West v. Henderson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-03029-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEVIN D. WEST, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo William J. Henderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 10/6/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $15000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Prince George's
Terminated 9/20/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [11-1] motion of William J. Henderson, et al. to Dismiss, granting [11-2] motion of William J. Henderson, et al. for Summary Judgment; ENTERING Judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff; CLOSING the case. (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 9/20/01) (c/m 9/20/01 chambers) (Microfilmed 9/20/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 9/20/01) (c/m 9/20/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (eg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION by Kevin D. West to require defendant to submit all documents to plaintiff by certified mail and Exhibits (SEE PLEADING #17 FOR EXHIBITS) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Reply to Response
          REPLY by Kevin D. West to [16-1] reply in further support of defendant William J. Henderson Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by William J. Henderson (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Response in Support
            REPLY by William J. Henderson in further support of his [11-1] motion to Dismiss, [11-2] motion for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE by Kevin D. West in opposition to [11-1] motion of William J. Henderson to Dismiss and [11-2] motion of William J. Henderson for Summary Judgment and Exhibits (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [13-1] motion of Kevin D. West for Enlaragement of Time to file an opposing response to defendant's motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment to 3/25/01 ( signed by Judge William Nickerson 2/22/01) (c/m 2/22/01 chambers) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/23/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by Kevin D. West for Enlaragement of Time to file an opposing response to defendant's motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Rule
                    Rule 12/56 mailed to parties (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001, Terminated: 9/20/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION with memorandum in support by William J. Henderson to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1 through 13 (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion of defendant for Enlargement of Time to file an answer set Answer deadline to 2/5/01 for William J. Henderson ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/24/01) (c/m 1/24/01 chambers) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          SECOND MOTION by William J. Henderson for Enlargement of Time to file an answer (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Enlargement of Time to answer the complaint set Answer deadline on or before 1/22/01 for William J. Henderson ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/17/01 ) (c/m 1/17/01 chambers) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 1/17/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION by William J. Henderson for Enlargement of Time to answer the complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Attorney 10/23/00, William J. Henderson 10/23/00, U.S. Attorney 10/24/00 Answer due on 12/22/00 for William J. Henderson (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Local Rule
                                  Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Kevin D. West (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Summons Issued
                                    SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for William J. Henderson (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER "DIRECTING" Clerk to issue summons for the defendant and send it and the service copies of complaint to plaintiff for service via private process ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 10/16/00 ) (c/m 10/17/00 nm) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Jury Demand
                                        DEMAND for jury trial by Kevin D. West (mib, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT, Attachment and Exhibits A thru NN filed; FILING FEE $ 150 RECEIPT # 2281787 (mib, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?