Sanders v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02937-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Steve P. Sanders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/29/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Baltimore City
Terminated 6/3/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG-D
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Add and Terminate Judges
Judge James K. Bredar no longer assigned to case. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of Defendant Richard V. Hayden against Plaintiff Steven P. Sanders, DISMISSING all claims with Prejudice and with costs and INCORPORATING all prior rulings by reference herein. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/3/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [47] Motion of Plaintiff for Reconsideration of Pretrial Order and ADOPTING Letter Order issued by Magistrate Judge Bredar on April 8, 2003 as an Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/3/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 49 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
        ORDER DENYING AS MOOT [35]Second Motion of Defendant to Dismiss, granting [35] Second Motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/3/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
          RESPONSE in Opposition re [47] MOTION for Reconsideration re [46] Order on Motion to Compel filed by Michael V. Hayden. Replies due by 5/21/2003. (Huesman, Jennifer)
            LREF
            Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
            MOTION for Reconsideration re [46] Order on Motion to Compel by Steve P. Sanders. Responses due by 5/9/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, Emile)
            LREF
            Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
            ORDER denying [42] Motion of Plaintiff to Compel. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 04/08/03. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
              RESPONSE by Michael V. Hayden in opposition to [42-1] Motion of Plaintiff for Order to Compel Disclosure with Exhibits 1 - 6 (c/s - Mag. Judge Bredar) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Amendment to his Response to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. The deadline for Plaintiff to Supplement his Response to the Pending Dispositive Motion is extended to March 14, 2003. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/4/03) (c/m 2/4/03 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar for all Discovery Disputes. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/27/03) (c/m 1/29/03 hsg) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003, Terminated: 4/9/2003 Motion to Compel
                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Steve P. Sanders for Order to Compel Disclosure with Defendant's Responses; Plaintiff's Objections; Local Rule 104.7 and Exhibits 1 - 6 and Attachments (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by Steve P. Sanders to Defendant's Opposition to his [39-1] Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Amendment to his Response to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 - 6 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Response in Opposition
                        RESPONSE by Michael V. Hayden in opposition to [39-1] Second Motion of Plaintiff for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Amendment to his Response to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 - 4 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          MOTION by Steve P. Sanders for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Amendment to his Response to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment with Attachments (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [37-1] Motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/19/02) (c/m 11/20/02 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002, Terminated: 11/20/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION by Steve P. Sanders to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment with Attachments (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Response in Opposition
                                RESPONSE by Steve P. Sanders in Opposition to [35-1] Second Motion of Defendants to Dismiss or in the Alternative, [35-2] Second Motion for Summary Judgment with Deposition and Exhibits 1 - 101 (EXHIBITS 1-101 ONLY FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                  SECOND MOTION with memorandum in support by Michael V. Hayden to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-3. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                    MOTION by USA, Michael V. Hayden for Protective Order with LR 104.7 Certification of Good Faith Conference (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT by Steve P. Sanders (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by Defendant (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/7/02 ) (c/i 2/8/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Add and Terminate Judges
                                            CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Settlement Conference
                                              Settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Bredar. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Answer
                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Michael V. Hayden (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER SCHEDULING date for Settlement Conference. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 8/22/01) (c/m 8/22/01 cw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar for Alternate Dispute Resolution Procedures. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/13/01) (c/m 8/21/01 sd) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001, Terminated: 8/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [27-1] motion of plaintiff to Stay Discovery pending the outcome of the settelment negotiations. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/13/01) (c/m jw) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001, Terminated: 8/14/2001 Motion to Stay
