LaRue v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00998

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 2:27 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lawrence Dean LaRue, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SWCI-AX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Dean LaRue
v.
No Logo Corizon Healthcare, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Extend Time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Compliance notice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Related case order and track 1 notice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Corizon Healthcare, Florida Department of Corrections with Jury Demand filed by Lawrence Dean LaRue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (No service copies. No IFP filed)(BD) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?