Colan v. Guardian Service Industries, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01729
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Janet C. Hall
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 11:20 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Efrain Colan, Plaintiff

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Petela, Jr. +1 203 824 2584 michael.petela@gmail.com

Represented by Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emanuele Robert Cicchiello +1 860 296 3457 +1 860 296 0676 manny@cicchielloesq.com
v.
No Logo Guardian Service Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Fleishman +1 212 695 8100 +1 212 629 4013 mfleishman@goetzfitz.com

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Timeline
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER VACATING 29 Order to Show Cause SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/15/2014.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 28 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Efrain Colan SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/15/2014.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the court's Notice (doc. no. 27 ) Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2014 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/14/2014.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Efrain Colan,Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Petela, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2014 to add all filers. (Malone, P.). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: Counsel and Pro Se Litigants are reminded that Joint Status Reports are due every 90 days unless a Motion for Summary Judgment has been filed or the case is set for trial. A Joint Status Report was last filed in this case on 8/20/2013. Counsel must file a Joint Status Report within 14 days of this Notice. Failure to file by this deadline may result in sanctions against counsel for failure to comply with the courts Order. ( Status Report due by 12/30/2013) SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/17/2013.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/31/13 Discovery Deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/19/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/31/13 Discovery Deadline by Efrain Colan, Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Petela, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Petela, Jr on behalf of Efrain Colan (Petela, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
Joint STATUS REPORT by Efrain Colan, Guardian Service Industries, Inc. (Cicchiello, Emanuele) Modified on 8/21/2013 to add filer. (Torrenti, R.). (Entered: 08/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: Counsel and Pro Se Litigants are reminded that an initial Joint Status Report in this case was due on 6/26/2013 with subsequent Status Reports due every 90 days thereafter. A Joint Status Report of Counsel must be filed within 14 days of this Notice. Failure to file by this deadline may result in sanctions against counsel for failure to comply with the courts Order. (Status Report due by 8/21/2013) SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/7/2013.(DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2014 Status Report due by 6/26/2013 Trial Brief due by 1/15/2014 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/26/2013.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Guardian Service Industries, Inc. re 18 Certificate of Good Standing, 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael R. Fleishman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2748034) (Fleishman, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael R. Fleishman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2748034) by Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Fleishman, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Guardian Service Industries, Inc..(Fleishman, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Fleishman, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Fleishman on behalf of Guardian Service Industries, Inc. (Fleishman, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/18/2013. Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2013. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael R. Fleishman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2748034) by Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pierson, W.) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/31/2013 to respond to complaint. Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2013. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/31/2013 TO FILE ANSWER OR MOTION ADDRESSED TO PLAINTIFF'S 1 Complaint by Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Pierson, W.) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/31/2013 TO FILE ANSWER OR MOTION ADDRESSED TO PLAINTIFF'S 1 Complaint by Guardian Service Industries, Inc.. (Pierson, W.) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Glen Pierson on behalf of Guardian Service Industries, Inc. (Pierson, W.) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Efrain Colan. Guardian Service Industries, Inc. served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 12/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Guardian Service Industries, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Emanuele Robert Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Standing Protective Order, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Efrain Colan, 5 Discovery Notice. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/12. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 12/7/12. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment form)(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/7/12. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/7/12. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/7/13. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2013 Discovery due by 6/8/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Clerk on 12/7/12. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Guardian Service Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2710510.), filed by Efrain Colan.(Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 76 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?