StoneRidge Investmen, et al v. Charter Comm Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:02-cv-01186
District Judge Charles A. Shaw, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 3:47 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Andrew Budman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 226 1015 +1 202 789 1813 mflannery@cuneolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo CARMEN RODRIGUEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley & Geller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364

Toggle Switch Represented by Dysart, Taylor, Lay, Cotter & McMonigle, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don R. Lolli +1 816 931 2700 +1 816 931 7377 dlolli@dysarttaylor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Handler +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 shandler@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
No Logo James L. Gessford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dysart, Taylor, Lay, Cotter & McMonigle, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don R. Lolli +1 816 931 2700 +1 816 931 7377 dlolli@dysarttaylor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Emerson Poynter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John G. Emerson, Jr. +1 281 488 8854 +1 281 488 8867 jemerson@emersonfirm.com
No Logo Jill D. Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H Weiss +1 212 682 3025
No Logo John Dortch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley & Geller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364

Toggle Switch Represented by Dysart, Taylor, Lay, Cotter & McMonigle, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don R. Lolli +1 816 931 2700 +1 816 931 7377 dlolli@dysarttaylor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER AND HOLZER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/02/2005 Corey D. Holzer

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Hanson Riebel +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 khriebel@locklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn G Anderson +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 carolyn.anderson@zimmreed.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Randall Hopper +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 jvn@zimmreed.com
No Logo Krupa Budman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 226 1015 +1 202 789 1813 mflannery@cuneolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Laurence E. Balfus, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan F. Andres +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 andres@andreslawpc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Lee Posner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J Rosemergy +1 312 649 0100 jrosemergy@careydanis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 226 1015 +1 202 789 1813 mflannery@cuneolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SHAPIRO AND HABER, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas G. Shapiro +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley J. Sylwester +1 314 727 2266 +1 314 727 2101 bsylwester@pcblawfirm.com
No Logo Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 pdahlstrom@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Ian Gross +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 migross@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Robbin Handelman +1 312 377 1181 +1 312 377 1184
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Greg B. Linkh +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald L. Wolff +1 314 621 4800 donwolff@me.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WOLFF AND D'AGROSA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. D'Agrosa +1 314 725 8019 +1 314 725 8443 paul@wolffdagrosa.com
v.
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn E. Davis +1 314 241 6160 +1 314 241 6116 glenn.davis@heplerbroom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Brookstein +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8603
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Craig Medow +1 312 701 7060 +1 312 706 8657 jmedow@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Schroeder +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8603
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Tharp, Jr. +1 312 701 7146 +1 312 706 8603 jtharp@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Bill Shreffler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capes, Sokol, Goodman & Sarachan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David V. Capes +1 314 721 7701 +1 314 721 0554 capes@capessokol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Todd Hamby +1 314 721 7701 +1 314 721 0554 hamby@capessokol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R Sarachan +1 314 721 7701
No Logo Carl E. Vogel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dowd Bennett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Bennett +1 314 889 7302 +1 314 863 2111 jbennett@dowdbennett.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward L. Dowd, Jr. +1 314 889 7301 +1 314 863 2111 edowd@dowdbennett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Kimber L. Monroe +1 314 345 4734 +1 314 345 5467

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri C Strand +1 314 552 6199 +5527 552 552 7199 sstrand@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Wagner +1 314 552 6000 rwagner@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roman P. Wuller +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7121 rwuller@thompsoncoburn.com
No Logo Charter Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Kimber L. Monroe +1 314 345 4734 +1 314 345 5467

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Abba Schwarz +1 310 203 7943 dschwarz@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Varnen +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 cvarnen@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SLU

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle T. Uy +1 314 977 2506 +1 314 977 7186 duy@slu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Boyd Higgins +1 314 342 1528 +1 314 552 7054 shiggins@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Sherman +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7000 ssherman@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri C Strand +1 314 552 6199 +5527 552 552 7199 sstrand@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Wagner +1 314 552 6000 rwagner@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roman P. Wuller +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7121 rwuller@thompsoncoburn.com
No Logo Chris Fenger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capes, Sokol, Goodman & Sarachan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David V. Capes +1 314 721 7701 +1 314 721 0554 capes@capessokol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Todd Hamby +1 314 721 7701 +1 314 721 0554 hamby@capessokol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R Sarachan +1 314 721 7701
No Logo David G. Barford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T. Demerath +1 314 342 4103 +1 314 552 4867 jdemerath@armstrongteasdale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/24/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Tina R. Carter +1 314 241 9090 +1 314 345 5466
TERMINATED: 05/24/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY David Paul Niemeier +1 314 241 9090 +1 314 241 8624 dpn@greensfelder.com
No Logo David L. McCall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Harlan +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 621 5065 dharlan@armstrongteasdale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E. Hoekel +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 621 5065 jhoekel@armstrongteasdale.com
No Logo James H. Smith, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COSGROVE LAW, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Burton H. Shostak +1 314 563 2490 +1 314 968 7371 bshostak@cosgrovelawllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Peck +1 303 634 2000 +1 303 634 2020 npeck@swlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Roche +1 303 634 2000 +1 303 634 2020 jroche@swlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sumaya Vanderhorst +1 303 634 2000 +1 303 634 2020
No Logo Jerald L. Kent, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Kimber L. Monroe +1 314 345 4734 +1 314 345 5467

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grace A. Carter +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 gracecarter@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Han +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 edwardhan@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Reding +1 415 856 7000 jackreding@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri C Strand +1 314 552 6199 +5527 552 552 7199 sstrand@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roman P. Wuller +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7121 rwuller@thompsoncoburn.com
No Logo Kent D. Kalkwarf, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Kimber L. Monroe +1 314 345 4734 +1 314 345 5467

Toggle Switch Represented by Haar & Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa A. Pake +1 314 241 2224 +1 314 241 2227 lpake@haar-woods.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C. Woods +1 314 241 2224 +1 314 241 2227 edmofiling@haar-woods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri C Strand +1 314 552 6199 +5527 552 552 7199 sstrand@thompsoncoburn.com
TERMINATED: 06/03/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Wagner +1 314 552 6000 rwagner@thompsoncoburn.com
TERMINATED: 06/03/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roman P. Wuller +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7121 rwuller@thompsoncoburn.com
Motorola, Inc. Motorola, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Broadcast.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nextel Partners Inc
Officer/Director, Sps Spinco Inc
Officer/Director, Vocera Communications, Inc.
Officer/Director, Shotspotter, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tut Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Clearwire Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Sanjeeve Antonipillai +1 202 942 5066 +1 202 942 5999 justin.antonipillai@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C.. Massaro +1 202 942 5122 +1 202 942 5999 john.massaro@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M. Sacks +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 stephen.sacks@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sher Corwin Winters LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan C. Kohn +1 314 721 5200 +1 314 721 5201 akohn@scwstl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F. Murray +1 314 241 3963 +1 314 241 2509 rmurray@shandselbert.com
No Logo Paul E. Martin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. MacDonald, Jr. +1 314 241 6160 +1 314 241 6116 TJM@heplerbroom.com
No Logo Paul G. Allen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Scott Ehrlichman +1 206 903 8800 ehrlichman.peter@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster Pepper PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tim J Filer +1 206 447 4400 +1749193 +17 749 1939 FileT@Foster.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Varnen +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 cvarnen@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Rice & Fingersh, LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry A. Short +1 314 444 7600 +1 314 241 6056 bshort@lewisrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt E Reitz +1 618 277 4700 +1 618 236 3434 kreitz@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri C Strand +1 314 552 6199 +5527 552 552 7199 sstrand@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roman P. Wuller +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7121 rwuller@thompsoncoburn.com
No Logo Scientific Atlanta, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Hurd +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 253 8268 shurd@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard H. Kuhlman +1 314 259 2620 +1 314 552 8820 rick.kuhlman@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Forman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oscar N. Persons +1 404 685 4246 opersons@burr.com
No Logo AFA Management Partners LP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dysart, Taylor, Lay, Cotter & McMonigle, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don R. Lolli +1 816 931 2700 +1 816 931 7377 dlolli@dysarttaylor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
No Logo Carlos Rodriguez, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Daniel Anthony Weymouth, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel Anthony Weymouth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Anthony Weymouth
No Logo Edward Altomare, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Fred Rosenberg, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Glickenhaus & Co, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J Rosemergy +1 312 649 0100 jrosemergy@careydanis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 226 1015 +1 202 789 1813 mflannery@cuneolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/04/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley J. Sylwester +1 314 727 2266 +1 314 727 2101 bsylwester@pcblawfirm.com
No Logo Jonathan Lee Riches, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan Lee Riches

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Riches
No Logo KOJA, LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Herzog, Crebs & McGhee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Maschhoff +1 314 231 6700 +1 314 231 4656 jdm@herzogcrebs.com
No Logo Patrick Elliott, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Rudolph Wise, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Tommiita Sengvilay, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe D. Jacobson +1 314 899 9790 +1 314 899 0282 jacobson@archcitylawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M. Green +1 314 862 6800 +1 314 862 1606 green@martingreenpc.com
No Logo Walter Mixson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by SANDBERG AND PHOENIX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/10/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen R. Richards +1 314 231 3332 +1 314 241 7604
No Logo David Birnbaum, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BERNSTEIN AND LIEBHARD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A. Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip A. Downey, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo Evelyn Gadol, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COHEN AND MILSTEIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Joseph Barton +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Sommers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com
