Champion Pro Consulting Group v. Impact Sports Football
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1899

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 4:59 PM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405749003 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Carl E. Carey, Jr. and Champion Pro Consulting Group, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 12/14/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999717704] [15-1899] Kevin Dolley
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
    BRIEF by Appellants Carl E. Carey, Jr. and Champion Pro Consulting Group, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/14/2015. [999717632] [15-1899] Kevin Dolley
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
      BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/14/2015. Response Brief due 01/19/2016 [15-1899] (TF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Joseph B. Armstrong. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 3/30/15 hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: CHAMPION PRO CONSULTING GROUP, INC.; CARL E. CAREY, JR., PH.D... Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00027-WO-LPA. Transcript due from Joseph B. Armstrong, Official Court Reporter on 11/02/2015. [15-1899] (TF)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1899] (MRB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Carl E. Carey, Jr. and Champion Pro Consulting Group, Inc.. [15-1899] Kevin Dolley
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Champion Pro Consulting Group, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999646538] [15-1899] Kevin Dolley
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Carl E. Carey, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999646537] [15-1899] Kevin Dolley
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kevin J. Dolley for Carl E. Carey, Jr. and Champion Pro Consulting Group, Inc..[999646536] [15-1899] Kevin Dolley
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Marvin Austin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999644554] [15-1899] Andrew Erteschik
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Tony Fleming. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999644548] [15-1899] Andrew Erteschik
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Mitchell Frankel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999644545] [15-1899] Andrew Erteschik
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Beth A. Manzullo for Marvin Austin, Tony Fleming, Mitchell Frankel and Impact Sports Football, LLC.[999644505] [15-1899] Beth Manzullo
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Peter R. Ginsberg for Marvin Austin, Tony Fleming, Mitchell Frankel and Impact Sports Football, LLC.[999644499] [15-1899] Peter Ginsberg
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Impact Sports Football, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999643696] [15-1899] Andrew Erteschik
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew H. Erteschik for Marvin Austin, Tony Fleming, Mitchell Frankel and Impact Sports Football, LLC.[999643695] [15-1899] Andrew Erteschik
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00027-WO-LPA. Mailed to: Ginsberg, Manzullo, Obermeyer, Schaede, Skrabacz. [15-1899] (TF)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00027-WO-LPA. Case manager: TFischer. [15-1899] (TF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?