District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Kazim Acar, et al v. Tesla Motors, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-17501

Tags
Last Updated December 18, 2018 at 12:12 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant - Appellee,
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E. Elder +1 310 203 7942
Space David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant - Appellee,
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E. Elder +1 310 203 7942
Space David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com
No Logo In Re: Telsa Motors, Inc. Securities Litigation,
No Logo Kazim Acar, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lionel Z. Glancy +1 310 201 9150
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
Space Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
Space Matthew L. Tuccillo +1 617 290 5687 matt.tuccillo@gmail.com
No Logo Pankaj Modi, M.d., Ph.d., On Behalf Of Themselves And All Others Similarly Situated, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lionel Z. Glancy +1 310 201 9150
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
Space Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
Space Matthew L. Tuccillo +1 617 290 5687 matt.tuccillo@gmail.com
No Logo William Landrum, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lionel Z. Glancy +1 310 201 9150
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
Space Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
Space Matthew L. Tuccillo +1 617 290 5687 matt.tuccillo@gmail.com
Nature of Suit 3850 - Securities Commodities Exchange
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:13-cv-05216-CRB
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:13-cv-05216-CRB
  Entries (264) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026973895
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026518742 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
RECEIVED (COPY) CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL. Record Part: State Lodged Docs, No. of Boxes: 1, Sealed: n. [9152177] (SOS) [Entered: 07/01/2014 10:16 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026235064 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
    Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time listed above with counsel to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Assistant immediately at Beatriz_Smith@ca9.uscourts.gov. On or before August 13, 2014, the parties shall provide the name and contact information of all counsel intending to participate in the conference to Beatriz_Smith@ca9.uscourts.gov. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. Date: August 20, 2014 Time: 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time [9182178] [14-16342, 14-16360, 14-16361, 14-16364] (OC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009025052598 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
      Lodged in camera and UNDER SEAL per 11/8/2012 order [38] Appellee USA in 10-50072 five copies of sealed district court records that the May 14, 2012 motion seeks to unseal. (to Records for merits panel) [8670377] [10-50029, 10-50052, 10-50058, 10-50059, 10-50062, 10-50064, 10-50072, 10-50076, 10-50113, 10-50115] (LA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009024519725 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
        Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on December 18, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at virna_sanchez@ca9.uscourts.gov. [8443727] (WL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009020507731 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
          Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [36] filed by Chinese Daily News, Inc. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [08-55483, 08-56740] (GLS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
            Filed Order for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH)The stay in the above matter is dissolved effective immediately. [8686084] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RP)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
              Received copy of Supreme Court opinion dated 06/26/2013. The judgment or mandate of this Court will not issue for at least twenty-five days pursuant to Rule 45. Should a petition for rehearing be filed timely, the judgment or mandate will be further stayed pending this Court's action on the petition for rehearing. Supreme Court No: 12-144. [8682306] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/14/2014. [9168286] (MNS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/11/2014. [9164878]--[Edited: attached correct PDF of letter. 07/11/2014 by RY] (TLB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/09/2014. [9162204] (TLB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Staci J. Pratt, Esquire for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Hawaii and American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. [9161692] (SJP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/07/2014. [9158230] (TLB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Monte N. Stewart for Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage and Craig G. Taylor for Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage. [9157665] (MNS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/4/2014, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellants Beverly Sevcik, Mary Baranovich, Antioco Carrillo, Theodore Small, Karen Goody, Karen Vibe, Fletcher Whitwell, Greg Flamer, Mikyla Miller, Katrina Miller, Adele Terranova, Tara Newberry, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Megan Lanz and Sara Geiger. [9156905] (TLB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/03/2014. [9156241] (MNS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/03/2014. [9155509] (MNS)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/02/2014. [9154529] (MNS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/27/2014. [9148663] (TLB)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/10/2014. [9125711] (TLB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/28/2014. [9110183] (TLB)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CB): Appellants’ motion to further expedite the calendaring of this appeal is granted. This appeal shall be placed on the September 2014 calendar. [9107944] (SM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell Motion for miscellaneous relief (motion requesting to schedule oral argument) . Date of service: 05/22/2014. [9106671]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 05/23/2014 by RY] (DP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dimitri D. Portnoi for Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell. Date of service: 05/22/2014. [9106555] (DP)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/21/2014. [9103718] (MNS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Counsel Mary E. McAlister has notified this court of Attorney Stephen M. Crampton’s departure from Liberty Counsel. Court records have been updated to reflect that Attorney Stephen M. Crampton is no longer counsel of record for amicus Liberty Counsel. Counsel Mary E. McAlister remains as counsel of record for amicus Liberty Counsel.[9103597] (WL)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/20/2014. [9102183] (TLB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Liberty Counsel Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 05/20/2014. [9101847] (MEM)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/16/2014. [9098128] (TLB)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/09/2014. [9089190] (TLB)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/06/2014. [9084929] (MNS)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/02/2014. [9080577] (TLB)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078458] (MNS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078454] (MNS)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078406] (MNS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9077354] (TLB)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/18/2014. [9063085] (TLB)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/02/2014. [9042054] (MNS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/02/2014 [9040848]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. Resent NDA. 04/03/2014 by RY] (TLB)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/31/2014. [9037752] (MNS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [159] submitted by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, The New York Times Company, The E.W. Scripps Company, The Washington Post, the