No Logo Fred B. Storey, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by IZARD NOBEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Nobel +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290 firm@snlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Schatz & Nobel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW M. SCHATZ +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290
No Logo George Pike, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 226 1015 +1 202 789 1813 mflannery@cuneolaw.com
No Logo Mytien Ngo, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KIRBY AND MCINERNEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira M. Press +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540

Toggle Switch Represented by MURRAY AND FRANK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Murray +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 pdahlstrom@pomlaw.com
No Logo Patricia Morrow, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo Rory A. Valas, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Jacob Pentz, III +1 978 461 1548 +1 707 276 2925 clasaxn@earthlink.net
No Logo Susan Lockshine, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward F. Siegel-OH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward F. Siegel +1 216 831 3424 +1 216 831 6584 efsiegel@efs-law.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (381) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 373 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Weymouth, Jonathan Lee Riches USCA #:10-2771(BAK) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT of USCA USCA Appeal #: 10-2771. Appellant has not responded to the court's order entered 9/9/10. It is hereby ordered that htis appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. (BAK) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
      ORDER of USCA - The appellant has failed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the requisite docketing fees. Accordinly, appellant is directed to show cause, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. as to 373 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Weymouth, Jonathan Lee Riches USCA Appeal #: 10-2771 (MRC) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
        ORDER of USCA Regarding: Appellant Patrick Simpsons request to be removed from this case is hereby granted. USCA Appeal #: 10-2771 (JWJ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
          ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant Patrick James Simpsons Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. [Doc. 377] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall remove movant Patrick James Simpsons name from the docket sheet in this matter. Granting 77 Motion to Withdraw Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 8/19/10. (JWJ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION to Withdraw movant Patrick James Simpson from this case by Movant Patrick J Simpson. (JWJ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
              ORDER of USCA as to 373 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Weymouth, Patrick J Simpson, Jonathan Lee Riches Regarding: Under the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, this appeal may not proceed unless the appellant pays the full filing fees. Accordingly, the appellant is directed to pay the $455.00 filing fees to the Clerk of the United States District Court within fourteen days of the date of this order.If the appellant fails to act by that date, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. USCA Appeal #: 10-2771 (KJF) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                Initial Notification from USCA for 373 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Weymouth, Patrick J Simpson, Jonathan Lee Riches USCA Appeal Number: 10-2771 Notice of Appeal forwarded to panel: Yes(KJF) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 373 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 08/09/2010 by Movants Jonathan Lee Riches, Patrick J Simpson, Daniel Anthony Weymouth. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(JMW) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 372 Order by Movants Jonathan Lee Riches, Patrick J Simpson, Daniel Anthony Weymouth. (NCL) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                      ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movants' Motion to Intervene is DENIED. [Doc. 371] Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 7/29/2010. (NCL) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Intervene as plaintiff's under Fed. R. Civ. Prde 24(A)? 24(B), MOTION for Relief of Judgment under Rule 60 by Movants Patrick J Simpson, Daniel Anthony Weymouth, Jonathan Lee Riches. (JWJ) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE In Re Charter Communications, Inc. re: Bankruptcy, Southern District of New York (MRC) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                            FINAL ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND ( SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) ORDER granting 366 Motion for Disbursement of Funds Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 7/17/08. (JWJ) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT Of Michael Rosenbaum In Support of Final Distribution of Net Settlement Fund by Lead Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (MRC) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION Of Marc L. Gross In Support of Motion For Final Distribution of Settlement Fund filed by Lead Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC re 366 MOTION for Final Distribution of Settlement Fund (MRC) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Final Distribution of Settlement Fund by Lead Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(MRC) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                    MANDATE of USCA as to 341 Notice of Appeal filed by Rory A. Valas Decision of USCA: For these reasons, we direct that this court's mandate affirming the final judgment of the district court dated February 15, 2005, be reissued forthwith. USCA #:05-1974.In accordance with the court's order of 03/03/2008, the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. (NCL) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                      ORDER of USCA as to 341 Notice of Appeal filed by Rory A. Valas Regarding: final judgment. USCA Appeal #: 05-1974. For these reasons, we direct that this court's mandate affirming the final judgment of the district court dated February 15, 2005, be reissued forthwith. (NCL) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                        ORDER of USCA as to 341 Notice of Appeal filed by Rory A. Valas. USCA Appeal #: 05-1974. Pursuant to the judgment of the United States Supreme Court dated 01/15/2008, the mandate is hereby recalled and the case is reopened. (NCL) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                          Document Transmittal Acknowledgment from the Supreme Court # 06-43(JWJ, ) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record ;attorney/firm Bradley J. Sylwester by Plaintiff Lee Posner, Movant Glickenhaus & Co. (Sylwester, Bradley) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                              LETTER from USCA regarding writ of certiorari granted by the U.S. Supreme Court USCA Appeal #: 05-1974(KXS, ) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/28/06. (KXS, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                  First MOTION for Settlement For Entry of Order for Distribution of Settlement Fund by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Affidavit of Michael Rosenbaum# 3 Exhibits A and B to Rosenbaum Affidavit# 4 Exhibit C part 1 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 5 Exhibit C part 2 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 6 Exhibit C part 3 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 7 Exhibit C part 4 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 8 Exhibit C part 5 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 9 Exhibit C part 6 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 10 Exhibit C part 7 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 11 Exhibit C part 8 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 12 Exhibit C part 9 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 13 Exhibit C part 10 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 14 Exhibit C part 11 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 15 Exhibit C part 12 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 16 Exhibit C part 13 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 17 Exhibit C part 14 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 18 Exhibit C part 15 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 19 Exhibit C part 16 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 20 Exnibit C part 17 to Rosenbaum Aff.# 21 Exhibit D to Rosenbaum Affidavit# 22 Exhibits E, F and G to Rosenbaum Affidavit)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                    LETTER from USCA regarding writ of certiorari filed with the U.S. Supreme Court USCA Appeal #: 05-1974(KXS, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                      MANDATE w/Opinion of USCA re: USCA #:05-1974 - This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court and briefs of the parties. After consideration, it is herby ordered atn adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court.(MRC, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                        OPINION from USCA re 337 Notice of Appeal, 341 Notice of Appeal: USCA Appeal #: 05-1974 Affirmed (KXS, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Withdraw 347 MOTION for Relief of Clerical Mistake in Final Judgment by Movant KOJA, LLC. (Maschhoff, James) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 352 Response in Opposition to Motion of KOJA LLC for Relief From Final Judgment by Movant KOJA, LLC. (Maschhoff, James) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 347 MOTION for Relief of Clerical Mistake in Final Judgment filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Sherman, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 347 MOTION for Relief of Clerical Mistake in Final Judgment, 348 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Sherman, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by Steven M. Sherman for Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Sherman, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter to Zenetta Bowers from USDC Finance Department Re:return of monies held in the registry of USDC (KXS, ) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 347 MOTION for Relief of Clerical Mistake in Final Judgment filed by Movant KOJA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action# 2 Exhibit B Request for Exclusion from Settlement Class# 3 Exhibit C Certrified Mail Confirmation Card# 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Craig E. Bertschi)(Maschhoff, James) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Relief of Clerical Mistake in Final Judgment. (Maschhoff, James) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to 296 Notice of Appeal filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, Appeal dismissed USCA #:05-3017(KXS, ) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            MANDATE of USCA as to 337 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Lockshine,, 341 Notice of Appeal filed by Rory A. Valas, USCA #:05-3225 - The joint motion for dismissal of this appeal is granted in accordance with the stipulation. The appeal is hereby dismissed.(MRC, ) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from USCA for 337 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Lockshine,, 341 Notice of Appeal filed by Rory A. Valas, USCA Appeal Number: 05-3225 consolidated with 05-3017 Briefs due: Briefs-Appellant:9/27/05;Brief-Appellee:10/27/05;Reply Briefs:11/10/05 (MRC, ) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 332 Memorandum & Order, 333 Judgment, 334 Judgment & Order of Dismissal with Respect to Charter Communication, and 341 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 07/25/05 by Objector Rory A. Valas. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE.(CDF). (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter to Clerk of Court from Edward Siegel requesting that the transcript of fairness hearing held on 5/23/05 be forwarded to USCA (transcript was forwarded to USCA on 7/8/05) (KXS, ) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 334 Judgment - (Case), 332 Memorandum & Order, 333 Judgment (Partial) by Objector Rory A. Valas. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number S2005-8983.(MRC, ) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from USCA for 337 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Lockshine, USCA Appeal Number: 05-3017 Method of Appendix due: 10 days from today Transcript due: N/A Briefs due: 8/30/05, 8/30/05, 9/29/05, 10/13/05 (KXS, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 334 Judgment, 332 Memorandum & Order, 337 Notice of Appeal, and 333 Judgment. Notice of Appeal filed on 07/13/05 by Objector Susan Lockshine. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE.(CDF). (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          Appeal Transmittal Acknowledgment re 296 Notice of Appeal: USCA Appeal #: 05-1974 The following has been acknowledged as received by USCA: #335 transcript(LGK, ) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 332 Memorandum & Order,,,. Filing fee $ 255.(Siegel, Edward) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              Appeal Transmittal: USCA Appeal #: 05-1974. The following has been forwarded to USCA: 335 Transcript of Hearing on Final Settlement Approval held on 05/23/05 before Hon. CAS. 296 Notice of Appeal was forwarded to USCA on 03/10/05.(CDF) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT (Pilot) procedings of Hearing on Final Settlement Approval held on 5/23/05 before Judge Charles A. Shaw. Court Reporter: S. Moran. The transcript filed with the court will not be remotely available until such time as the period for redaction has expired or a request for redaction has been received and the redacted transcript filed. For additional information see the Notice/Instructions to the Bar regarding Electronic Availability of Civil Transcripts on the Court's website at www.moed.uscourts.gov (KCM, ) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. AND THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. (See Judgment for complete details) . Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/30/2005. (MRC, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT ARTHUR ANDERSEN LLP.