Siegel v. Apergis
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-1960

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 8:17 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1533592] [14-1960] [Entered: 06/16/2015 02:02 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
    ORDER, dated 05/19/2015, denying application for costs, FILED.[1513202] [14-1960] [Entered: 05/19/2015 10:38 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
      UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, for Interamerican Mortgage Corp., to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[1504454] [14-1960] [Entered: 05/07/2015 01:58 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
        OPPOSITION TO ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, [90], on behalf of Appellee DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/27/2015 by CM/ECF. [1494848] [14-1960] [Entered: 04/27/2015 05:26 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
          ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Siegel and Richard Siegel, FILED. Service date 04/27/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[1494187] [14-1960] [Entered: 04/27/2015 11:57 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
            CERTIFIED SUMMARY ORDER, dated 04/22/2015, to EDNY (BROOKLYN), ISSUED.[1490951] [14-1960] [Entered: 04/22/2015 09:09 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
              SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, vacating the district court judgment entered on 05/07/2014 and remanding the matter with instructions to the district court to enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice, by JMW, RR, CFD, FILED.[1490930] [14-1960] [Entered: 04/22/2015 09:01 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1490921] [14-1960] [Entered: 04/22/2015 08:57 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 68
                    LREF
                    Blank 67
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Blank 33
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Blank 22
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1246458] [14-1960]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Siegel and Richard Siegel, district court receipt # 0207-6978156, FILED.[1246456] [14-1960]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/07/2014, RECEIVED.[1246452] [14-1960]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Siegel and Richard Siegel, FILED.[1246450] [14-1960]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Siegel and Richard Siegel, FILED. [1246443] [14-1960]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?