California NewspaperPublishers Association, the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, the First Amendment Coalition, the Californ is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9374281] (GV) [Entered: 01/07/2015 02:56 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, ALEX KOZINSKI, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, MARSHA S. BERZON, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON, RICHARD R. CLIFTON, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, N. RANDY SMITH, MARY H. MURGUIA, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and PAUL J. WATFORD): The motion of the news organizations for leave to file an amicus brief in support of defendants Google, Inc., and Nakoula Basseley Nakoula is GRANTED. [9373533] (AF) [Entered: 01/07/2015 10:54 AM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [184] submitted by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Actors Equity Association and American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, International Federation of Actors, Alliance of Canadan Cinema Television and Radio Artists, Eqity UK; Media Entertainment and Arts Alliance- Equity Division (Australia & New Zealand ) and South African Guild of actors is filed. Within 2 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9340225] (WP) [Entered: 12/08/2014 11:14 AM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Actors' Equity Association, American Federation of Musicians, International Federation of Actors, ACTRA, Equity UK, MEAA - Equity Division, and South African Guild of Actors. Date of service: 12/05/2014. [9339636] [12-57302] (DWC) [Entered: 12/05/2014 08:40 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: wp): The clerk order issued on 11/26/14 [167] is amended to include International Documentary Association as one of the filing parties. [9337586] (WP) [Entered: 12/04/2014 02:23 PM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/28/2014. [8996775] (TLB)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [157] submitted by Professors Shyamkrishna Balganesh, Justin Hughes, Peter Menell and David Nimmer is filed. [9335895] (WP) [Entered: 12/03/2014 03:01 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellants’ unopposed motion for leave to file an oversized reply brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the brief. (Pro Mo) [8995953] (MS)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell. Date of service: 02/26/2014. [8993754] (TLB)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [175] submitted by Coalition for the Protection of Marriage is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8988515] (LA)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CB): The motion of the Coalition for the Protection of Marriage for leave to file a supplemental answering brief is granted. The brief previously received shall be filed. The optional reply brief is now due within 14 days after the date of this order. [8986657] (WL)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage. Date of service: 02/13/2014. [8978584] (MNS)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: tah): The appellants’ unopposed motion to expedite calendaring of case No. 12-17668 is granted. This case will be calendared as soon as possible. Appellee Brian Sandoval’s motion to withdraw the previously filed answering brief for case No. 12-17668 is granted. The Clerk vacates the portion of the January 7, 2013 order that ordered this case to be assigned to the same panel that will consider Jackson v. Fuddy, case Nos. 12-16995 and 12-16698. In the event the Jackson cases are not dismissed, the parties may file a renewed request to have those cases assigned to the panel that will consider the above-captioned appeal. [8975693] [12-17668, 12-16995, 12-16998] (MS)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973540] (TLB)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Brian E. Sandoval Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Brief]. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973022] (CWH)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [163] submitted by FILM INDEPENDENT, FREDRIK GERTTEN and MORGAN SPURLOCK is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9327660] (WP) [Entered: 11/26/2014 09:10 AM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [162] submitted by PROFESSORS OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9327636] (WP) [Entered: 11/26/2014 09:05 AM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [161] submitted by Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; Facebook Inc.; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Twitter, Inc.; is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9327568] (WP) [Entered: 11/26/2014 08:51 AM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [158] submitted by Floor64 Inc. and Organization for Transformative Works is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9327504] (WP) [Entered: 11/26/2014 08:29 AM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus Brief for review. Submitted by Amici Curiae FILM INDEPENDENT, FREDRIK GERTTEN, International Documentary Association and MORGAN SPURLOCK. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327392] [12-57302] (GLB) [Entered: 11/25/2014 06:54 PM]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professors of Intellectual Property Law. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327384] [12-57302] (JG) [Entered: 11/25/2014 06:45 PM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC, IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; And Twitter, Inc.. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327370] [12-57302] (APB) [Entered: 11/25/2014 06:17 PM]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David L. Hayes for Amicus Curiae Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; eBay Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; Twitter, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327309] [12-57302] (DLH) [Entered: 11/25/2014 05:14 PM]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by News Organizations. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327297] [12-57302] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. 11/26/2014 by TL] (KLS) [Entered: 11/25/2014 04:54 PM]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Floor64, Inc. and Organization for Transformative Works. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327274] [12-57302] (CRG) [Entered: 11/25/2014 04:45 PM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professors Shyamkrishna Balganesh, Justin Hughes, Peter Menell, and David Nimmer. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327214] [12-57302] (KS) [Entered: 11/25/2014 04:28 PM]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [154] submitted by Volunteer Lawyers for the Arts Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9327208] (WP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 04:27 PM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [138] submitted by the States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Idaho, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and Utah is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960231] (LA)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Volunteer Lawyers For the Art, Inc.. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9327169] [12-57302] (CSR) [Entered: 11/25/2014 04:18 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [151] submitted by Electronic Frontier Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union, Public Knowledge, New Media Rights, Center for Democracy and Technology, American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries, and Association of Research Libraries is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9326741] (WP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 02:53 PM]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [149] submitted by Public Citizen is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9326705] (WP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 02:46 PM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY, NEW MEDIA RIGHTS, AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND RESEARCH LIBRARIES, AND ASSOCIATION OF RESEARCH LIBRARIES. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9326620] [12-57302] (CM) [Entered: 11/25/2014 02:30 PM]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [148] submitted by Internet Law Professors is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9326616] (WP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 02:30 PM]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus Brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae Public Citizen. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9326420] [12-57302] (PAL) [Entered: 11/25/2014 01:55 PM]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Internet Law Professors. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9326410] [12-57302] (VB) [Entered: 11/25/2014 01:55 PM]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [145] submitted by Computer and Communications Industry Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9326381] (WP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 01:25 PM]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Computer and Communications Industry Association. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9326320] [12-57302] (MCS) [Entered: 11/25/2014 01:05 PM]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [143] submitted by Netflix, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 25 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9326075] (WP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 11:45 AM]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Netflix, Inc.. Date of service: 11/25/2014. [9325907] [12-57302] (MHP) [Entered: 11/25/2014 11:08 AM]