(See Judgment for complete details)..IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/30/2005. (MRC, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This consolidated multi-district litigation came before the Court on May 23,2005. Lead Plaintiff, StoneRidge Investment Partners seeks final approval of the settlements reached between it and Charter Communications; certain individual officers and directors of Charter; and Arthur Anderson LLP. (See memorandum and order for further and complete details)...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement and Plan of Allocation is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lead Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lead Plaintiff's motion for leave to file in excess of page limit is granted. re: 306 MOTION for Settlement filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC,, 319 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Brf in Response to Objections filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, . Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/30/2005. (MRC, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for settlement conference held before Judge Charles A. Shaw : Settlement Conference held on 5/23/2005. Terms and provisions of the final settlement heard. Application for atty's fees heard and argued Matter taken unders submission (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:sue moran.) (FTR Gold yes or no: no.) (proceedings started: 10:15.) (proceedings ended: 11:15.) (JWJ, ) (Entered: 05/24/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. Amendment to 292 Stipulation,,,. (Wuller, Roman) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement [Proposed] Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Respect to Deft Arthur Andersen LLP (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Serv)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement [Proposed} Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Respect to Charter Communs and Individual Defts (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Serv)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Appeal Transmittal Acknowledgment USCA Appeal #: 05-1974 The following has been acknowledged as received by USCA: transcript of preliminary approval of settlement(JWJ, ) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE Supplemental Objections: (Siegel, Edward) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Wuller, Roman) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Appeal Transmittal: USCA Appeal #: 05-1974. The following has been forwarded to USCA: 318 Transcript of Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Settlement held on 02/15/05 before Hon. CAS. 296 Notice of Appeal was forwarded to USCA on 03/10/05.(CDF) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Tina R. Carter and David P. Niemeier of the law firm Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, P.C. by Defendant David G. Barford. (Niemeier, David) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement Gross Supp Decl in Further Support of Stlment and Request for Award of Fees filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Obj_Evans_Apr_8_2005# 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Obj_Lockshine_Apr_27_2005_amd_Apr_29_2005# 3 Exhibit Ex 3 Obj_McCulley_Apr_12_2005# 4 Exhibit Ex 4 Obj_Mitchell_Apr_27_2005# 5 Exhibit Ex 5 Obj_NYSTRS_Apr_6_2005# 6 Exhibit Ex 6 Obj NYSTRS_May_5_2005_Part_1# 7 Exhibit Ex 6 Obj_NYSTRS__May_6_2005_Part_2# 8 Exhibit Ex 6 Obj_NYSTRS_May_6_2005_Part_3_1# 9 Exhibit Ex 6 Obj_NYSTRS_May_6_2005_Part_3_2# 10 Exhibit Ex 7 Obj_PERSI_Apr_12_2005# 11 Exhibit Ex 8 Obj_PSERS_Apr_21_2005# 12 Exhibit Ex 9 Obj_Rinna_Apr_14_2005# 13 Exhibit Ex 10 Obj_Valas_Apr_25_2005# 14 Exhibit Ex 11 Req_Exclusion_OConnor_Apr_29_2005# 15 Exhibit Ex 12 Rosenbaum_Supp_Aff_May_11_2005# 16 Exhibit Ex 13 Coffee_Decl_Lucent_Techs_Dec_9_2004# 17 Exhibit Ex 14 Brueggeman_Belleville_Apr_7_2003# 18 Exhibit Ex 15 Caruso_AP_Jun_3_2003# 19 Exhibit Ex 16 Cooke_WSJ_Jul_17_2002# 20 Exhibit Ex 17 Lerer_Amer_Lawyer_Oct_1_2004# 21 Exhibit Ex 18 StoneRidge_Transactions# 22 Exhibit Ex 19 Table_Antitrust_Fee_Recoveries# 23 Exhibit Ex 20 Bernstein_Liebhard_Supp_Decl_May_12_2005)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement Compendium of Unreported Cases to Ld Pltf Response to Ojbs "Case Comp 2d" filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, Benacquisto_2001_US_Dist_LEXIS_23914# 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Finova_Gp_Ord__DAriz_Jul_30_2002# 3 Exhibit Ex 3 Gateway_Ord_SDCal_Sep_9_2002# 4 Exhibit Ex 4 JDN_Realty_Ord_NDGa__Nov_15_2001# 5 Exhibit Ex 5 Leasing_Solutions_22_Class_A_Rep_405# 6 Exhibit Ex 6 Lotus_Dev_Final_Ord_DMass_Jul_10_1998# 7 Exhibit Ex 7 Mercury_Fin_Ords_NDIll_Jul_27_2000_Jul_9_2001# 8 Exhibit Ex 8 Morse_v_McWhorter_25_Class_A_Rep_220# 9 Exhibit Ex 9 Navigant_Consulting_Ord_NDIll_Mar_26_2001# 10 Exhibit Ex 10 Sands_Point_2002_US_Dist_LEXIS_25721# 11 Exhibit Ex 11 Scholastic_Corp_24_Class_A_Rep_624)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement, 319 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Brf in Response to Objections Ld Pltf Response to Objs filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Serv 1) Ld Pltf Response to Objs, 2) Gross Supp. Decl., 3) Case Comp 2d)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Brf in Response to Objections by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Serv)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT (Pilot) procedings of Preliminary Approval of Settlement Hearing held on 2/15/05 before Judge Charles A. Shaw. Court Reporter: S. Moran. The transcript filed with the court will not be remotely available until such time as the period for redaction has expired or a request for redaction has been received and the redacted transcript filed. For additional information see the Notice/Instructions to the Bar regarding Electronic Availability of Civil Transcripts on the Court's website at www.moed.uscourts.gov (KCM, ) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to Application for Attorneys' Fees by New York State Teachers' Retirement System(MRC, ) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendant James H. Smith, III of Statements and Representations Made by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. and Its Counsel, Thompson Coburn LLP, in Case No. 4:05-CV-00333 (SNL): (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 - Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Part 2, Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit Part 1, Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit Part 2, Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Roche, John) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS To Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Intention To Be Heard by Ann Mitchell. (MRC, ) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Objector Susan Lockshine Amended Objection: (Attachments: # 1)(Siegel, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Objections to Settlement: (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Siegel, Edward) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to Request for Attorney's Fees and Notice of Intention to Appear by Rory A. Valas. (MRC, ) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to Application for Attorneys' Fees by Pennsylvania Public School Employees' Retirement System (PSERS)(MRC, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to Settlement by John R. Evans(MRC, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS To Proposed Settlement by Michael W. McCulley. (MRC, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to Application for Attorneys' Fees by State of Idaho/Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho(PERSI) (MRC, ) Modified on 5/11/2005 (MRC, ).[PER LAW CLERK THIS DOCUMENT IS DUPLICATIVE OF DOCUMENT #302] (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC re 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Settlement Certificate of Service: (Gross, Marc) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Settlement by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ld Pltf's Mem of Law in Support of Award of Atty's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Compensatory Award to Ld Pltf# 2 Ld Pltf Mem of Law in Support of Final Approval of Stlmnt and Plan of Allocation# 3 Affidavit Decl of Marc I. Gross in Support of (1) Proposed Stlmnt, (2) Plan of Allocation (3) Award of Fees and Expenses and (4) Compensatory Award for Ld Pltf# 4 Case Compendium# 5 Exhibit Case Comp Ex. 1 Amer Continental, Fee Order (D. Ariz. Jul 25 1990)# 6 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 2 Ancor Communs, Order (D. Minn. Feb 5, 1999)# 7 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 3 Assisted Living, Order (D. Or. May 23 2002)# 8 Exhibit Case Comp Ex. 4 Chronimed, 2004 US Dist LEXIS (D. Minn. Jun 21 2004)# 9 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 5 Dollar Gen, Order (MD Tenn. May 24 2002)# 10 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 6 First Energy, Order (ND Ohio Dec 30 2004)# 11 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 7 Gordon, 1996 US Dist LEXIS 22866 (D. Minn. Sept 3 1996)# 12 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 8 Home-Stake, Final J. (ND Okla. Jan 2 1990)# 13 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 9 Informix, Final J. (ND Cal. Oct 29 1999)# 14 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 10 KK Motors, Order (D. Minn. Mar 6 2000)# 15 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 11 LaserMaster, Order (D. Minn. Oct 10 1997)# 16 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 12 Old CCA, 2001 US Dist LEXIS 21942 (MD Tenn. Feb 9 2001)# 17 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 13 Oxford Health, Order (SDNY Jun 12 2003)# 18 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 14 Photran, Order (D. Minn. Mar 16 1999)# 19 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 15 St Paul Cos, 2004 US Dist LEXIS 15962 (D. Minn. Aug 13 2004)# 20 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 16 Smartforce, Final J. (DNH Sep 29 2004)# 21 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 17 Sykes Enters, Order (MD Fla Mar 7 2003)# 22 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 18 Waste Mgmt, 21 Class Action Rep 263# 23 Exhibit Case Comp Ex 19 Wireless Tel, 2004 US Dist LEXIS 23342 (WD Mo. Apr 20 2004)# 24 Supplement Fee and Expense Compendium# 25 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex A, Summary of Hrs, Lodestar, and Expenses# 26 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex B, Categorized Hours and Lodestar# 27 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex C, Summary of Categorized Expenses# 28 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex D, Categorized Expenses# 29 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 1, Ademi & O'Reilly Decl# 30 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 2, Berstein Liebhard Decl# 31 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 3, Carey & Danis Decl# 32 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 4, Cohen Milstein Decl# 33 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 5, Dysart Taylor Decl# 34 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 6, Emerson Poynter Decl# 35 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 7, Glancy Binkow Decl# 36 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 8, Goodkind Labaton Decl# 37 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 9, Green Schaaf Decl# 38 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 10, Green Welling Decl# 39 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 11, Henzel Decl# 40 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 12, Kirby McInerney Decl# 41 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 13, Lerach Coughlin Decl, Part 1# 42 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 13, Lerach Coughlin Decl, Part 2# 43 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 14, Lockridge Grindal Decl# 44 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 15, Milberg Weiss Decl# 45 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 16, Murphy Decl# 46 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 17, Murray Frank Decl# 47 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 18, Neuwelt Decl# 48 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 19, Pomerantz Haudek Decl# 49 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 20, Schatz & Nobel Decl# 50 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 21, Shapiro Haber Decl# 51 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 22, Soicher Decl# 52 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 23, Stull Stull Decl# 53 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 24, Weiss & Lurie Decl# 54 Exhibit Fee Comp Ex 25, Wolff & D'Agrosa Decl# 55 Supplement Supplemental Compendium# 56 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 1, Rosenbaum Affidavit# 57 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 2, Stocke Affidavit# 58 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 3, Bloomberg Top Secs Class Actions Stlmnts# 59 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 4, NERA Feb 2005# 60 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 5, Cox and Thomas# 61 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 6, Natl LJ Dec 6 2004# 62 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 7, NERA Nov 1996, Part 1# 63 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 7, NERA Nov 1996, Part 2# 64 Exhibit Supp Comp Ex 8, Forensic Econ Bio)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action and Shareholder Derivative Action Settlements by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Siegel, David) Modified on 4/19/2005 (MRC, ).[DOCUMENT WAS FILED AS A MOTION. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED OF FILING ERROR. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED] (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS To Application For Attorneys' Fees by Carl Rinna. (MRC, ) Modified on 4/19/2005 (MRC, ). (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS To Application For Attorneys' Fees by Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho(PERSI). (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from USCA for 296 Notice of Appeal filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC,, 279 Notice of Appeal filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, USCA Appeal Number: 05-1974 Method of Appendix due: 10 days from today Transcript due: 5/23/2005 Appendix due:6/1/2005 Brief-Appellant due:6/1/2005 Brief Appellee due: 7/1/2005 Reply Brief due 7/15/2005(MRC, ) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to Application for Attorneys' Fees by New York State Teachers' Retirement System (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through F)(MRC, ) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Geller: notification of notice of appeal (envelope stamped "attempted not known") (KXS, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jeffrey Nobel: notification of notice of appeal (envelope stamped "Addressee Unknown") (KXS, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 252 Memorandum & Order, 296 Notice of Appeal, 276 Order, and 289 Judgment. Notice of Appeal filed on 03/07/05 by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, et al. