J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Vega
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Western District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-05199

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 4:22 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Statement of Facts
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Statement of Facts
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 4, 2016. (rg)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Amend/Correct, Third Amended Answer may be filed by no later than August 4, 2016; See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 2, 2016. (rg)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearings
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Final Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Appear
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 13 Motion to Strike and 22 Motion for Leave to File; granting 11 Response/Motion to Extend Deadline ; denying 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 16, 2016. (src)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Appear by Telephone/Video Conference
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Leave
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Default
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Certificate
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?