Saul Bienenfeld v. Carlos Calderon
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 12-687

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/27/2013, to EDNY, ISSUED.[1103474] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 11/27/2013 03:43 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
    STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Tina Evans and Wayne Evans in 12-687, FILED.[1103464] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 11/27/2013 03:41 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
      CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/27/2013, to EDNY, ISSUED.[1103457] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 11/27/2013 03:38 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
        STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Paul Esposito, Kerry Griffiths, Osserritta Robinson and Aisha Williams in 12-687, FILED.[1103444] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 11/27/2013 03:33 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
          JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1054839] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 10/01/2013 09:57 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
            ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Paul Esposito, Kerry Griffiths, Osserritta Robinson and Aisha Williams, FILED. Service date 09/20/2013 by CM/ECF.[1047231] [12-687] [Entered: 09/20/2013 01:23 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
              ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Tina Evans and Wayne Evans, FILED. Service date 09/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[1046634] [12-687] [Entered: 09/19/2013 05:04 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirmed, by RR, GEL, RJL, copy to pro se appellee, FILED.[1035847] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 09/09/2013 10:07 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1035819] [12-687, 12-831, 12-885] [Entered: 09/09/2013 09:58 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 123 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?