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(CDF, ) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 276 Order, 252 Memorandum & Order, 289 Judgment - by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. Filing fee $ 255. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Appellant's Form A)(Handelman, Leigh) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Settlement MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERLIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Gross, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ARTHUR ANDERSEN LLP by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Respect to Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on final approval of the settlement is set for 5/23/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Charles A. Shaw.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/17/05. (JWJ, ) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Settlement with Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. and Related Individual Defendants by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Respect to Charter Communications, Inc. and the Individual Defendants# 2 Exhibit B: Settlement Agrement and Mutual Release# 3 Exhibit C: Corporate Governance Term Sheet# 4 Exhibit D: Warrant Agreement# 5 Exhibit E: [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlemetn and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice# 6 Exhibit E-1: Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action# 7 Exhibit E-2: Summary Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action# 8 Exhibit E-3: Proof of Claim and Release)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/15/2005. (MRC, ) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles A. Shaw : Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2005. Parties present for hearing on the preliminary approval of settlement. Motion for preliminary approval of class action settlements heard. Court grants the motion. Order to be issued. In open court and on the record;defendants withdraw previously filed motion(s) to dismiss and it is so ordered by the Court. (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:Susan Moran.) (FTR Gold yes or no: No.) (proceedings started: 10:15 am.) (proceedings ended: 10:45 am.) (MRC, ) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P.54(b) AS TO SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. AND MOTOROLA, INC. - SO ORDERED re 284 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/15/2005. (MRC, ) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (to termed motion) re 284 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Handelman, Leigh) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 284 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Entry of Final Judgment filed by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC Decision of USCA: mtn to dismiss appeal is granted. USCA #:05-1255(KXS, ) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 284 MOTION for entry of final judgment filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handelman, Leigh) Modified on 2/2/2005 (LGK, ). (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for entry of final judgment by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Handelman, Leigh) Modified on 2/2/2005 (LGK, ). (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC USCA Appeal #: 05-1255 -...notice of appeal received....assigned docket number indicated. Stoneridge Investment Partners appeals from district court orders dated October 12, 2004 and December 20, 2004...The parties are directed to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction based on the lack of a final appealable order. The parties shall submit simultaneous reponses within 8 days of the date of this order.(MRC, ) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's hearing on the preliminary approval of thw settlement is set for 2/15/05 @10:00 AM before Honorable Charles A. Shaw.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/21/05. (JWJ, ) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 252 Memorandum & Order, 279 Notice of Appeal, and 276 Order. Notice of Appeal filed on 01/11/05 by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC.. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(CDF, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer - Memorandum and Order #276 (KXS, ) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 276 Order,,,,, 252 Memorandum & Order,,,,,,, by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. Filing fee $ 255. (Attachments: # 1 Appellant's Form A)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Handelman, Leigh) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is set for a hearing on the Court's preliminary approval of the settlement on Tuesday, January 25, 2005 at 10:30 am. In Court Hearing set for 1/25/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12N before Honorable Charles A. Shaw.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/4/2005. (MRC, ) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Stoneridge Partners motion to amend or correct is Granted in part and Denied in part.....IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Stoneridge Partners motion for reconsideration is Denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scientific-Atlanta's motion for leave to file a supplemental memorandum in support of its motion to amend the complaint and to reconsider dismissal of claims is Denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that lead plaintiff shall file an amended complaint extending the Class Period by one month to conform with the evidence developed to date and the terms of the Partial Settlement by January 3, 2005. re 272 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Response To Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum In Support of its Motion To Amend The Complaint and To Reconsider Dismissal of Claims filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., 264 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC Response to Court due by 1/3/2005.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/20/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FINANCIAL ENTRY (LETTER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT) the issuance of check #11179 in the amount of $4,068.75 to Charter Communication as a replacement check for #10930. (JWJ, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address for attorney,John G. Emerson filed by John G. Emerson (MRC, ) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of Federal Securities Law ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Arthur Andersen, LLP.(Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Response To Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum In Support of its Motion To Amend The Complaint and To Reconsider Dismissal of Claims by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM, and Reply Memorandum in Support of 264 Motion to Amend the Complaint and to Reconsider Dismissal of Claims Against Defts Scientific Atlanta, Inc. and Motorola, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Marc) Modified on 11/29/2004 (KXS, ). (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer Document 261 (KXS, ) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer Document 262 (KXS, ) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer Document 263 (KXS, ) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer Document #260 (KXS, ) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 264 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Motorola, Inc.. (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 264 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to amend and reconsider dismissal of claims against defts Scientific Atlanta, Inc. and Motorola by Lead Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KXS, ) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - Pursuant to motion, the Court hereby modifies Section V.1. of the case management order to make initial disclosures due on or before November 30-, 2004. re 255 MOTION to Amend/Correct 127 Case Management Order 95 Case Management Order Motion t filed by Arthur Andersen, LLP. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/26/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER- GRANTED (CAS) granting 255 Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order on time to File Initial Disclosures Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/26/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - The Court hereby grants defendant Arthur Andersen's motion for extension of time to file its responsive pleading to on or before November 30, 2004. re 254 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 114 Amended Complaint filed by Arthur Andersen, LLP. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/26/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER- GRANTED (CAS). granting 254 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 254 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 114 Amended Complaint Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/26/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and to Reconsider by Defendant Motorola, Inc.. (Murray, Robert)[ Modified on 10/28/2004 - This document is also a "motion to exceed page limit".(MRC,)]. (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Reconsider Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Scientific Atlanta, Inc. by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plantiff's Motion to Amend and Reconsider Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Scientific Atlanta, Inc. by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Lead Plaintiff's Motion to File Memorandum of Law in Excess of Fifteen Pages by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lead Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of The Motion To Amend and to Reconsider Dismissal of Claims Against Defendants Scientific Atlanta, Inc. and Motorola, Inc.# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Second Amended Consolidated Class Acton Complaint for Violations of Federal Securities Law)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 127 Case Management Order,,,,, 95 Case Management Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , Motion to Modify Case Management Order on Time to File Initial Disclosures by Defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP. (Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 114 Amended Complaint by Defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP. (Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/13/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court on several motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stay in this action is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scientific-Atlanta's motion to dismiss Count V of plaintiffs' amended consolidated class action complaint is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Motorola Inc's motion to dismiss Count V of plaintiffs' amended consolidated class action complaint is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Motorola's motion for a hearing on its motion to dismiss is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Arthur Andersen's motion to dismiss Count IV of the amended consolidated class action complaint is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for a Protective Order is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Arthur Andersen's motion for leave to file a surreply regarding the joint motion for a protective order is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scientific-Atlanta's motion for leave to submit a supplemental memorandum regarding the joint motion for a protective order is denied. re: 250 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Regarding Joint Motion for the Entry of a Protective Order filed by Arthur Andersen, LLP, 138 Motion to Dismiss filed by Arthur Andersen, LLP, 251 MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Memorandum on Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., 212 MOTION for Hearing re 150 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Motorola, Inc., 242 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, 133 Motion to Dismiss filed by Scientific-Atlanta, Inc., 150 Motion to Dismiss filed by Motorola, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/12/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Submit Supplemental Memorandum on Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A - Supplmental Memorandum on Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order# 2 Exhibit 1B - Exhibit A to Supplemtental Memorandum)(Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Regarding Joint Motion for the Entry of a Protective Order by Defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Arthur Andersen's Surreply Regarding Joint Motion for the Entry of a Protective Order)(Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 242 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Handelman, Leigh) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 242 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Varnen, Craig) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 244 Reply to Response to Motion Further Response by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Handelman, Leigh) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 242 Joint MOTION for Protective Order, 243 Response to Court Order, 244 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - News Release)(Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 242 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Response to Joint Motion filed by Defendant Motorola, Inc.. (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO 242 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Response to Joint Motion by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kuhlman, Richard) Modified on 8/16/2004 (KXS, ). (Entered: 08/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc., Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1)(Uy, Danielle) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 240 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Temporary Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of: Temporary Stay of Proceedings by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer: order entered 5/11/04 (KXS, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer #232 (JWJ, ) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Holzer 227 (JWJ, ) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 234 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Temporary Stay of Proceedings filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Carl E. Vogel, Paul G. Allen, Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings in this action will be stayed for 60 days from the date of this Order.