Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co v. Watkins Manufacturing Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-1833

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 11:26 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, without prejudice to reinstatement by 10/22/2015 , FILED.[1605196] [15-1833] [Entered: 09/23/2015 02:05 PM]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
    NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1605192] [15-1833] [Entered: 09/23/2015 02:01 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
      LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 09/22/2015 by CM/ECF.[1604236] [15-1833] [Entered: 09/22/2015 02:12 PM]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
        SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co Brief due date as 10/20/2015; Joint Appendix due date as 10/20/2015, FILED.[1577512] [15-1833] [Entered: 08/17/2015 10:06 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
          CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/26/2015, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[1570129] [15-1833] [Entered: 08/05/2015 04:45 PM]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
            LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, informing Court of proposed due date 10/20/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 07/31/2015 by CM/ECF.[1566537] [15-1833] [Entered: 07/31/2015 10:30 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
              ELECTRONIC AMENDED INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1546584] [15-1833] [Entered: 07/06/2015 11:58 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, FILED. Service date 07/02/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF. [1545477] [15-1833] [Entered: 07/02/2015 11:07 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, FILED. Service date 07/02/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF. [1545464] [15-1833] [Entered: 07/02/2015 11:04 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, FILED. Service date 07/02/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[1545458] [15-1833] [Entered: 07/02/2015 11:00 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                      MOTION ORDER, granting motions for admission pro hac vice [17] filed by Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [18] filed by Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [19] filed by Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, by CFD, FILED. [1543953][23] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/30/2015 04:19 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                        MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by email, US mail.[1540869] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/25/2015 04:20 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by US mail, email.[1540863] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/25/2015 04:17 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by email, US mail.[1540858] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/25/2015 04:14 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                              ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1539783] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/24/2015 03:30 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE, to Appellee Watkins Manufacturing Company, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1538523] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/23/2015 01:13 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1538521] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/23/2015 01:11 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                    INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, past due material(s) to be submitted by 07/02/2015, SENT.[1537367] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/22/2015 11:55 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, FILED. Service date 06/18/2015 by email.[1535489] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/18/2015 12:40 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                        FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, FILED. Service date 06/18/2015 by email.[1535487] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/18/2015 12:39 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                          FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, FILED. Service date 06/18/2015 by email.[1535484] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/18/2015 12:35 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                            DISTRICT COURT Ruling Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, dated 05/26/2015, RECEIVED.[1526946] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/08/2015 11:55 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Merrimack Mutual Fire Ins Co, FILED. [1526936] [15-1833] [Entered: 06/08/2015 11:50 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?