Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. LOreal USA, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01416

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 2:21 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan +1 214 466 1278 +1 214 635 1831 niky.bukovcan@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com
v.
No Logo L'oreal Usa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mike Patterson, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Mike Patterson Mediation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Philip Patterson +1 903 592 4433 mike@mikepattersonmediation.com
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT L'OREAL USA, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric W. Buether, # 2 Exhibit 23 to Buether Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 24 to Buether Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 25 to Buether Declaration)(Buether, Eric) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?