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/11/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 234 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Temporary Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendants Paul G. Allen, Charter Communications, Inc., Carl E. Vogel, Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of: Temporary Stay of Proceedings by Defendants Paul G. Allen, Charter Communications, Inc., Carl E. Vogel, Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN LETTER from clerk to Wayne E. Borgeest re: return of letter to court pursuant to Local Rule 4.04, Communication With The Court. (MRC, ) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 226 JOINT MOTION to Compel filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/4/2004. FILED UNDER SEAL(MRC, ) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles A. Shaw : (Closed Hearing)Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2004 re 226 JOINT MOTION to Compel filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. Motion heard. Court grants the motion and enters written order. Order filed under seal. (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:Susan Moran.) (FTR Gold yes or no: no.) (MRC, ) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION To Conduct A Closed Hearing by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (MRC, ) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Uy, Danielle) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. re 226 MOTION to Compel, 227 Order, of filing Document Under Seal (Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Upon the parties' joint mtn for expedited hearing, the Court being advised that the mediation at issue is set for 5/7/04, grants said mtn and sets this matter for hearing on 5/4/04, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/30/04. (KXS, ) (Entered: 04/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION to Compel and memorandum in support by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc., Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC (FILED UNDER SEAL). (KXS, ) (Entered: 04/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc., Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC of Filing Document Under Seal: (Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen B. Higgins Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Higgins, Stephen) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Defendant Paul G. Allen Appearance and Request for Electronic Service: (Ehrlichman, Peter) (Entered: 02/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J. Filer Defendant Paul G. Allen. (Filer, Timothy) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendant Motorola, Inc. of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Order Re Mediation and Temporary Stay of Proceedings by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Carl E. Vogel. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 216 Notice (Other)- Withdrawal of appearance of Kimber L. Monroe as counsel for defendant Charter Communications filed by Charter Communications, Inc. SO ORDERED (CAS)., Attorney Kimber L. Monroe terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/30/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 215 Notice (Other)- Withdrawal of appearance of Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard, PC and Kathleen R. Richards as counsel for plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez filed by Carmen Rodriguez SO ORDERED (CAS).. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/30/2004. (MRC, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Withdrawal of Appearance: (Monroe, Kimber) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez Withdrawal of Appearance: (Richards, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing re 132 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Paul E. Martin. (MacDonald, Theodore) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER- This matter is before the court following its October 24, 2003 order concerning its appointment of Sheila Brennan as special master and the court's potential recusal....The Court concludes that recusal is not required in this case....Court concludes that it will not vacate or reconsider its memorandum and order of September 16, 2003 and that Sheila Brennan will continue to participate in the case in her official capacity as a judicial law clerk. Finally, the Court will not appoint a special master at this time, but reserves the right to do so in the future.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/18/2003. (MRC, ) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Hearing re 150 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Motorola, Inc.. (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Niemeier Defendant David G. Barford. (Niemeier, David) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTRY of Appearance by Theodore J. MacDonald Jr. Defendant Paul E. Martin. (MacDonald, Theodore) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re 134 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chris Fenger, Bill Shreffler. (Hamby, S.) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 134 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Chris Fenger, Bill Shreffler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hamby, S.) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing re 199 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Paul G. Allen. (Short, Barry) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 164 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant David G. Barford. (Demerath, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 137 Motion to Dismiss Appendix of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Reply Brief filed by Defendant Jerald L. Kent. (Reding, John) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by Edward Han for Defendant Jerald L. Kent. (MRC, ) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 137 Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Jerald L. Kent. (Reding, John) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf. (Bindler, Susan) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 138 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP. (Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Paul E. Martin. (MacDonald, Theodore) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Paul G. Allen. (Short, Barry) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing regarding Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Carl E. Vogel. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Carl E. Vogel. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5)(Bennett, James) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett Defendant Carl E. Vogel. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Hurd, Susan) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 168 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant James H. Smith III's Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant.James H. Smith III. (Sandberg, Scott) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re 126 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 150 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Motorola, Inc.. (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, Regarding Special Master and Potential Recusal by Defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf. (Bindler, Susan) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER dated October 24, 2003 concerning special master and potential recusal by Defendant Paul G. Allen. (Short, Barry) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, LEAD PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S OCTOBER 24, 2003 ORDER REGARDING SPECIAL MASTER AND POTENTIAL RECUSAL by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Gross, Marc) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, dated October 24, 2003 by Defendant David G. Barford. (Demerath, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, Response to Order Dated October 24, 2003 by Defendant Paul E. Martin. (MacDonald, Theodore) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, by Defendant Jerald L. Kent. (Reding, John) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, Dated October 24, 2003 by Defendants Chris Fenger, Bill Shreffler. (Hamby, S.) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, of October 24, 2003, by Defendant David L. McCall. (Hoekel, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, Concerning Special Master and Potential Recusal by Defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP. (Davis, Glenn) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, Response to Order Dated October 24, 2003 by Defendant.James H. Smith III. (Roche, John) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, by Defendant Motorola, Inc.. (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Dated October 24, 2003 by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Carl E. Vogel. (Varnen, Craig) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 175 Order,,, Regarding Special Master and Potential Recusal filed by Defendant Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.. (Kuhlman, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FINANCIAL ENTRY/Letter to Ronen Sarraf of Pomerantz Haudek Block Grossman & Gross,LLP re: check #10931 in the amount of $4,068.75 made payable to your firm pursuant to October 24, 2003 order of Judge Charles A. Shaw. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINANCIAL ENTRY/Letter to Sherri C. Strand re: check #10930 in the amount of $4,068.75 made payable to client Charter Communications pursuant to the October 24, 2003 order of Judge Charles A. Shaw. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Concerning Special Master And Potential Recusal - It Is Hereby Ordered that the order appointing special master dated August 21, 2003 is vacated. It Is Further Ordered that the order of Oct. 7, 2003 granting the special master's interim fee allowance and ordering the parties to pay the sum of $8,137.50 into the registry of the Court is vacated. It Is Further Ordered that the clerk of the court shall return to the submitting parties or counsel all funds deposited into the Court registry pursuant to the order of October 7, 2003. It Is Finally Orderd that on or before November 7, 2003 each party to this action shall file a written response to this order, addressing the following four questions... Response to Court due by 11/7/2003.. Signed by Judge Charles A Shaw on 10/24/2003. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT/RESPONSE to Motion re 130 Motion to Dismiss, 134 Motion to Dismiss, 126 Motion to Dismiss, 165 Motion to Dismiss, 148 Motion to Dismiss, 136 Motion to Dismiss, 132 Motion to Dismiss, 137 Motion to Dismiss, 168 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant James H. Smith III's Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, 169 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Party Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant James H. Smith III's Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, 164 Motion to Dismiss, 151 Motion to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Charter Related Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents# 2 Table of Authorities# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT/RESPONSE to Motion re 133 Motion to Dismiss, 150 Motion to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Scientific-Atlanta's and Motorola's Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents and Table of Authorities# 2 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT/RESPONSE to Motion re 138 Motion to Dismiss Memoranum of Law in Opposition to Arthur Andersen LLP's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Table of Contents and Table of Authorities# 3 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from USDC finance department to Sherri Strand Re:duplicate payment for interim fees granted to the Special Master. (KXS, ) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLIC VOUCHER for purchaes and services other than personal; Voucher No: 293573 To: Kohn,Shands,Elbert et al In the amount of: 75.00 Payment Type: check Check No: 18288 (JWJ, ) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Dismiss Party Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant James H. Smith III's Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant.James H. Smith III. (Roche, John) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant James H. Smith III's Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant.James H. Smith III. (Roche, John) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER-The parties are advised that on October 14, 2003 the US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri converted to the CM/ECF system, under which all pleadings, motions and other documents must be filed in electronic format....this case is subject to the requirements of CM/ECF...As a result all documents filed in this case on and after October 14, 2003 shall be filed electronically. It Is Hereby Ordered that attorneys are required to register and obtain an Identification Name(login) and Password which will serve as an attorney's signature for purposes.....The attorneys shall indicate in writing directly on the registration form that they are representing a party in MDL No. 1056.. Signed by Judge Charles A Shaw on 10/21/2003. (MRC, ) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion To Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendant.James H. Smith III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Roche, John) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss plaintiffs' amended consolidated class action complaint with Memorandum In Support (MRC) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss plaintiffs' amended class action complaint with Memorandum In Support (MRC) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE of Corporation Interests Certificate Parent companies: None Subsidiaries: (see document for complete details) Publicly held company: None as of June 30, 2003 by defendant Motorola, Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 (MRC) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by attorney(John A. Reding), counsel for defendant Jerald L. Kent in 4:02-cv-01186 of change of address of attorney. (MRC) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER(with Application Of Special Master For Interim Fee Allowance attached) by Honorable Charles A. Shaw- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application of Sheila M. Brennan, special master herein, requesting an interim fee allowance for the period from August 21, 2003 through October 3, 2003 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 46.5 hours spent by the special master on this case, per the itemized time sheet attached, is reasonable considering the circumstances of these proceedings and the nature of the reference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the $175.00 per hour constitutes a reasonable fee in light of the circumstances of this case...