] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203300233 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1251767] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Lauria, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1251608] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203297731 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[34], on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED.[1250818] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Felix Sater, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1250761] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203281712 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 07/15/2014, appellees' brief due date as 08/19/2014, TRANSMITTED.[1244853] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203279163 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1243922] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203279178 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1243929] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203279175 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 05/12/2014, RECEIVED.[1243928] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203279172 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED.[1243927] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203275768 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1242653] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268184 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, to Appellees Salvatore Lauria and Felix Sater, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1239830] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268177 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, dated 06/04/2014, dismissing appeal by 6/18/2014 unless Appellants submit Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[1239827] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268146 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/03/2014 by CM/ECF.[1239815] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268140 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. Service date 06/03/2014 by CM/ECF.[1239813] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203237775 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/20/2014, to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, ISSUED.[1228485] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203237772 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, lifting the FRAP 4(a)4 stay of appeal in docket number 14-1313 and the Appellants are directed to file Forms C and D within 14 days, FILED.[1228484] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203236342 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 05/12/2014, granting Motion for Reconsideration, RECEIVED.[1227952] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203219851 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, district court receipt # 0208-9641933, FILED.[1221693] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, district court receipt # 0208-9641933, FILED.[1221693] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, district court docket entry re: receipt # 0208-9641933, FILED.[1217769] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FRAP 4(a)4 NOTICE, to Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, copy to District Court, SENT.[1217763] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203209203 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FRAP 4(a)4 NOTICE, to Appellant Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, copy to District Court, SENT.[1217763] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1215308] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203202635 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1215308] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/11/2014, RECEIVED.[1215307] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203202629 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/11/2014, RECEIVED.[1215307] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/21/2014, RECEIVED.[1215303] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203202618 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/21/2014, RECEIVED.[1215303] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/19/2014, RECEIVED.[1215299] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203202610 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/19/2014, RECEIVED.[1215299] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. [1215293] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203202592 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Estate of Ernest Gottdiener, Estate of Judit Gottdiener, Suan Investments and Ervin Tausky, FILED. [1215293] [14-1313]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?