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Alan Glover Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Answering Brief; and Notice of Nonopposition to Appellants' Opening Brief]. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956630] (RRM)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Liberty Counsel. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956532]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Edited docket text to reflect brief submitted with consent. Resent NDA. 01/31/2014 by RY] (MEM)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Dr. Paul McHugh. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956177] (GVB)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professors of Social Science. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956076] (AJP)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jennifer S. Granick for Amicus Curiae PROFESSORS OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW. Date of service: 11/18/2014. [9318030] [12-57302] (JG) [Entered: 11/18/2014 06:59 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Alliance Defending Freedom. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956032] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8955149] (MNS)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Neal Katyal for Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC. [9313432] [12-57302] (NK) [Entered: 11/14/2014 12:17 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney M. Cris Armenta for Appellant Cindy Lee Garcia Date of service: 11/14/2014 [9313168] [12-57302] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 11/14/2014 by TL] (MCA) [Entered: 11/14/2014 10:39 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Alan Glover citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8954430] (RRM)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS): Oral argument in this en banc case will be held at 3:30 p.m. on Monday, December 15, 2014, in Courtroom 3 of the Richard H. Chambers Courthouse, located at 125 South Grand Avenue in Pasadena, California 91105. http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/information/locations.php [9312238] (AF) [Entered: 11/13/2014 03:13 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS): Any amicus curiae brief supporting the position of the petitioning party or not supporting either party must be served, along with any necessary motion, on or before November 25, 2014. Any amicus curiae brief supporting the position of the responding party must be served, along with any necessary motion, on or before December 5, 2014. See 9th Cir. R. 29-2(e)(2). [9309976] (AF) [Entered: 11/12/2014 02:12 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS): En banc oral argument will take place during the week of December 15, 2014, in Pasadena, California. The date and time will be determined by separate order. For further information or special requests regarding scheduling, please contact Deputy Clerk Paul Keller at paul_keller@ca9.uscourts.gov or (415) 355- 8026. Within seven days from the date of this order, the parties shall forward to the Clerk of Court twenty-five additional paper copies of the original briefs (including supplemental and amicus briefs) and excerpts of record. The paper copies must be accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. A sample certificate is available at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/datastore/uploads/cmecf/Certificate-for- Brief-in-Paper-Format.pdf. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9309306] (AF) [Entered: 11/12/2014 10:58 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [119] submitted by Ryan T. Anderson, Robert P. George and Sherif Girgis is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954399] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed Order for PUBLICATION (SIDNEY R. THOMAS) Upon the vote of a majority of nonrecused active judges, it is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(a) and Circuit Rule 35-3. The three-judge panel opinion shall not be cited as precedent by or to any court of the Ninth Circuit. Judges Wardlaw, Owens and Friedland did not participate in the deliberations or vote in this case. [9308925] (RP) [Entered: 11/12/2014 09:19 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order and amended opinion (ALEX KOZINSKI, RONALD M. GOULD and N. RANDY SMITH). The opinion and dissent filed February 26, 2014, and reported at 743 F.3d 1258, are amended to conform to the attached Amended Opinion and Amended Dissent, 12-57302. No further petitions for rehearing will be entertained. The petition for rehearing en banc remains pending. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [9164937] (PH) [Entered: 07/11/2014 08:35 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, RONALD M. GOULD and N. RANDY SMITH): Appellant’s motion to take judicial notice, filed April 3, 2014, is denied. [9155964] (AF) [Entered: 07/03/2014 01:09 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9074033] (NK) [Entered: 04/28/2014 10:39 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed letter dated 04/16/2014 form Kelli L. Sager, Esq. re: Please be advised that the list of amicus curiae news organization ("Media Amici') we represent in the above-referenced matter has changed. Please update Docket entries 81. 83, and 111 to remove The New York Times Company and California Broadcasters Association, and to add Advance Publications, Inc. and The Digital Media Law Project as Media Amici. Paper filing deficiency: None. [9070193] (RR) [Entered: 04/23/2014 04:15 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Pacific Justice Institute in Support of Defendants-Appellees and Affirmance. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8953258] (KTS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory D. Brown for Amicus Curiae State of California in 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028. Date of service: 08/25/2014. [9217498] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (GDB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Graham S. Henry Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Clarification]. Date of service: 12/30/2014. [9365508] [09-99007] (RCK) [Entered: 12/30/2014 11:37 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE ISSUED.(SRT, AK, KMW, WAF, RMG, MSB, RCT, CMC, CTB, MBC and JHN) [9365427] (EL) [Entered: 12/30/2014 11:04 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order filed for PUBLICATION (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, ALEX KOZINSKI, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RONALD M. GOULD, MARSHA S. BERZON, RICHARD C. TALLMAN, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, CARLOS T. BEA, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN)(SRT authoring) On April 8, 2014, a three-judge panel of this Court, with one judge dissenting, filed an order denying Henry’s motion for reconsideration of the panel’s November 1, 2013 order denying his petition for panel rehearing and a stay of proceedings pending the issuance of a decision by the en banc panel in McKinney v. Ryan, No. 09-99018, a case involving related issues. A judge of this Court sua sponte requested a vote as to whether the panel’s April 8, 2014, order should be reheard en banc. A majority of the nonrecused active judges voted in favor of rehearing the order en banc. On September 4, 2014, an order was issued granting en banc review. Subsequently, upon the vote of a majority of the nonrecused active judges, this case was designated as a related case to McKinney and consolidated for rehearing en banc before the same en banc panel. See Ninth Circuit Rule 35-3. On December 15, 2014, in Pasadena, California, the en banc panel heard oral argument in McKinney and held a subsequent conference on both the McKinney and Henry cases. Having heard the argument in McKinney, and having considered the record and the briefs filed by the parties in this case, the Court concludes that: (1) the facts and legal arguments are adequately presented in the briefs and record, and that the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument; and (2) a stay of proceedings and further en banc consideration in Henry is not necessary to secure or maintain the uniformity of the Court’s decisions. Therefore, this case is submitted for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2). Henry’s motion for a stay of proceedings pending the issuance of a decision in McKinney is DENIED. En banc proceedings in this case are concluded. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate. [] [9364891] (RP) [Entered: 12/30/2014 07:19 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 12/08/2014 re: The Court has directed this office to request that the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit file a response to the petition. The response may be in the form of a letter addressed to the Clerk of this Court. Ten copies of the response, together with proof of service therefore, should be filed on or before January 7, 2015. [9340916] (RR) [Entered: 12/08/2014 02:54 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Charles L. Ryan Correspondence: Notice of Filing Reply to Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandmus and/or Prohibition. Date of service: 11/21/2014 [9322822] [09-99007] (LSG) [Entered: 11/21/2014 04:04 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Charles L. Ryan Correspondence: Notice of Filing Docketing Letter from United States Supreme Court. Date of service: 10/08/2014 [9269914] (LSG) [Entered: 10/08/2014 10:58 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Todd R. Gregorian for Amicus Curiae Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; eBay Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; Twitter, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc. Date of service: 04/16/2014. [9060720] (TRG) [Entered: 04/16/2014 02:23 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kathryn J. Fritz for Amicus Curiae Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; eBay Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; Twitter, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc. Date of service: 04/16/2014. [9060707] (KJF) [Entered: 04/16/2014 02:19 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew P. Bridges for Amicus Curiae Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; eBay Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; Twitter, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc. Date of service: 04/16/2014. [9060703] (APB) [Entered: 04/16/2014 02:17 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants C.D. and K.D. in 13-16929. Date of service: 07/15/2014. [9170074] [13-16929, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16936, 13-17028]--[Edited: Unapplied filing from 13-17097 (case closed). 07/15/2014 by RY] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 07/17/2014 by TL] (RCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed Order for PUBLICATION (ALEX KOZINSKI)(Concurrence by Judge W. Fletcher and Dissent by Judge Tallman)(SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) Upon the vote of a majority of nonrecused active judges, it is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(a) and Circuit Rule 35-3. The April 8, 2014, three-judge panel order denying Henry’s motion to reconsider the panel’s November 1, 2013, order denying the petition for panel rehearing shall not be cited as precedent by or to any court of the Ninth Circuit. Judges Murguia and Friedland did not participate in the deliberations or vote in this case. [9228736] (RP) [Entered: 09/04/2014 01:55 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Graham S. Henry reply to response (). Date of service: 06/18/2014. [9136864] (RCK) [Entered: 06/18/2014 10:33 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [103] submitted by Internet Law Professors is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9058275] (RL) [Entered: 04/15/2014 10:36 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 06/09/2014. Supreme Court number 13-9512. (Panel: RCF, RCT and CMC). [9127343] (RR) [Entered: 06/10/2014 04:23 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [102] submitted by PROFESSORS OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9058247] (RL) [Entered: 04/15/2014 10:30 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Graham S. Henry Correspondence: Notice of Case Distribution. Date of service: 05/23/2014 [9107129] (RCK) [Entered: 05/23/2014 12:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [101] submitted by Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; eBay Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; Twitter, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9058066] (JFF) [Entered: 04/15/2014 09:45 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Graham S. Henry Correspondence: Notice of withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 05/02/2014. [9081383]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF event. 05/02/2014 by RY] (RCK) [Entered: 05/02/2014 01:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Internet Law Professors. Date of service: 04/14/2014. [9057790] (VB) [Entered: 04/14/2014 07:32 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by PROFESSORS OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW. Date of service: 04/14/2014. [9057744] (JAA) [Entered: 04/14/2014 05:50 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Adobe Systems Inc.; Automattic Inc.; eBay Inc.; Facebook Inc.; Gawker Media, LLC; IAC/InterActiveCorp; Kickstarter, Inc.; Pinterest Inc.; Tumblr Inc.; Twitter, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc.. Date of service: 04/14/2014. [9057723] (APB) [Entered: 04/14/2014 05:29 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 03/31/2014. Supreme Court Number 13-9512. [9044856] (RR) [Entered: 04/04/2014 11:40 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph C. Gratz for Amicus Curiae Netflix, Inc.. Date of service: 04/14/2014. [9057626] (JG) [Entered: 04/14/2014 04:35 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael H. Page for Amicus Curiae Netflix, Inc.. Date of service: 04/14/2014. [9057617] (MHP) [Entered: 04/14/2014 04:32 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [88] submitted by FILM INDEPENDENT, FREDRIK GERTTEN, International Documentary Association and MORGAN SPURLOCK is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9057562] (MT) [Entered: 04/14/2014 04:22 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [88] submitted by A&E Television Networks, Advance Publications, Inc., Disarming Films, ITV Studios America, Los Angeles Times, National Public Radio, Radio Television Digital News Association, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Washington Post is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9475578] (LA) [Entered: 03/27/2015 04:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) The motion for leave to file a brief amici curiae in support of petition for rehearing en banc by Advance Publications, A&E Television Networks, Disarming Films, ITV Studios America, The Los Angeles Times, National Public Radio, The Radio Television Digital News Association, The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and The Washington Post, filed January 30, 2015, is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the brief and circulate it to the court. [9474278] (WL) [Entered: 03/27/2015 08:37 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Michael E. Davis, Billy Joe Dupree and Vince Ferragamo response to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing). Date of service: 03/13/2015. [9457540]. [12-15737] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 03/16/2015 by TL] (BDH) [Entered: 03/13/2015 05:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) Within 21 days of the date of this order, Appellees are directed to file a response to the Appellant’s Petition for Rehearing En Banc, filed with this court on January 20, 2015. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. [9428992] (SM) [Entered: 02/20/2015 04:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Qualcomm, Inc. Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 05/05/2015. [9526027] [14-35393] (SS) [Entered: 05/05/2015 03:28 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kelli L. Sager for Appellant Electronic Arts Inc.. Date of service: 02/11/2015. [9418755] [12-15737] (KLS) [Entered: 02/11/2015 05:39 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Carter Glasgow Phillips for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. [9459925] [14-35393] (CGP) [Entered: 03/17/2015 09:23 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Kathleen M. Sullivan for Appellants General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola, Inc.. [9459866] [14-35393] (KMS) [Entered: 03/17/2015 09:04 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS, DISARMING FILMS, ITV STUDIOS AMERICA, THE LOS ANGELES TIMES, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, THE RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, THE REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS AND THE WASHINGTON POST. Date of service: 01/30/2015. [9403701] [12-15737] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief and motion. 01/30/2015 by TL] (NES) [Entered: 01/30/2015 04:26 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Carter Glasgow Phillips for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. [9422183] [14-35393] (CGP) [Entered: 02/17/2015 05:07 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Kathleen M. Sullivan for Appellants General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola, Inc.. [9421303] [14-35393] (KMS) [Entered: 02/13/2015 12:55 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [82] submitted by California Broadcasters Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9056644] (RL) [Entered: 04/14/2014 11:54 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Oral argument will be held at 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 8, 2015, in Courtroom One of the James R. Browning United States Courthouse, 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, California. Each side will be allotted twenty (20) minutes to present its arguments. [9417639] (SM) [Entered: 02/11/2015 10:47 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The previous panel has retained jurisdiction of this appeal. Oral argument, if any, will be set in due course. [9384570] (SM) [Entered: 01/15/2015 02:33 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Broadcasters Association. Date of service: 04/11/2014. [9055925]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed motion to become amicus (not required per order [61]). Resent NDA. 04/14/2014 by RY] (LSB) [Entered: 04/11/2014 05:59 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The reply brief [80] submitted by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9365975] (GV) [Entered: 12/30/2014 02:21 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Kelly M. Klaus, Esquire for Appellants Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. in 13-16106, Attorney Mr. Kelly M. Klaus, Esquire for Appellees Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. in 13-16107. [9591935] [13-16106, 13-16107] (KMK) [Entered: 06/29/2015 01:37 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Defendants-Appellants’ Motion to Transmit Physical Exhibit is GRANTED. [9521844] [13-16106, 13-16107] (AF) [Entered: 05/01/2015 09:16 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Corynne McSherry for Appellee Stephanie Lenz in 13-16106, Attorney Corynne McSherry for Appellant Stephanie Lenz in 13-16107. [9517435] [13-16106, 13-16107] (CM) [Entered: 04/28/2015 01:44 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Melinda Eades LeMoine for Appellants Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. in 13-16106. [9516271] [13-16106, 13-16107] (MEL) [Entered: 04/27/2015 03:59 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) Anna Smith’s motion to amend the schedule for supplemental briefing is DENIED. [9571030] (WL) [Entered: 06/11/2015 01:07 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Stephanie Lenz in 13-16107 Correspondence: Letter to Court regarding Unavailability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 04/08/2015 [9488561] [13-16106, 13-16107] (CM) [Entered: 04/08/2015 02:40 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) Anna Smith challenges the constitutionality of the collection of metadata pursuant to § 215 of the USA PATRIOT Act, codified at 50 U.S.C. § 1861, which ceased to have effect on May 31, 2015. On June 2, 2015, the 114th Congress passed, and the President signed, the USA FREEDOM Act, which significantly alters procedures for the retention and query of telephony metadata. See H.R. 2048, 114th Cong. (2015) (enacted); 161st Cong. Rec. S3419-635 (daily ed. June 2, 2015). Now, key parts of § 215 are no longer operative. The parties are directed to submit supplemental briefing not to exceed ten pages on: (1) whether Smith’s claim for a declaration that § 215 violates the Fourth Amendment of the Constitution and her request for a preliminary and permanent injunction preventing the United States from collecting her metadata should be dismissed as moot given that § 215, as it existed at the time of the district court’s June 3, 2014 order and at the time of briefing and argument in this court, has ceased to have effect; and (2) whether Smith’s request for an order requiring the United States “to purge all . . . metadata of . . . Smith’s communications” collected pursuant to § 215 is also moot or should be remanded to the district court to determine whether such a remedy is available. The parties shall submit such supplemental briefs no later than Friday, June 19, 2015. [9560940] (SM) [Entered: 06/03/2015 04:26 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. in 13-16106, Appellees Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. in 13-16107 Correspondence: Letter to Court regarding Unavailability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 03/05/2015 [9446593] [13-16106, 13-16107] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct party filers. 03/05/2015 by TL] (KMK) [Entered: 03/05/2015 11:40 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Stephanie Lenz in 13-16106, Appellant Stephanie Lenz in 13-16107 Correspondence: Letter to Court of Unavailability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 03/05/2015 [9446363] [13-16106, 13-16107] (CM) [Entered: 03/05/2015 10:30 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Universal Music Corp. in 13-16106 Correspondence: Letter to Court regarding Unavailability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 01/27/2015 [9397004] [13-16106, 13-16107] (KMK) [Entered: 01/27/2015 10:10 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. in 13-16106, Appellees Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. in 13-16107 Correspondence: Letter re: Unavailability. Date of service: 01/08/2015 [9375773] [13-16106, 13-16107] (KMK) [Entered: 01/08/2015 03:24 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Stephanie Lenz in 13-16106, Appellant Stephanie Lenz in 13-16107 Correspondence: Letter of Unavailability. Date of service: 01/08/2015 [9374982] [13-16106, 13-16107] (CM) [Entered: 01/08/2015 10:36 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JN): Appellants’ motion to transmit physical exhibit pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 27-14 is referred to the merits panel. [9060206] [13-16106, 13-16107] (AF) [Entered: 04/16/2014 11:13 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed ( UNDER SEAL ) original and 7 copies of Stephanie Lenz cross-appeal reply brief. (Informal: No). 