UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00639
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 27, 2017 at 11:53 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/18/2013 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo 5601 AGER, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo KOO L. YUEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo PATRICIA YUEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
No Logo YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Mark Honigberg +1 202 772 5955 +1 202 572 8374 honigberg@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory F Linsin +1 202 772 5813 linsin@blankrome.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SATISFACTION (JOINT) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 9 Stipulation and Order (Attachments: # 1 March 2014 Letter of Satisfaction and Release)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Oliver W. McDaniel on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney AUSA Judith A. Kidwell (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on July 21, 2011. (cdw) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ONE (Settlement Agreement))(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, 5601 AGER, LLC, EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, KOO L. YUEN, PATRICIA YUEN, YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Linsin, Gregory) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, 5601 AGER, LLC, EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, KOO L. YUEN, PATRICIA YUEN, YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Honigberg, Paul) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregory F. Linsin, :Firm- Blank Rome LLP, :Address- 600 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 1200 Washington, D.C. 20037. Phone No. - 202-772-5813. Fax No. - 202-772-5858 by 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, 5601 AGER, LLC, EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, KOO L. YUEN, PATRICIA YUEN, YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Gregory Linsin Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Honigberg, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, 5601 AGER, LLC, EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, KOO L. YUEN, PATRICIA YUEN, YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST (Honigberg, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Mark Honigberg on behalf of 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, 5601 AGER, LLC, EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, KOO L. YUEN, PATRICIA YUEN, YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST (Honigberg, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits re 1 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C1 and C2, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E-K)(Kidwell, Judith) Modified on 3/30/2011 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against 225 MCKENDREE, LLC, 5601 AGER, LLC, EUCLID OF VIRGINIA, INC., KOO YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN LIFE INSURANCE TRUST, PATRICIA YUEN, YUEN CHILDREN'S TRUST, Koo Yuen (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 1,140 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?