                                                        Letter MOTION by Steve P. Sanders to Stay Discovery (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/30/01 ) (c/m 7/30/01 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part [9-1] motion to Strike Affidavit of Plaintiff Sanders and Granting Motion to Strike Count V of Plaintiff's Complaint; Count V of Complaint DISMISSED. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/30/01) (c/m 7/30/01 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot [10-1] Motion of Defendants for More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Complaint ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/30/01) (c/m 7/30/01 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part [8-1] motion of Defenants to Dismiss-DISMISING all race-based discrimination claims and all hostile work environment claims denying [8-2] motion of Defendants for Summary Judgment and DIRECTING Defendant to Answer Complaint by 8/27/01. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/30/01) (c/m 7/30/01 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Reply to Response
                                                                  SURREPLY MEMORANDUM by Steve P. Sanders with Addendum No. 1 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [20-1] Motion of Plaintiff for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum to Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and DIRECTING Plaintiff to File Sur-Reply by 4/17/01. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/10/01) (c/m 4/10/01 jw) (c/m) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001, Terminated: 4/10/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      MOTION by Steve P. Sanders for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by Michael V. Hayden in support of United States [8-1] motion to Dismiss by William S. Cohen, USA, or in the Alternative, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment by William S. Cohen, USA with Exhibits 1-6 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [17-1] joint consent motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Certain Defendants United States of America, William S. Cohen, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Carol S. Cochran, Lawrence C. Schaffer, Dave E. Pille, Lisa M. Milford, Rhea D. Siers, Amy Brown, Maria N. O'Connor, John D. Wolfe, Donna M. Naylor and Ariane E. Cerlenko, Counts II and III and Claims of Violations of 4th and 5th Amendment Rights, Violation of the Privacy Act and Violation of the Federal Records Management Act, Violation of the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/13/01) (c/m 3/15/01 jw) (Microfilmed 3/15/01 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001, Terminated: 3/15/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            JOINT CONSENT MOTION by Steve P. Sanders, USA et al. to Dismiss with Prejudice Certain Defendants, Counts and Claims (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 4/25/2001 Motion to Strike
                                                                              MOTION by Steve P. Sanders to Strike Individual Government Employees who have been acting within the scope of their employment, except Michael V. Hayden; Director of National Security Agency and Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                                RESPONSE with Memorandum of Law by Steve P. Sanders in opposition to [8-1] motion to Dismiss by William S. Cohen, USA, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment by William S. Cohen, USA (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                                  RESPONSE by Steve P. Sanders in opposition to [10-1] motion of Defendants for More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                                    RESPONSE by Steve P. Sanders in opposition to [9-1] Motion of Defendant to Strike Affidavit of Plaintiff Sanders and Count V of Plaintiff's Complaint by William S. Cohen, USA with Declaration of Steven P. Sanders and Exhibits 1-96 (EXHIBITS ONLY FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [11-1] Motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/9/01) (c/m 2/9/01 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001, Terminated: 2/9/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                        MOTION by Steve P. Sanders to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001, Terminated: 7/30/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, William S. Cohen for More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001, Terminated: 4/25/2001 Motion to Strike
                                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, William S. Cohen to Strike Affidavit of Plaintiff Sanders and Count V of Plaintiff's Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001, Terminated: 7/30/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by USA, William S. Cohen, et al. to Dismiss , or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 - 20 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Carol S. Cochran, Lawrence C. Schaffer, Dave E. Pille, Lisa M. Milford, Amy Brown, Maria N. O'Connor, John D. Wolfe, Ariane E. Cerlenko 10/7/00 Answer due on 12/7/00 for Ariane E. Cerlenko, for John D. Wolfe, for Maria N. O'Connor, for Amy Brown, for Lisa M. Milford, for Dave E. Pille, for Lawrence C. Schaffer (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, NSA 10/13/00 Answer due on 12/13/00 for NSA, for Department Defense, for Michael V. Hayden, for William S. Cohen (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA 10/4/00 Answer due on 12/4/00 for USA (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [3-1] motion of Defendants to Extend Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading reset Answer deadline to 1/18/01 for Ariane E. Cerlenko, for Donna M. Naylor, for John D. Wolfe, for Maria N. O'Connor, for Amy Brown, for Reah D. Siers, Lisa M. Milford, for Dave E. Pille, for Lawrence C. Schaffer, for Carol S. Cochran, for NSA, for Department Defense, for Michael V. Hayden, for William S. Cohen, for USA ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/19/00 ) (c/m 10/19/00 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000, Terminated: 10/19/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA, et al. to Extend Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, NSA, Carol S. Cochran, Lawrence C. Schaffer, Dave E. Pille, Lisa M. Milford, Reah D. Siers, Amy Brown, Maria N. O'Connor, John D. Wolfe, Donna M. Naylor, Airane E. Cerlenko (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/03/2000
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Jury Demand
                                                                                                            DEMAND for jury trial by Steve P. Sanders (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT and Exhibts 1 thru 4 filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1170230 (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/03/2000
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?