DRAKE v. ALEXANDER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01353

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2019 at 12:22 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIANE ROARK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Fein +1 202 465 8727 bruce@feinpoints.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo ED LOOMIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Fein +1 202 465 8727 bruce@feinpoints.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo J. KIRK WIEBE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Fein +1 202 465 8727 bruce@feinpoints.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo THOMAS DRAKE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Fein +1 202 465 8727 bruce@feinpoints.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo WILLIAM BINNEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Fein +1 202 465 8727 bruce@feinpoints.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
v.
No Logo CHRIS INGLIS, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
No Logo KEITH ALEXANDER, Defendant
No Logo LANNY BREUER, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY"
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT S. MUELLER, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013
No Logo STEVEN TYRRELL, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "US. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"
No Logo VITO POTENZA, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Fein, Bruce)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILLIAM BINNEY, THOMAS DRAKE, ED LOOMIS, DIANE ROARK, J. KIRK WIEBE. Attorney Larry E. Klayman terminated. (Klayman, Larry)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Charging Lien by WILLIAM BINNEY, THOMAS DRAKE, ED LOOMIS, DIANE ROARK, J. KIRK WIEBE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Invoice)(Klayman, Larry)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons by WILLIAM BINNEY, THOMAS DRAKE, ED LOOMIS, DIANE ROARK, J. KIRK WIEBE (Fein, Bruce)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Fein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fein, Bruce) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/16/2015) (znmw).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/15. (lcrjl1, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4217104) filed by ED LOOMIS, DIANE ROARK, THOMAS DRAKE, J. KIRK WIEBE, WILLIAM BINNEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice to Counsel/Party of Designation of Related Civil Cases Pending)(Klayman, Larry)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 66 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?