Washington & Sandhill Homeowne v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-17032

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 6:01 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CLB) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [9716065] (WL) [Entered: 10/13/2015 01:09 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Washington & Sandhill Homeowners Association Stipulated Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 10/07/2015. [9709652] [14-17032] (JAG) [Entered: 10/07/2015 09:56 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
      MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/12/2015, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [9678116] (BS) [Entered: 09/10/2015 12:56 PM]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
        MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/11/2015, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [9643027] (BS) [Entered: 08/11/2015 02:45 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
          Filed order MEDIATION (CLB): The court has been informed that the parties require additional time to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal. By August 17, 2015, appellant shall file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this matter, or shall contact the undersigned. [9613112] (SML) [Entered: 07/16/2015 04:35 PM]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
            MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/16/2015, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [9597388] (MS) [Entered: 07/02/2015 12:51 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
              MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 04/07/2015, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. [9443730] (BS) [Entered: 03/03/2015 04:12 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                Filed order MEDIATION (CLB): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on March 3, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. [9356080] (HC) [Entered: 12/19/2014 10:39 AM]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William K. Pao for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 12/08/2014. [9341530] [14-17032] (WKP) [Entered: 12/08/2014 06:30 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew W. Close for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 12/08/2014. [9341524] [14-17032] (MWC) [Entered: 12/08/2014 06:24 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian Boyle for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 12/08/2014. [9341519] [14-17032] (BDB) [Entered: 12/08/2014 06:06 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jacqueline A. Gilbert for Appellant Washington & Sandhill Homeowners Association. Date of service: 12/08/2014. [9341412] [14-17032] (JAG) [Entered: 12/08/2014 04:50 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 94 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?