29 pages. Served on: 03/20/2014. [9030978] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 03/25/2014 03:20 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Appellee Stephanie Lenz notification of the necessity to file Under Seal cross-appeal reply brief. [9030938] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 03/25/2014 03:11 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Mr. H. Thomas Byron, III for Appellees Keith B. Alexander, James R. Clapper, James B. Comey, Charles T. Hagel, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Barack Obama. [9318715] [14-35555] (HB) [Entered: 11/19/2014 11:52 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The cross-appeal reply brief [63] submitted by Stephanie Lenz is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9025592] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 03/21/2014 10:02 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Cross-Appeal Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Stephanie Lenz in 13-16106, Appellant Stephanie Lenz in 13-16107. Date of service: 03/20/2014. [9024563] [13-16106, 13-16107] (MSK) [Entered: 03/20/2014 02:16 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [56] submitted by Apple, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9325317] (GV) [Entered: 11/24/2014 05:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received Appellants Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. notice regarding notification to file Under Seal Third brief on cross-appeal.. [8970991] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 02/07/2014 02:43 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Anna Jo Smith. Date of service: 10/16/2014. [9279412] (PJS) [Entered: 10/16/2014 02:03 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mark C. Rifkin for Appellants Thomas Buchar and Zack Ward. [9321703] [12-17805] (MCR) [Entered: 11/21/2014 09:24 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The third brief on cross-appeal [56] submitted by Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: yellow. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8967625] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 02/05/2014 03:39 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC petition for rehearing en banc (from 02/26/2014 opinion). Date of service: 03/12/2014. [9013768] (NK) [Entered: 03/12/2014 08:06 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellants Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Publishing Inc. in 13-16106. Date of service: 02/04/2014. [8966044] [13-16106, 13-16107] (KMK) [Entered: 02/04/2014 04:46 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 09/09/2013. [8773961] (RM) [Entered: 09/09/2013 11:44 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Brief in response to 3/6/14 order. Submitted by Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC. Date of service: 03/12/2014. [9013700]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [52].]--[Edited: Attached corrected brief. 03/12/2014 by RY] (RY) [Entered: 03/12/2014 05:13 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [49] submitted by International Documentary Association and Organization for Transformative Works, International Documentary Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8904441] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 12/17/2013 10:23 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Michael D. Hausfeld for Appellee Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. in 14-16601, 14-17068. [9398682] [14-16601, 14-17068] (MDH) [Entered: 01/28/2015 06:54 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [48] submitted by Automattic Inc., Google Inc., Tumblr, Inc. and Twitter, Inc is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8904342] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 12/17/2013 09:57 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Chinatown Neighborhood Association and Asian Americans For Political Advancement petition for panel rehearing (from 07/27/2015 opinion). Date of service: 07/27/2015. [9641688] [14-15781] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached declaration. 08/11/2015 by TYL] (MT) [Entered: 08/10/2015 11:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Chinatown Neighborhood Association and Asian Americans For Political Advancement Unopposed Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 08/20/2015. Date of service: 08/04/2015. [9634546] [14-15781] (MT) [Entered: 08/04/2015 03:01 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED OPINION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, JOHN T. NOONAN and ANDREW D. HURWITZ). Judge: SR Dissenting, Judge: ADH Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9622645] (RP) [Entered: 07/27/2015 09:10 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Charlton H. Bonham and Kamala Harris citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/02/2015. [9482224] [14-15781] (ARG) [Entered: 04/02/2015 02:40 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Asian Pacific American Ocean Harmony Alliance, Humane Society of the United States and Monterey Bay Aquarium Foundation citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/02/2015. [9481949] [14-15781] (BAW) [Entered: 04/02/2015 01:05 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Chinatown Neighborhood Association and Asian Americans For Political Advancement citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/25/2015. [9472643] [14-15781] (MT) [Entered: 03/25/2015 11:58 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Received Appellee Stephanie Lenz Notification of the necessity to file Under Seal the second brief on cross-appeal and the excerpts. [8899271] [13-16106, 13-16107] (WP) [Entered: 12/12/2013 01:12 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, RAYMOND C. FISHER and ANDRE M. DAVIS): Appellee’s motion to stay the mandate is GRANTED. The mandate is stayed until November 3, 2015. If Appellee files a motion to extend the time for filing a petition for certiorari or a petition for certiorari on or before that date, the stay shall continue until final disposition by the Supreme Court. See Fed. R. App. P. 41(d). [9643997] (AF) [Entered: 08/12/2015 10:04 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Freeman Marine Equipment, Inc. Motion to stay the mandate. Date of service: 08/11/2015. [9643176] [13-35163] (JWB) [Entered: 08/11/2015 03:19 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, RAYMOND C. FISHER and ANDRE M. DAVIS) The petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc is DENIED. [9635163] (OC) [Entered: 08/05/2015 09:32 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Freeman Marine Equipment, Inc. petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 06/29/2015 opinion). Date of service: 07/13/2015. [9608552] [13-35163] (JWB) [Entered: 07/13/2015 03:59 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant CHMM, LLC bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 221.70 USD. Date of service: 07/06/2015 [9599152] [13-35163] (BE) [Entered: 07/06/2015 12:44 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED OPINION (ALEX KOZINSKI, RAYMOND C. FISHER and ANDRE M. DAVIS) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: AK Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9590925] (RP) [Entered: 06/29/2015 08:27 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, JOHN T. NOONAN and ANDREW D. HURWITZ) The motion for extension of time to file and motion for leave to file brief amicus curiae brought by Natural Resources Defense Council is granted. [9425610] (SM) [Entered: 02/18/2015 04:04 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant’s unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the oversized opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due September 4, 2015. The answering brief is due October 5, 2015. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. (Pro Mo) [9650531] (MS) [Entered: 08/18/2015 09:59 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Mohamed Osman Mohamud Unopposed Motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 07/17/2015. Date of service: 08/14/2015. [9647351] [14-30217] (LCH) [Entered: 08/14/2015 10:37 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant’s motion for leave to file an oversized opening brief of 230 pages is granted in part. Within 28 days after the date of this order, appellant shall file an opening brief not to exceed 180 pages using the same font and spacing. Appellee’s motion for an extension of time until December 7, 2015 to file the answering brief is granted. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Appellant’s motion for leave to file a supplement to the opening brief under seal is granted. The Clerk shall file under seal the supplemental opening brief submitted on May 29, 2015. (Pro Mo) [9614066] (AF) [Entered: 07/17/2015 02:17 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 12/08/2015. Date of service: 06/10/2015. [9568677] [14-30217] (KAZ) [Entered: 06/10/2015 10:14 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Oral argument will be held at 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, March 18, 2015, in Courtroom One of the James R. Browning United States Courthouse, 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, California. Each side will be allotted twenty (20) minutes to present its arguments. [9395743] (SM) [Entered: 01/26/2015 01:41 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Oral argument in this case will take place during the week of March 16, 2015, in San Francisco, California. The date and time will be determined by separate order. [9369513] (SM) [Entered: 01/05/2015 09:54 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan W. Bounds for Appellee USA. Date of service: 06/08/2015. [9565941] [14-30217] (RWB) [Entered: 06/08/2015 04:03 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The reply brief [28] submitted by Asian Americans For Political Advancement and Chinatown Neighborhood Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9322193] (GV) [Entered: 11/21/2014 11:59 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Asian Americans For Political Advancement and Chinatown Neighborhood Association. Date of service: 11/21/2014. [9321938] [14-15781] (JMB) [Entered: 11/21/2014 10:43 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Crocker for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties, American Civil Liberties and Electronic Frontier Foundation. Date of service: 06/04/2015. [9562127] [14-30217] (AGC) [Entered: 06/04/2015 02:49 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark Rumold for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties, American Civil Liberties and Electronic Frontier Foundation. Date of service: 06/04/2015. [9562120] [14-30217] (MTR) [Entered: 06/04/2015 02:47 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant CHMM, LLC. Date of service: 09/30/2013. [8803388] (AJP) [Entered: 09/30/2013 09:13 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alexander Abdo for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties, American Civil Liberties and Electronic Frontier Foundation. Date of service: 06/04/2015. [9561766] [14-30217] (AAA) [Entered: 06/04/2015 12:42 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jameel Jaffer for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties, American Civil Liberties and Electronic Frontier Foundation. Date of service: 06/04/2015. [9561762] [14-30217] (JJ) [Entered: 06/04/2015 12:37 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [18] submitted by NACDL is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9560767] (WP) [Entered: 06/03/2015 03:29 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alfred Vargas for - Ateco, Inc. and Appellee Ateco, Inc.. Date of service: 01/16/2014. [8942465] (AV) [Entered: 01/16/2014 05:44 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [17] submitted by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties of Oregon and Electronic Frontier Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9560750] (WP) [Entered: 06/03/2015 03:25 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Appellant CHMM, LLC excerpts of record [15] in 2 volumes. Served on 08/15/2013. Deficiencies: excerpts of record pages are double-sided. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [8753205] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2013 03:02 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The opening brief [17] submitted by Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [17] submitted by Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9655430] (WP) [Entered: 08/21/2015 09:05 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Date of service: 08/20/2015. [9654008] [14-17501] (MLT) [Entered: 08/20/2015 11:38 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant CHMM, LLC. Date of service: 08/15/2013. [8743644] (AJP) [Entered: 08/15/2013 07:42 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Michael Goldberg from Action. Date of service: 08/06/2015 [9637398] [14-17501] (RVP) [Entered: 08/06/2015 01:34 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The court is in receipt of the appellants’ status report. The stay of appellate proceedings is lifted. The opening brief is due August 20, 2015. The answering brief is due September 21, 2015, and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9597539] (SML) [Entered: 07/02/2015 01:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028688293 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MANDATE ISSUED. CFL, SPG and ADH. Costs are taxed against Appellants in the amount of $124.00. [10264232] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028688045 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE ISSUED.(CFL, SPG and ADH) Costs taxed against Appellants in the amount of $61.60. [10264111] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028664597 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc. bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 198.9 USD. Date of service: 01/04/2017 [10253783] [14-17501] (Elder, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Kazim Acar status report (as required by Court order dated 02/13/2015). Date of service: 06/30/2015 [9592941] [14-17501] (MLT) [Entered: 06/30/2015 07:46 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028635707 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (CARLOS F. LUCERO, SUSAN P. GRABER and ANDREW D. HURWITZ) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10241397] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO CARLOS F. LUCERO, SUSAN P. GRABER and ANDREW D. HURWITZ. [10235025] (KT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Terminated Colin T. Roth for Tesla Motors, Inc. and Elon Musk in 14-17501 (No longer with firm) [10168354] (TYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Correspondence: A copy of the transcript designation form filed on the trial court docket, regarding a previously ordered and docketed transcript, which is being filed as correspondence with the appellate court at the instruction of the appellate clerk.. Date of service: 05/07/2015 [9529007] [14-17501] (MLT) [Entered: 05/07/2015 12:39 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028430952 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew L. Tuccillo for Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. [10149773] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The parties’ joint motion for amendment of the time schedule is construed as a motion to stay appellate proceedings. Construed as such the motion is granted in part. This appeal is stayed until June 30, 2015. On or before the expiration of the stay, the appellant shall order the transcript, or file a status report and a motion for appropriate relief. If the appellant orders the transcripts, the court reporter(s) shall file the transcripts with the district court July 30, 2015. Counsel for appellant shall provide the appropriate court reporter(s) with a copy of this order. If the court reporter(s) file the transcripts with the district court, the opening brief shall be due August 20, 2015, the answering brief shall be due September 21, 2015, and the reply brief shall be due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [9420743] (AF) [Entered: 02/13/2015 09:51 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028426732 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Charles E. Elder for Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc.. [10147840] [14-17501] (Elder, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. See Original Entry: [35]. [10145776] (AKM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, December 15, 2016 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 2 - San Francisco CA.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [10145774] (AKM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant CHMM, LLC Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 08/15/2013. Date of service: 05/31/2013. [8649954] (AJP) [Entered: 05/31/2013 10:05 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028337023 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Kazim Acar Correspondence: Regarding Availability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 08/31/2016 [10107875] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028335312 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Tesla Motors, Inc. Correspondence: Regarding Availability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 08/30/2016 [10107152] [14-17501] (Siegel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case is being considered for the December 2016 San Francisco oral argument calendar. The exact date of your oral argument has not been determined at this time.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The following is a link to the upcoming court sessions: http://cdn.ca9.uscourts.gov/datastore/uploads/calendar/sitdates_2016.pdf.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Please review these upcoming dates immediately to determine if you have any conflicts with them. If you do have conflicts, please inform the Court within 3 days of this notice by sending a letter to the Court using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: regarding availability for oral argument).