Valdez et al v. National Security Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00584

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2018 at 2:36 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Darger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS HANSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross C. Anderson +1 801 746 6300
No Logo Deeda Seed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS HANSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross C. Anderson +1 801 746 6300
No Logo Howard Stephenson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS HANSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross C. Anderson +1 801 746 6300
No Logo Mary Josephine Valdez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS HANSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross C. Anderson +1 801 746 6300
No Logo Thomas Nelson Huckin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS HANSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross C. Anderson +1 801 746 6300
No Logo William Grant Bagley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS HANSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross C. Anderson +1 801 746 6300
v.
No Logo David Addington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline J. Anderson +1 202 305 8645 caroline.j.anderson@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Patton +1 202 305 7919 +1 202 305 2685 rodney.patton@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline J. Anderson +1 202 305 8645 caroline.j.anderson@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Patton +1 202 305 7919 +1 202 305 2685 rodney.patton@usdoj.gov
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Compel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Substitution of United States as defendant as to Count X and a portion of Count I of plaintiffs' amended complaint by David Addington, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Michael V. Hayden (Whitman, James) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support (joint Motion for an Interim Scheduling Order) filed by Defendant National Security Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, filed by National Security Agency.(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2016, re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Security Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation. The court hears oral argument and takes the matter under advisement. An order will be issued by the court. Attorney for Plaintiff: Ross Anderson; Attorney for Defendant: James Gilligan, Caroline Anderson. Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon.(mjm) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing RESET for 7/14/2016 at 1:30 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant National Security Agency. (Patton, Rodney) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support. Defendant's Reply is due by 3/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/11/2016. No attached document. (jag) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2016 at 1:30 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs William Grant Bagley, Daniel Darger, Thomas Nelson Huckin, Deeda Seed, Howard Stephenson, Mary Josephine Valdez. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum for the Heads of Executive Departments and Agencies Re: Freedom of Information Act, # 2 Supplement Memorandum for Heads of Departments and Agencies Re: President's Memorandum on Transparency and Open Government - Interagency Collaboration)(Anderson, Ross) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT for Constitutional, Common Law, and Statutory Violations, Seeking Damages, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand., filed by Thomas Nelson Huckin, Howard Stephenson, Daniel Darger, William Grant Bagley, Mary Josephine Valdez, Deeda Seed. (Anderson, Ross) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION to stay individual-capacity claims by David Addington, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Michael V. Hayden. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, James) Modified event type on 1/7/2016 (jds). (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by William Grant Bagley, Daniel Darger, Thomas Nelson Huckin, Deeda Seed, Howard Stephenson, Mary Josephine Valdez. (Anderson, Ross) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to National Security Agency. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael V. Hayden. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard B. Cheney. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to George W. Bush. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David Addington. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/24/2015. (jds) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against David Addington, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael V. Hayden, National Security Agency (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681068434) (Electronic document provided on disc.), filed by Thomas Nelson Huckin, Howard Stephenson, Daniel Darger, William Grant Bagley, Mary Josephine Valdez, Deeda Seed. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (eat) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?