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in accorance with this order and the Court's order of August 21, 2003, the parties shall pay the sum of $8,137.50 into the registry of this Court within ten days of the date of this order. In turn, the clerk of the court shall pay said amount to the special master within three days of his receipt of the funds. (cc: all counsel) (MRC) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2003 (FLJ, ). (Entered: 10/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that in accordance with the Case Management Order, a paper copy (courtesy copy) of each dispositive motion, opposition memorandum and reply memorandum, together with a copy of any exhibits thereto, shall be sent directly to chambers. (cc: all counsel) (MRC) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2003 (FLJ, ). (Entered: 10/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the verified motions for admission pro hac vice of Justin Antonipillai, John c. Massaro, and Stephen M. Sacks, are denied as moot. SEE Multidistrict Litigation Rule 1.4. finding the motion for attorney Justin Antonipillai to appear pro hac vice [154-1] moot., finding the motion for attorney John Massaro to appear pro hac vice [153-1] moot., finding the motion for attorney Stephen Sacks to appear pro hac vice [152-1] moot. (cc: all counsel) (MRC) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2003 (FLJ, ). (Entered: 10/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from counsel for defendant Jerald L. Kent re: filing of briefs. (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw granting motion to extend time to respond to deft Charters' motion to dismiss [156-1] GRANTED AS TO THE EXTENSION. DENIED AS TO 70 PAGE LIMITATION WITH A SUGGESTION OF A 50 PAGE LIMIT. (see order for new dates) (cc: all counsel) (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to respond to deft Charters' motion to dismiss (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RECEIPT # S2004-000023 in the amount of $ 75.00 for admission pro hac vice (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Motorola, Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Justin Antonipillai to appear pro hac vice (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Motorola, Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney John Massaro to appear pro hac vice (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Motorola, Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Stephen Sacks to appear pro hac vice (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant .James H. Smith III in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss amended consolidated class action complaint with memo in support attached. (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Motorola, Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss pltf's amended consolidated class action complaint with memo in support attached. (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Motorola, Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 by Stephen Sacks, John Massaro and Justin Antonipillai (motions for admission pro hac vice are pending before the court). (KXS) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss the amended class action complaint for violations of Federal Securities Law with memo in support and exhibits attached. (KXS) (Entered: 10/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw granting motion to extend time by 14 days to respond to amended class action complaint [146-1] GRANTED (cc: all counsel) (KXS) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 to extend time by 14 days to respond to amended class action complaint (KXS) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw granting motion for order setting deadline for filing motions to dismiss [144-1] GRANTED (deadline will be October 7, 2003) (cc: all counsel) (KXS) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 for order setting deadline for filing motions to dismiss (KXS) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by defendant Chris Fenger in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Bill Shreffler in 4:02-cv-01186 in support of their motion to dismiss [134-1] (KXS) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw granting motion for leave to amend memorandum of points and authorities in support of their motion to dismiss [139-1] LEAVE GRANTED (cc: all counsel) (KXS) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: by Honorable Charles A. Shaw IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defts David Barford and Kent Kalkwarf to stay the proceedings is DENIED. (#104) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of deft John Smith, III to stay the proceedings is DENIED. (#120) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that deft McCall's motion for joinder in defts' Kalkwarf and Barford's motion to stay and memorandum in support is GRANTED. (#107) (cc: all counsel) (KXS) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw granting motion to extend time for response to the amended consoldiated complaint until after the Court rules his motion to stay [131-1] (cc: all counsel) (JWJ) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Chris Fenger in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Bill Shreffler in 4:02-cv-01186 for leave to amend memorandum of points and authorities in support of their motion to dismiss with proposed amended memo attached. (KXS) (Entered: 09/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss with Memorandum In Support (DOCUMENTS LOCATED IN AN EXPANSION FOLDER) (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Jerald L. Kent in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss amended consolidated class action complaint with Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support;and Request for Judicial Notice In Support (DOCUMENTS LOCATED IN AN EXPANSION FOLDER) (MRC) Modified on 09/10/2003 (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Carl E. Vogel in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss Stoneridge's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (DOCUMENTS LOCATED IN AN EXPANSION FOLDER) (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant Chris Fenger in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Bill Shreffler in 4:02-cv-01186 for order for court to take judicial notice and suggestions in support (DOCUMENT LOCATED IN AN EXPANSION FOLDER) (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Chris Fenger in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Bill Shreffler in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss Stoneridge's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (DOCUMENTS LOCATED IN AN EXPANSION FOLDER) (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Scientific-Atlanta in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Memorandum of Law attached. (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Paul E. Martin in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss the plaintiffs' Amended Complaint with Memorandum in Support attached. (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 to extend time for response to the amended consoldiated complaint until after the Court rules his motion to stay (MRC) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Paul G. Allen in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss Stoneridge's amended consolidated class action complaint with Memorandum Of Points and Authorities In Support and Declaration of Tim J. Filer in Support (MRC) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS) granting defendants David Barford and Kent Kalkwarf's motion to extend time to respond to amended class action complaint until after the Court rules on their motion to stay [128-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 to extend time to respond to amended class action complaint until after the Court rules on their motion to stay (MRC) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw ; - SO ORDERED (CAS) - ....Whereas, Motorola Inc. and James Smith III were named defendants in the amended complaint for the first time and were not parties to the case ay any prior time, including at the time of the discussions leading to the initial case management order and the August 5, 2003 order of this court...Lead plaintiff, Motorola and Smith seek to modify the initial case management order as amended...IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that upon entry of this stipulation and order the Initial Case Managementn Order is modified to reflect that 1)The time by which Motorola and Smith have to serve and file their response to the amended complaint is set at October 1, 2003. 2)Lead plaintiff's opposition to Motorola's and Smith's response shall be filed and served on or before October 24, 2003 3)Any reply of Motorola and/or Smith in support of their response shall be filed and served on or before November 14, 2003....(SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS) (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 to dismiss amended consolidated class action complaint with Memorandum of points and authorities in support (MRC) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE executed upon defendant .James H. Smith III in 4:02-cv-01186 on 8/7/03 certified mail by serving Burton Shostak, attorney for James Smith, III (MRC) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Sheila M. Brennan be and is appointed as Special Mater pursuant to Rule 53 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, effective August 21, 2003, in order to avoid any undue delay in these proceedings. This appointment shall also apply to any cases which may be later transferred to this district as part of this Multi-District Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Special Master's duties shall include assisting with legal analysis of the parties' motions or other submissions as the Court may request and fulfilling other duties as directed by the Court as permitted by FRCVP 53 and consistent with Article III of the Constitution. The Special Master will not be expected or required to formulate any final rulings on matters formally submitted to the Court for adjudication. All such final rulings will be made by the District Court Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that for the present time, the parties plaintiff and parties defendant shall bear equally the expense of compensation of the Special Master, and the Court will consider how the expense shall be taxed at a later time. The Special Master shall be compensated at the rate of $175.00 per hour....Upon approval of the fee application by the Court, plaintiffs' lead counsel, Mr. Gross, and defendants' lead counsel, Mr. Varnen, shall be responsible for paying the approved amount into the registry of this Court within 10 days. In turn, the Clerk of Court shall poay said amount to the Special Master within 3 days of his receipt of the funds. (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS). granting defendant James H. Smith motion for attorney John M. Roche to appear pro hac vice [120-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS). granting defendant James H. Smith motion for attorney Sumaya Vanderhorst to appear pro hac vice [119-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS) granting defendant James H. Smith motion for attorney Neil Peck to appear pro hac vice [118-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant .James H. Smith III in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney John M. Roche to appear pro hac vice (MRC) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant .James H. Smith III in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Sumaya Vanderhorst to appear pro hac vice (MRC) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant .James H. Smith III in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Neil Peck to appear pro hac vice (MRC) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 to response to motion for joinder in defendants Kalkwarf's and Bardford's "Motion to Stay and Memorandum In Support [107-1] (MRC) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS) granting motion to withdraw motions for leave to make ex parte in camera submission [115-1], withdrawing motion for leave to make ex parte in camera submission in support of his motion to stay the proceedings [106-1], withdrawing motion for leave to to make ex parte in camera submission in support of motion to stay the proceedings [105-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 to withdraw motions for leave to make ex parte in camera submission (MRC) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by plaintiffs in 4:02-cv-01186 # Summons Issued: None # Waiver of Service Issued: None [90-1]; adding James H. Smith III, Motorola, Inc. to case(s) 4:02-cv-01186,; jury demand (MRC) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - LEAVE GRANTED (CAS). granting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file amended class action complaint [112-1], granting motion to amend the initial case management order [112-2] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 for leave to file amended class action complaint , and to amend the initial case management order (MRC) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS). granting defendant David McCall's motion to extend time an additional 5 days up to and including August 11, 2003 to file reply to his motion to stay [110-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 to extend time an additional 5 days up to and including August 11, 2003 to file reply to his motion to stay (MRC) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY Memorandum by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 to response to motion to stay proceedings-for a period of 120 days [104-1] (MRC) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM Of Law by plaintiffs in 4:02-cv-01186 in opposition (with exhibits attached) to motion for joinder in defendants Kalkwarf's and Bardford's "Motion to Stay and Memorandum In Support [107-1], to motion for leave to make ex parte in camera submission in support of his motion to stay the proceedings [106-1], to motion for leave to to make ex parte in camera submission in support of motion to stay the proceedings [105-1], to motion to stay proceedings-for a period of 120 days [104-1] (MRC) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 for joinder in defendants Kalkwarf's and Bardford's "Motion to Stay and Memorandum In Support (MRC) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 for leave to make ex parte in camera submission in support of his motion to stay the proceedings (MRC) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186 for leave to to make ex parte in camera submission in support of motion to stay the proceedings (MRC) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 to stay proceedings-for a period of 120 days with Memorandum In Support (MRC) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Paul E. Martin in 4:02-cv-01186 on 6/19/03 certified mail by serving Theodore MacDonald, attorney (MRC) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Bill