New Earthshell Corporation v. Jobookit Holdings Ltd
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-1659

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 4:01 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jobookit Holdings Ltd, Rafi Shkolnik and Viumbe, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1591326] [15-1659] [Entered: 09/03/2015 01:59 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
    APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-230), on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/31/2015 by CM/ECF.[1587963] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/31/2015 09:36 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Appendix, [38], on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED.[1587371] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/28/2015 12:27 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
        CORRECTED APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/25/2015 by CM/ECF. [1584656] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/25/2015 04:33 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
          LETTER, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, RECEIVED. Service date 08/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1584631] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/25/2015 04:19 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Appendix, [34], [35], on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED.[1584291] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/25/2015 01:06 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
              APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 195-230), on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/18/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[1579050] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/18/2015 02:11 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-194), on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/18/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[1579049] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/18/2015 02:10 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                  BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/18/2015 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[1579037] [15-1659] [Entered: 08/18/2015 02:05 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                    ORDER, directing appeals 15-920 and 15-1659 to be heard in tandem, FILED.[1565393] [15-1659] [Entered: 07/29/2015 04:22 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                      ORDER, dated 07/29/2015, ordering appeals docketed under 15-920 and 15-1659 to be heard in tandem before the same panel; it is further ordered that the parties must comply with the following expedited briefing schedule: Appellant's principal brief and joint appendix due 08/18/2015; Appellees' brief due 09/03/2015; and Appellant's reply brief due 09/17/2015, FILED.[1565387] [15-1659] [Entered: 07/29/2015 04:21 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Rafi Shkolnik, Jobookit Holdings Ltd and Viumbe, LLC, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1540565] [15-1659] [Entered: 06/25/2015 01:19 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                          CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/23/2015, Start Time: 10:30 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[1533119] [15-1659] [Entered: 06/16/2015 09:22 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE, to Appellees Jobookit Holdings Ltd, Rafi Shkolnik and Viumbe, LLC, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1528798] [15-1659] [Entered: 06/10/2015 08:48 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                              SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant New Earthshell Corporation Brief due date as 08/25/2015; Joint Appendix due date as 08/25/2015, FILED.[1528790] [15-1659] [Entered: 06/10/2015 08:43 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, informing Court of proposed due date 08/25/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 06/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1527255] [15-1659] [Entered: 06/08/2015 03:30 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1519445] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/28/2015 11:13 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/27/2015 by CM/ECF.[1518953] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/27/2015 04:31 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                      FORM C, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/27/2015 by CM/ECF.[1518951] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/27/2015 04:30 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1515598] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/21/2015 01:44 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1515540] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/21/2015 12:56 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                            DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/07/2015, RECEIVED.[1515538] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/21/2015 12:54 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. [1515533] [15-1659] [Entered: 05/21/2015 12:47 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?