Echols et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00319
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:54 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Antione Echols, Plaintiff

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kira Dale Pfisterer +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 kdp@hepworthlaw.com

Represented by Janet Jenner and Suggs LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Keith Jenner +1 410 653 3200 +1 410 653 6903 rjenner@myadvocates.com
No Logo Sierra Echols, Plaintiff

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kira Dale Pfisterer +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 kdp@hepworthlaw.com

Represented by Janet Jenner and Suggs LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Keith Jenner +1 410 653 3200 +1 410 653 6903 rjenner@myadvocates.com
v.
GlaxoSmithKline LLC GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Defendant
No Logo Sandoz, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Order CTO
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Robert K Jenner for Antione Echols and Sierra Echols. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 14 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?