Ermold et al v. Davis et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-00046
District Judge David L. Bunning, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 6, 2017 at 11:13 PM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Ermold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph D. Buckles, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Daniel Buckles +1 859 225 9540 +1 859 255 5508 joe@joebuckles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by tpslawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Paul Szczygielski +1 859 321 1822 +1 888 583 7089 tom@tpslawoffice.com
No Logo David Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph D. Buckles, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Daniel Buckles +1 859 225 9540 +1 859 255 5508 joe@joebuckles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by tpslawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Paul Szczygielski +1 859 321 1822 +1 888 583 7089 tom@tpslawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Kim Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Law Group, P.S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Charles Donahue +1 606 677 2741 +1 606 678 2977 acdonahue@donahuelawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LIBERTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Christman +1 800 671 1776 +1 407 875 0770 jchristman@lc.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger K. Gannam +1 800 671 1776 +1 407 875 0770 rgannam@lc.org
No Logo Kim Davis, Official Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Law Group, P.S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Charles Donahue +1 606 677 2741 +1 606 678 2977 acdonahue@donahuelawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LIBERTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Christman +1 800 671 1776 +1 407 875 0770 jchristman@lc.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger K. Gannam +1 800 671 1776 +1 407 875 0770 rgannam@lc.org
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Discovery Status Conference re 41 MOTION for Protective Order by Kim Davis, Kim Davis AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION to Stay re 40 Notice of Appeal by Kim Davis, Kim Davis , 40 Notice of Appeal by David Ermold, David Moore (Gartland, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Protective Order by Kim Davis, Kim Davis AND ALTERNATIVE, MOTION to Stay re 40 Notice of Appeal by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 39 Order on Motion to Stay by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3884180. (Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: denying 30 Motion to Stay be and are denied; the Court's decision adjudicating the pending motions to dismiss will be issued forthwith. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/29/17. (SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 08/29/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Stay re 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Amended Complaint by Kim Davis, Kim Davis and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Amended Complaint filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Horatio G. Mihet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/11/17. (SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                AGREED ORDER; Dfts respective replies in support of her Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 29 and Motion to Stay pending disposition of Motion to dismiss and request for expedited consideration 30 shall be Replies due by 8/21/2017.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/10/17.(SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Horatio G. Mihet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3865614) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Mihet, Horatio) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Replies in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (#29) and Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Motion to Dismiss and Request for Expedited Consideration (#30) by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gannam, Roger) Modified on 8/10/2017 to add filers (SMT). Modified on 8/10/2017 (SMT). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Stay re 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Amended Complaint by Kim Davis, Kim Davis and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by David Ermold, David Moore. (Gartland, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Amended Complaint filed by David Ermold, David Moore. (Gartland, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Stay re 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Amended Complaint by Kim Davis, Kim Davis and Request for Expedited Consideration (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE by Kim Davis, Kim Davis of Unavailability of Counsel (Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kim Davis, Kim Davis, filed by David Moore, David Ermold. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Gov. Beshear's letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 - marriage license, # 3 Exhibit 3 - certificate of marriage, # 4 Exhibit 4 - article)(Gartland, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/8/2017 before Judge David L. Bunning: Plaintiff's unopposed oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted 1) defendants resp pleadings due 7/8/17 2) All Discovery due by 9/30/2017., 3) Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2017.).(Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman.). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/8/17. (SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Ermold, David Moore. (Gartland, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby scheduled for a Telephonic Status Conference on Thursday, June 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. The parties shall dial in to this conference call five (5) minutes before the scheduled time by following the steps herein. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 5/25/17.(KSS)cc: COR, Cov. Diary (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MANDATE of USCA as to 20 Notice of Appeal filed by David Ermold, David Moore. Mandate issued with no costs taxed (Attachments: # 1 6CCA Cover Letter)(KSS) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          INFORMATION COPY OF JUDGMENT of USCA as to 20 Notice of Appeal filed by David Ermold, David Moore Appeal REVERSE/REMAND (SMT) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            INFORMATION COPY OF OPINION of USCA as to 20 Notice of Appeal filed by David Ermold, David Moore Appeal REVERSE/REMAND for further proceedings consistent with this opinion (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter (Mandate to issue))(SMT) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 19 Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Motions,,,, by David Ermold, David Moore. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3589563. (Szczygielski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER; 1) In Miller, et al v Davis 0:15cv44; pla motion to certify a class 31 dft Kim Davis Motion to dismiss 32 dft Davis motion for Prel Inj 39 ; Third Party dft Beshear motion to dismiss 92 and dft Bevins Motion to dismiss 157 are DENIED AS MOOT 2) The Stays imposed in Ermold v Davis 0:15cv46 and Yates 0:15cv62 are LIFTED 3) In Ermold v Davis 0:15cv46 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, and 14 MOTION Briefing Schedule are DENIED AS MOOT 4) The CJA attorneys representing Rowan County Deputy Clerks be DISCHARGED from further service 5) the three actions are DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from Court's active docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/18/16.(SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan D. Christman terminated. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/13/16. (SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Jonathan D. Christman, Esq. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to 14 Motion Briefing Scheduling regarding dfts motion to dismiss or in alternative motion to clarify court's 8/26/15 order filed by David Ermold, David Moore. (Buckles, Joseph) Modified on 1/13/2016 to create link to the motion and add text (SMT). (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION Briefing Schedule by David Ermold, David Moore MOTION for Order filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION Briefing Schedule regarding dfts motion to dismiss by David Ermold, David Moore (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Buckles, Joseph). or in the alternative Added MOTION to clarify court's 8/26/15 Order on 12/9/2015 (SMT). (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER re 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis filed by Kim Davis ; briefing is STAYED pending review of the court's decision in Miller v. Davis by the 6CCA; a briefing schedule on the motions will be set by subsequent order after 6CCA renders its decision.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/26/15.(SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis filed by David Ermold, David Moore. (Buckles, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Order to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                  AGREED STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT; 1) pla comp was filed on 7/10/15 and served on Davis the same day, ddl to answer is 7/31/15; 2) ddl to answer in 0:15cv44 is 8/4/15; this stip does not affect any ddl in that matter 3) Davis has requested, and pla have agreed to stip to a brief ext to 8/4/15 the same date in the Miller case 4) parties stip to entry of an order by this court to ext Kim Davis answer due 8/4/2015; Kim Davis answer due 8/4/2015. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/30/15.(SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation
                                                                    Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/25/2015, Entered: 7/25/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Donahue, Anthony) (Entered: 07/25/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan D. Christman; granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger K. Gannam as counsel for Kim Davis. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/23/15. (SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                          MOTION for Roger K. Gannam to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3266639) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                            MOTION for Jonathan D. Christman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3266167) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Affidavit of Service
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kim Davis on 07/10/2015, filed by David Ermold, David Moore. (Szczygielski, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David L. Bunning for all further proceedings. Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/10/15.(SMT)cc: COR (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Summons Issued
                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Kim Davis, Kim Davis; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SMT) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3257752), filed by David Moore, David Ermold. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter of Governor Beshear, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(SMT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2015: # 4 Case Assignment) (SMT). (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 735 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?