Shreffler in 4:02-cv-01186 on 7/8/03 certified mail by serving S. Todd Hamby, attorney (MRC) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE executed upon defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 on 6/19/03 certified mail by serving David Harlan, attorney for David McCall (MRC) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Chris Fenger in 4:02-cv-01186 on 7/8/03 certified mail by serving S. Todd Hamby, attorney for Chris Fenger (MRC) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Bill Shreffler in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Chris Fenger in 4:02-cv-01186 by David V. Capes, Gary R. Sarachan, S. Todd Hamby (MRC) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant David G. Barford in 4:02-cv-01186 by Jeffrey T. Demerath, Tina R. Carter (MRC) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant David L. McCall in 4:02-cv-01186 by David W. Harlan, Jennifer E. Hoekel (MRC) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP in 4:02-cv-01186 by Glenn E. Davis, John J. Tharp, Jonathan C. Medow, Mark D. Brookstein, James C. Schroeder (JWJ) Modified on 07/02/2003 (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw ;(SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply to the pretrial phase of the consolidated case, and to any cases which may later be transferred to this district as part of this Multi-District Litigation....I.)GENERAL PROVISIONS:CASES COVERED...the parties are advised that on October 14, 2003 the US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri will convert to the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) system, under which all pleadings, motions and other documents must be filed in electronic format. This case will be subject to the requirements of CM/ECF....As a result, all pleadings and other documents filed in this case on and after October 14, 2003 shall be filed electronically. Prior to that date, all documents will be filed in standard paper forman. For all documents filed electronically, a paper copy together with a copy of any exhibits shall be sent directly to chambers. II.)ORGANIZATION AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF COUNSEL ...III.) SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS...IV.) INITIAL SCHEDULING PLAN....1.Motions to stay -individual defendants and others as applicable shall file and serve any motions to stay this action with respect to them by July 18, 2003. Opposing memorand shall be filed and served by July 28, 2003. Reply memoranda shall be filed and served by August 4, 2003. 2.Motions to Dismiss-Defendant Charter Communications shall file and serve its motion to dismiss by August 11, 2003. All other defendants shall file and serve their motions to dismiss, if any, by August 25, 2003. Lead plaintiff's opposition to Charter's mtoion to dismiss shall be filed and served by September 26, 2003. Lead plaintiff's opposition to all other defendants' motions to dismiss shall be filed and served by October 10, 2003. Any reply memorandum shall be filed electronically and served by Charter by October 17, 2003. All other defendants' reply memoranda shall be filed electronically and served by October 31, 2003. 3. Joinder of Parties or Amendment of Pleadings-motions for leave to join additional parties or to amend pleadings shall be filed no later than 180 days after the court issues a ruling on the motion(s) to dismiss. 4.Class Certification Motion-Lead plaintiff shall filed and serve a motion seeking class certification within 20 days after the case is at issue. ....V.)MERITS DISCOVERY...VI.)EXPERT DISCOVERY...VII.)DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS..1.Schedule-Dispositive motions shall be filed electronically and served by October 31, 2004. Opposition memoranda shall be filed electronically and served by November 30, 2004. Reply memoranda shall be filed electronically and served by December 20, 2004. ORDER RELATING TO TRIAL: This action set for a jury trial on Monday, June 13, 2005. A final pretrial conference will be held on Thursday, June 2, 2005 at 10:30 am. complex(3) track , ; disp motion ddl 10/31/04 ; jury trial 6/13/05 ; pt comp ddl 5/4/05 ; final pre-trial conference 6/2/05 (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIPT # s2003-008224 in the amount of $ 50.00 for attorney phv admissions for attorneys Oscar Persons and Susan Hurd (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - LEAVE GRANTED (CAS). granting motion for attorney Oscar N. Persons to appear pro hac vice [92-1], granting motion for attorney Susan E. Hurd to appear pro hac vice [92-2] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Scientific-Atlanta in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Oscar N. Persons to appear pro hac vice with affidavit of attorney, and for attorney Susan E. Hurd to appear pro hac vice with affidavit of attorney (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Scientific-Atlanta in 4:02-cv-01186 by Richard H. Kuhlman (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 # Summons Issued: None # Waiver of Service Issued: None [1-1]; adding David G. Barford, Paul E. Martin, David L. McCall, Bill Shreffler, Chris Fenger, Scientific-Atlanta, Arthur Andersen, LLP to case(s) 4:02-cv-01186,; jury demand (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - This matter came before the court for a rule 16 scheduling conference on June 12, 2003. The parties appeared and were heard....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases are consolidated into case no. 4:02cv1186CAS: 4:02cv1197CAS,4:02cv1214CAS, 4:02cv1233CAS,4:02cv1357CAS,4:02cv1377CAS,4:02cv1381CAS, 4:02cv1478CAS,4:03cv377CAS,4:03cv414CAS,4:03cv540CAS, 4:03cv547CAS,4:03cv548CAS,4:03cv553CAS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall amend the caption of case 4:02cv1186CAS to read as follows: StoneRidge Investment Partners LLC,individually and on behald of all others similarly situated v. Charter Communications, Inc., et al.,Consolidated case no. 4:02cv1186CAS. The parties shall use the amended caption on all future pleadings, memoranda and documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all related cases which were consolidated into case no. 4:02cv1186cas are administratively closed, subject to reopening on motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that lead plaintiff Stoneridge Investment Partners is granted leave to file its consolidated class action complaint in accordance with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the local rules of this court shall apply to this case, as set forth in this order. Case consolidated 4:02-cv-1186 with member cases 4:03-cv-377, 4:03-cv-414, 4:03-cv-540, 4:03-cv-547, 4:03-cv-548, 4:03-cv-553 (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES: before Honorable Charles A. Shaw - Parties present for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 scheduling conference held in courtroom. In open court and on the record plaintiffs' mtoion to limit the scope of a confidentialty agreement signed by former Charter employees denied without prejudice by Court. In open court and on the record defendant Charter's motion to stay discovery pursuant to the provisions of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act denied without prejudice by Court. Case management order to follow. court reporter: Susan Moran; proceedings started: 11:00 am - ended: 12:30pm (MRC) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULED DOCUMENT/ ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - GRANTED (CAS). granting motion to withdraw attorneys/counsel in the law firms of Thompson Coburn, LLP; Irell & Manella,LLP; and Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson as counsel for defendant Kent Kalkwarf [85-1] attorney Roman P. Wuller for Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186, attorney Robert J. Wagner for Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186, attorney Kimber L. Lewis for Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186, attorney Sherri C. Strand for Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 by Robert T. Haar, Susan E. Bindler, Lisa A. Pake (MRC) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:03-cv-00414, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01214, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01233, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01357, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01377, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01381, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01478, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:03-cv-00540, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:03-cv-00547, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:03-cv-00548, defendant Kent Kalkwarf in 4:03-cv-00553 to withdraw attorneys/counsel in the law firms of Thompson Coburn, LLP;Irell & Manella,LLP; and Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson as counsel for defendant Kent Kalkwarf (MRC) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - This matter is before the Court on review of the file. On May 16, 2003, the clerk of the court received from counsel for lead plaintiff StoneRidge Investment Partners certain documents tendered for filing: Notices of filing proof of summons and complaint on new defendants Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. and Arthur Andersen LLP, certificates of service, and affidavits of service which reflect service on these entities of lead plaintiff's proposed consolidated class action complaint.....Lead plaintiff's filing of various notices and memoranda listed above is in violation of the stay imposed in this matter. The clerk of the court will be ordered to return these docuements to counsel for lead plaintiff. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall return to counsel for lead plaintiff StoneRidge Investment all documents received on May 16, 2003. Counsel are cautioned that future violations of the Court's orders may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to the imposition of monetary sanctions on parties or counsel. (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 05/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Honorable Charles A. Shaw ; complex(3) track , ; Rule 16 Conference 6/12/03 at 10:30 am ; joint scheduling plan ddl 6/2/03 (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to transfer cases pursuant to 28 USC 1407 is denied as moot. denying as moot motion to transfer cases pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 [0-1] (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407(a) by Honorable Charles A. Shaw - (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)....This order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to their order of March 12, 2003....Prior to the first pretrial conference service of all papers shall be made on each of the attorneys on the Panel Service List attached hereto as Schedule B....Any orders including protective orders previously entered by this Court or any transferor district court shall remain in full force and effect unless modified by this Court upon application...Prior to transfer and assignment of these actions to the undersigned, the seven cases originally filed in the US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri were consolidated into the first-filed case #4:02CV1186. By agreement of the parties in the consolidated case, the law firm of Pomerantz, Haudek, Block, Grossman & Gross of New York, New York was appointed lead counsel and the law firm of Wolff & D'Agrosa of St. Louis, Missouri was appointed liaison counsel, conditioned upon the Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation's decision to transfer the cases to this district. There firms are hereby appointed lead counsel and liaison counsel for these actions....All discovery proceedings in these actions are stayed until further order of this Court and the time requirements to perform any acts or file any papers pursuant to Rule 26 through 27 FRCVP are tolled until the first pretrial conference at which time a discovery schedule will be established. The time for all defendants to respond to the complaints in these actions is suspended until further order of this Court, and the time requirements to file any papers pursuant to Rule 12, FRCVP are tolled until the first pretrial conference at which time a pleading schedule will be established....The Court wil guided by the Manual for Complex Litigation, Third approved by the Judicial Conference of the United States, and counsel are directed to familiarize themselves with that publication...All other matters will be discusssed at the initial pretrial conference. An order setting the date of the initial conference will issue after all of the transfer cases are received in this district. Within 20 days of the date of this order, counsel shall furnish written suggestions for items to be included on the agenda for this conference. (cc: all counsel) (MRC) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN LETTER from Clerk to Bruce G. Murphy re: return of document"Notice of Appearance as counsel for Davey Young". Davey Young not a named party in the case. (cc: counsel of record) (MRC) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Multidistrict Litigation Judicial Panel - case consolidated with 4:03md1506. (KLK) (Entered: 04/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER ; Process Server: Rhonda Cidlik (MJM) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to defendant Jerald L. Kent in 4:02-cv-01186 ; # of summons issued: 1 # days to respond: 20 (MJM) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER ; Process Server: Rhonda Cidlik (MJM) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 ; # of summons issued: 1 # days to respond: 20 (MJM) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Honorable Henry E. Autrey IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Limit Charter's Confidentiality Agreement, and In Opposition to Charter's Request for a Stay in Investigative Interviews, [#73], is denied, without prejudice to refiling upon the resolution of the Motion to Transfer to the Multi-District Court. (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 for order expressly permitting former employees of Charter to be interviewed (MJM) (Entered: 02/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Carol E. Jackson re [0-1] Granting pro hac admission re: Tzivia Brody (ruling issued 9/30/02 and inadvertently placed in file; ruling faxed to attys 2/11/03) (cc: all counsel) (CEL) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Carol E. Jackson re [0-1] Granting motion for pro hac admission re: Aaron Brody (ruling issued 9/30/02 and inadvertently placed in file; ruling faxed to attys 2/11/03) (cc: all counsel) (CEL) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Carol E. Jackson re [0-1] Granting motion for admission pro hac re: Jules Brody (ruling issued 9/30/02 and inadvertently placed in file; ruling faxed to parties 2/11/03) (cc: all counsel) (CEL) Modified on 02/19/2003 (Entered: 02/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIPT # S2003-004016 in the amount of $ 75.00 for attorney admission for Jules Brody, Aaron Brody, and Tzivia Brody (MJM) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Henry E. Autrey ORDERED, GRANTING UNTIL 2/12/03 TO FILE SAID REPLY. mtn. to extend time to file reply to deft. Charter opposition to application of Stoneridge to limit scope of confidentiality agreements [67-1] (cc: all counsel) (CLA) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff in 4:02-cv-01186 to extend time to file reply to deft. Charter opposition to application of Stoneridge to limit scope of confidentiality agreements (CLA) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (Opp.) by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 to motion for expedited hearing on application of Stoneridge limit scope of confidentiality agreement [49-1] w/ Appendix A, Exhibits 1&2 attached. (MJM) (Entered: 01/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey The Order of January 16, 2003 appointing Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel and Liason Counsel is HEREBY made conditional upon the MDL Panel transfering lawsuits to this district. [64-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for January 16, 2003 order appointing lead counsel be made conditional on the MDL Panel transferring the lawsuits to this District (MJM) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for attorney David A. Schwarz to appear pro hac vice [59-1] in 4:02-cv-01186 (cc: all counsel) (CLA) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for attorney Craig Varnen to appear pro hac vice [58-1] in 4:02-cv-01186 (cc: all counsel) (CLA) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for attorney David Siegel to appear pro hac vice [57-1] in 4:02-cv-01186 (cc: all counsel) (CLA) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT # S2003-003145 in the amount of $ 75.00 for attorney admission for Craig Varnen, David Siegel, and David A. Schwarz (MJM) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney David A. Schwarz to appear pro hac vice (MJM) Modified on 01/17/2003 (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Craig Varnen to appear pro hac vice (MJM) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney David Siegel to appear pro hac vice (MJM) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Honorable Henry E. Autrey IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Stoneridge is hereby appointed as Lead Plaintiff; The Pomerantz Firm is hereby appointed as Lead Counsel; The firm of Wolff and D'Agrosa are hereby appointed Liaison Counsel IT IS SO ORDERED (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for consent to approve order appointing lead counsel [54-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Glickenhaus & Co in 4:02-cv-01186, movant AFA Mgt Partners in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Walter Mixson in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Edward Altomare in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Patrick Elliott in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Carlos Rodriguez in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Fred Rosenberg in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Tommiita Sengvilay in 4:02-cv-01186, movant Rudolph Wise in 4:02-cv-01186 for consent to approve order appointing lead counsel w/ Exhibit A attached (MJM) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by plaintiff Jill D. Martin in 4:02-cv-01186 to Show Cause Order of 12/20/02. (show cause Order in cause number 4:02CV1214) (MJM) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion to extend time until 1/28/03 to file its opposition to the application [51-1] (cc: all counsel) (CLA) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186 to extend time until 1/28/03 to file its opposition to the application (CLA) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM (in support) by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 re: motion for expedited hearing on application of Stoneridge to limit scope of confidentiality agreement [49-1] w/ Appendix A&B and proposed order attached. (MJM) (Entered: 12/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 for expedited hearing on application of Stoneridge to limit scope of confidentiality agreement w/ Declaration of Marc Gross, Gross Decl.'s A-D, Clarke Aff.'s A-C, and proposed order attached. (MJM) (Entered: 12/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL (in supp) by movant Glickenhaus & Co in 4:02-cv-01186 re motion to withdraw motion by AFA Management Partners, L.P. to appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel [32-1], [33-1] (MJM) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 to amend Exhibit A in its response dated 10/31/02 (Doc. No. 43) w/ proof of service attached (MJM) Modified on 11/13/2002 (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion to withdraw motion to appoint Glickenhaus & Co. as Lead Plaintiff filed 9/30/02, motion to vacate order appointing lead plaintiff (Doc. No. 36), response to defendants' motion to stay proceedings (Doc. No. 31), and joinder in defendants' opp. to Stoneridge's motion for reconsideration filed 10/28/02. [45-1] withdrawing motion reply [42-1], withdrawing motion to vacate order of 11/15/02 (Doc. No. 33) appointing lead plaintiff [36-1], withdrawing motion response [31-1], withdrawing motion for order appointing lead pltf and approval of lead and liason counsel [0-1] WITHDRAWL of all (4) Motions by Glickenhaus filed and GRANTED by Court (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by movant Glickenhaus & Co in 4:02-cv-01186 to withdraw motion to appoint Glickenhaus & Co. as Lead Plaintiff filed 9/30/02, motion to vacate order appointing lead plaintiff (Doc. No. 36), response to defendants' motion to stay proceedings (Doc. No. 31), and joinder in defendants' opp. to Stoneridge's motion for reconsideration filed 10/28/02. (MJM) (Entered: 11/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion to amend the complaint filed on 9/30/02 by adding attachments filed with this motion LEAVE GRANTED [0-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 to motion to transfer cases pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 [0-1] w/ declaration of Leigh R. Handelman and proof of service attached. (Original filed w/ judicial panel on multidistrict litigation) (MJM) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by movant Glickenhaus & Co in 4:02-cv-01186 to response to motion to vacate order of 11/15/02 (Doc. No. 33) appointing lead plaintiff [36-1] (MJM) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for attorney Marc Ian Gross to appear pro hac vice [38-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 to motion to vacate order of 11/15/02 (Doc. No. 33) appointing lead plaintiff [36-1] (MJM) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECEIPT # S2003-000807 in the amount of $ 25.00 for attorney admission for Marc Ian Gross (this was filed in cause # 4:02CV1478) (MJM) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Marc Ian Gross to appear pro hac vice this motion was filed in case # 4:02CV1478 (MJM) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (opposition) by plaintiff Stoneridge Invest in 4:02-cv-01186 to defendants motion to stay dated 10/8/02 w/declaration of Leigh Handelman in support attached. (MJM) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by movant Glickenhaus & Co in 4:02-cv-01186 to vacate order of 11/15/02 (Doc. No. 33) appointing lead plaintiff w/ memo in support and master service list attached (MJM) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AND MEMORANDUM by Honorable Henry E. Autrey IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings in this matter be and are STAYED, including motions related to appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, until such time as the Multi District Litigation Panel issues its decision on the transfer motion. [0-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Carl E. Vogel in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 (w/ attachments) (MJM) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC is appointed/designated as Lead plaintiff. The base firm of Pomerantz etc., appointed as Lead Counsel. (HEA) [32-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by movant AFA Mgt Partners in 4:02-cv-01186 to withdraw motion by AFA Management Partners, L.P. to appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel (MJM) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by movant Glickenhaus & Co in 4:02-cv-01186 to motion for stay pending determination of judicial panel on multidistrict litigation [0-1] (MJM) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for attorney John A. Reding to appear pro hac vice [27-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Henry E. Autrey granting motion for attorney Grace A. Carter to appear pro hac vice [26-1] (cc: all counsel) (MJM) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Carol E. Jackson Case transferred to Honorable Henry E. Autrey (cc: all counsel) (LLW) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Jerald L. Kent in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney John A. Reding to appear pro hac vice w/proposed order attached (PGD) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Jerald L. Kent in 4:02-cv-01186 for attorney Grace A. Carter to appear pro hac vice w/proposed order (PGD) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Honorable Carol E. Jackson (See Order for particulars) Case consolidated 4:02-cv-1186 with member cases 4:02-cv-1377, 4:02-cv-1381, 4:02-cv-1478 (cc: all counsel) (PGD) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Honorable Carol E. Jackson granting motion for extension of time up to and including forty-five days following filing and service of an amended and consolidated complaint to file an initial response herein [21-1] Pltf's shall have until 10/31/02 to file the consolidated amended complaint..FURTHER ordered that shall file their answer to pltfs complaint no later than 12/16/02 (cc: all counsel) (LLW) (Entered: 09/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Honorable Carol E. Jackson granting motion to consolidate case w/case 4:02CV1357 FRB [20-1] 4:02-cv-1186 with member cases 4:02-cv-1357 (cc: all counsel) (LLW) (Entered: 09/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Carl E. Vogel in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 for extension of time up to and including forty-five days following filing and service of an amended and consolidated complaint to file an initial response herein (JMW) (Entered: 09/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Jerald L. Kent in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Carl E. Vogel in 4:02-cv-01186, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf in 4:02-cv-01186 to consolidate case w/case 4:02CV1357 FRB w/Memo in Support and EXS 1-2 (LLW) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Carol E. Jackson granting motion to consolidate related cases [18-1] 4:02-cv-1186 with member cases 4:02-cv-1197, 4:02-cv-1214, 4:02-cv-1233 (cc: all counsel) (PGD) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Charter Comm Inc. to consolidate related cases with Memorandum in Support and Exhibits 1 thru 3 attached (JMW) Modified on 09/10/2002 (Entered: 09/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf on 9/5/02 by personal servie by serving Kent D. Kalkwarf by delivering said documents to Ms. Mary Spicuzza, Legal Asst., Charter Comm Inc. as the person authorized by said defendant to receive service of process Address 12405 Powerscourt Dr., St. Louis, MO 63131 (JMW) (Entered: 09/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Carl E. Vogel on 9/5/02 by personal service by serving Carl E. Vogel by delivering said documents to Ms. Mary Spicuzza, Legal Asst., Charter Comm. Inc. as a person authorized by said defendant to receive service of process Address 12405 Powerscourt Drive, St. Louis, MO 63131 (JMW) (Entered: 09/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Charter Comm Inc. on 9/5/02 by personal service by serving Linda Reisner, Vice President/Sr. Counsel Address 12405 Powerscourt Drive, St. Louis, MO 63131 (JMW) (Entered: 09/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Jerald L. Kent on 9/5/02 by personal service by serving Judith Kent, defendant's wife Address 13351 Buckland Hall Road (residence), St. Louis, MO 63131 (JMW) Modified on 09/10/2002 (Entered: 09/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULED DOCUMENT by Honorable Carol E. Jackson granting request [12-1] for an additional 45 days in which to file a response to the complaint GRANTED(cc: all counsel) (LLW) (Entered: 09/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST by defendant Charter Comm Inc., defendant Jerald L. Kent, defendant Carl E. Vogel, defendant Kent D. Kalkwarf for additional time of forty-five (45) days in which to file an initial response to the Complaint (JMW) (Entered: 08/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Pursuant to the Recusal Order dated 8/21/02, this case has been randomly reassigned to Honorable Carol E. Jackson (cc: all counsel) (LAH) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Mag Judge Mary Ann L. Medler This matter is before the court on its own motion. I have reviewed the pleadings and all documents in the file and based thereon, I have determined that I should not preside in this case because of a conflict of interest or an appearance of impropriety. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court shall draw the name of another Judge for assignment of this case. (cc: all counsel) (ARL) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRO HAC VICE LETTER sent by clerk w/motion and copy of local rules, to attorney Paul Geller (SET) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRO HAC VICE LETTER sent by clerk w/motion and copy of local rules, to attorney Sean Handler (SET) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE LETTER sent by clerk w/motion and copy of local rules, to attorney Darren Check (SET) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO HAC VICE LETTER sent by clerk w/motion and copy of local rules, to attorney Marc Topaz (SET) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez re: case filed (SET) (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIPT # S2002-8842 in the amount of $ 150.00 for filing fee (SET) (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRACK INFORMATION STATEMENT filed by plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez track 3 preferred (SET) Modified on 08/07/2002 (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER ; Process Server: Steve Feltner (SET) Modified on 08/07/2002 (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT; # Summons Issued: 4 # Days to Respond: 20 # Counts: 4 # Consents: 5 Disclosure of Corp Cert issued to: Charter Communications; jury demand exhibits attached: 1 (SET) (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 403 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?