William Crace v. Northrop Grumman Shp Sys, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-30699

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 6:46 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503257166 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
COURT ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated [8042349-2]. Judge: EHJ, Judge: JES, Judge: CH [15-30699] (AGL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503250532 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
    RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. William Paul Crace [8046108-1] to the motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated in 15-30699 [8042349-2] Date of Service: 10/28/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Keller, Recile, Young; Attorney for Appellees: Buck, Ellinghausen. [15-30699] (George Brian Recile )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503244585 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
      OPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [8042349-2]. Date of service: 10/23/2015 Response/Opposition due on 11/05/2015. [15-30699] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [8042349-2]. Date of service: 10/23/2015 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Keller; email - Attorney for Appellants: Recile, Young; Attorney for Appellees: Buck, Ellinghausen [15-30699] (Thomas Glenn Buck )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503167556 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellee Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [15-30699] (Terri Hourigan )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503163272 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/29/2015 for Appellant William Paul Crace. [15-30699] (MRB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503152876 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
            INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7985157-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-30699] (CB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503152756 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
              COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received 08112015 [15-30699] (Terri Hourigan )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503150355 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Crace for the Court to process. Date of service: 08/11/2015 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Keller; Attorney for Appellee: Ellinghausen; email - Attorney for Appellants: Recile, Young. [15-30699] (George Brian Recile )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503146686 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                  PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Crace [15-30699] (MAS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 169 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?