Coach, Inc. et al v. Vesun Fashion, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07164
District Judge Andrea R. Wood, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Andrea R. Wood
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 6:09 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo John Jianqiang Ye, Defendant

Represented by Suite 3700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott I. Yu +1 312 558 7778 scott@law-chicago.com
No Logo Vesun Fashion, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Suite 3700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott I. Yu +1 312 558 7778 scott@law-chicago.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: # 1 Trademark Closing Order). (ph, ) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 28 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 11/4/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff is exploring the possibility of settlement with the corporate defendant. This case remains stayed as to the individual defendant. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 10/2/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff reported that the Defendant John Ye has filed for bankruptcy and Plaintiff is determining how to proceed. Fact discovery is now closed. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Defendant John Jianqiang Ye (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 9/2/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff reported that discovery is proceeding on schedule. At the next status hearing, the parties shall inform the Court whether they require expert discovery. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held on the parties' joint motion to extend discovery 21 . Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. The motion is granted. Fact discovery shall be completed by 8/29/2014. Expert discovery shall be completed by 10/3/2014. Status hearing set for 7/1/2014 is stricken. Status hearing set for 7/30/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 21 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery Joint (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 7/1/2014 at 9:00 a.m. The Court having considered the parties' proposed discovery plan, the Court orders that fact discovery shall be completed by 6/27/2014 and expert discovery shall be completed by 8/1/2014. The parties shall report on the status of settlement discussions at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 4/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vesun Fashion, Inc., John Jianqiang Ye(Yu, Scott) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
STATUS Report Joint by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of District Judge Andrea R. Wood. All previously set status dates and motion hearing dates are hereby stricken. The Court will set a date for a reassignment status conference by separate order. The parties are directed not to notice any motions for presentment prior to the reassignment status conference without first contacting chambers. Inquiries should be directed to the courtroom deputy before the motion is filed. Unless otherwise ordered by this Court, all other hearing dates, deadlines and schedules in effect as of the date of this Order remain in effect. To help the Court learn about the case, counsel for the parties shall confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages, within 14 days of the entry of this Order. If defendants counsel has not yet filed an appearance, the Reassignment Status Report should be prepared by plaintiffs counsel. A template for the Reassignment Status Report, setting forth the information required, is attached to this Order and can be found on the Courts website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood. (For further details, see attachment.) Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Reassignment Status Report) (jdh) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on November 5, 2013, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Andrea R. Wood, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 300 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Tuesday, November 19, 2013. Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/18/2013. (ef, ) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vesun Fashion, Inc., John Jianqiang Ye by Scott I. Yu (Yu, Scott) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc.. Vesun Fashion, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to Vesun Fashion, Inc. on 10/11/2013, answer due 11/1/2013. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: On Court's own motion, status hearing set for 12/13/2013 is stricken. Status is reset for 12/12/2013 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to John Jianqiang Ye on 10/9/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry Status hearing set for 12/13/2013 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Pagan at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Pagan at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials, via email. (ea, ) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ea, ) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8800580.(McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 114 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?