DAVIS v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:15-vv-00861

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 4:28 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Chelsea L Davis, Petitioner

Represented by Chelsea Davis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chelsea L Davis +1 469 426 5850 +1 972 803 3576 cdavis@chelseadavispc.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (1) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Vaccination date: 3/19/2010], filed by CHELSEA L. DAVIS. Respondents Report due by 11/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dw1) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 158 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?