Jus Punjabi, LLC v. Get Punjabi Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-2009

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 6:09 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3490 - Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED. Service date 09/18/2015 by CM/ECF.[1602264] [15-2009] [Entered: 09/18/2015 03:50 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
    JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-129), on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED. Service date 09/18/2015 by CM/ECF.[1602258] [15-2009]--[Edited 09/23/2015 by DE] [Entered: 09/18/2015 03:49 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
      MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Ashok Mathias, FILED. Service date 09/16/2015 by email.[1600265] [15-2009] [Entered: 09/16/2015 04:32 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
        LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 09/21/2015, appellees' brief due date as 10/26/2015, TRANSMITTED.[1577377] [15-2009] [Entered: 08/17/2015 09:12 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
          NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1577359] [15-2009] [Entered: 08/17/2015 09:03 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
            STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee Ashok Mathias Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [32] from the docket, FILED.[1576172] [15-2009] [Entered: 08/13/2015 04:38 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter (Scheduling Notification), [34], on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED.[1576161] [15-2009] [Entered: 08/13/2015 04:31 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [32], on behalf of Appellee Ashok Mathias, FILED.[1564917] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/29/2015 12:10 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Balwant Singh Mallah, Get Punjabi Inc., Pardes News Media Inc., Harwinder Singh, Maninder Singh and Manish Vasisht, FILED. Service date 07/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1561995] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/24/2015 03:54 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [28], on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED.[1560149] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/22/2015 04:13 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED. Service date 07/20/2015 by CM/ECF.[1557327] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/20/2015 10:09 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                        FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED. Service date 07/14/2015 by CM/ECF.[1553278] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/14/2015 02:07 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE, to Appellee Balwant Singh Mallah, Get Punjabi Inc., Ashok Mathias, Pardes News Media Inc., Harwinder Singh, Maninder Singh and Manish Vasisht , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1553157] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/14/2015 12:38 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                            ORDER, dated 07/14/2015, dismissing appeal by July 28, 2015, unless appellants Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny Sandhu, submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[1553149] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/14/2015 12:30 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Forms C and D, [6], [7], on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC, FILED.[1548878] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/08/2015 12:31 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [13], on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED.[1553132] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/14/2015 12:23 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                  FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED. Service date 07/13/2015 by CM/ECF.[1551807] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/13/2015 11:07 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Forms C and D, [9], [10], on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED.[1551379] [15-2009] [Entered: 07/10/2015 04:38 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1541083] [15-2009] [Entered: 06/26/2015 09:14 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                        DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/27/2015, RECEIVED.[1541077] [15-2009] [Entered: 06/26/2015 09:11 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                          DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/20/2015, RECEIVED.[1541073] [15-2009] [Entered: 06/26/2015 09:10 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jus Punjabi, LLC and Penny K. Sandhu, FILED. [1541049] [15-2009] [Entered: 06/26/2015 09:04 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?