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The Court discourages motions to continue after this 3-day period.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The clerk's office takes conflict dates into consideration in scheduling oral arguments but cannot guarantee that every request will be honored. Your case will be assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Note that your case will be set for hearing in due course if it is not assigned to this calendar.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        In addition, if parties would like to discuss settlement before argument is scheduled, they should jointly request a referral to the mediation unit. Such a referral will postpone the calendaring of oral argument. All such requests must be made within 3 days of this notice by sending a letter to the Court using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation). Once the case is calendared, it is unlikely that the court will postpone argument for settlement discussions.[10106761] (AW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [29] filed by appellants. [9767076] (SD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027559749 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [29] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9762992] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027555810 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Date of service: 11/18/2015. [9761268] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027474398 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants may file an optional reply brief on or before November 18, 2015. [9725581] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [24] filed by Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc.. [9721785] (SD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew L. Tuccillo for Appellants William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Date of service: 02/11/2015. [9417571] [14-17501] (MLT) [Entered: 02/11/2015 10:19 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc. paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [24] in 1 volume. [9721142] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027456339 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [24] submitted by Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [24] submitted by Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9717610] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027454415 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc.. Date of service: 10/13/2015. [9716778] [14-17501] (Elder, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LK): Appellant’s motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due January 13, 2015. The answering brief is due February 12, 2015. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Appellant is informed that an extension of time on behalf of another parties is not permitted. Movant is reminded that any request for extension of time to file a brief should include a statement that the court reporter is not in default with regard to any designated transcripts. 9th Cir. 31-2.2(b)(7). Any subsequent motion shall contain a recital of defendant’s bail status. See 9th Cir. R. 27-8. [9320015] (SML) [Entered: 11/20/2014 09:48 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Added attorney Colin T. Roth for Tesla Motors, Inc. and Elon Musk, in case 14-17501. [9710398] (KB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027440433 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Colin Thomas Roth for Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc.. Date of service: 10/07/2015. [9710312] [14-17501] (Roth, Colin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027333615 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellees shall file an answering brief on or before October 13, 2015; appellants may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. [9663516] (SML)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew L. Tuccillo for Appellant Kazim Acar. Date of service: 02/10/2015. [9416583] [14-17501] (MLT) [Entered: 02/10/2015 02:28 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi paper copies of excerpts of record [17] in 4 volume(s). [9660893] (WWP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [17] filed by Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. [9660331] (SD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027315807 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The opening brief [17] submitted by Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [17] submitted by Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9655430] (WWP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Joint Motion for miscellaneous relief [motion to modify briefing schedule]. Date of service: 02/10/2015. [9416492] [14-17501] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 02/10/2015 by TL] (JAL) [Entered: 02/10/2015 01:53 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027313294 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Date of service: 08/20/2015. [9654008] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 02/25/2015, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9413771] (VS) [Entered: 02/09/2015 09:32 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminated Michael Goldberg for Pankaj Modi, William Landrum and Kazim Acar in 14-17501 [9637505] (KB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027274970 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Michael Goldberg from Action. Date of service: 08/06/2015 [9637398] [14-17501] (Prongay, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027184329 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027174149 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Kazim Acar status report (as required by Court order dated 02/13/2015). Date of service: 06/30/2015 [9592941] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph Palmer for Appellee USA. Date of service: 11/04/2014. [9300611] [14-30217] (JFP) [Entered: 11/04/2014 09:54 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027028613 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Correspondence: A copy of the transcript designation form filed on the trial court docket, regarding a previously ordered and docketed transcript, which is being filed as correspondence with the appellate court at the instruction of the appellate clerk.. Date of service: 05/07/2015 [9529007] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026789960 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Added attorney Matthew L. Tuccillo for Pankaj Modi and William Landrum, in case 14-17501. [9417599] (KB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026782748 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew L. Tuccillo for Appellants William Landrum and Pankaj Modi. Date of service: 02/11/2015. [9417571] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Added attorney Matthew L. Tuccillo for Kazim Acar, in case 14-17501. [9416619] (KB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed Mediation order: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 01/27/2015 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [9381050] (VS) [Entered: 01/13/2015 03:39 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026780486 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew L. Tuccillo for Appellant Kazim Acar. Date of service: 02/10/2015. [9416583] [14-17501] (Tuccillo, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/09/2015. [9376817] [14-17501] (JAL) [Entered: 01/09/2015 01:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026780308 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Joint Motion for miscellaneous relief [motion to modify briefing schedule]. Date of service: 02/10/2015. [9416492] [14-17501] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 02/10/2015 by TL] (Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026774181 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 02/25/2015, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9413771] (VS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026697893 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed Mediation order: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 01/27/2015 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [9381050] (VS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026687712 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/09/2015. [9376817] [14-17501] (Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/29/2014. Transcript ordered by 01/20/2015. Transcript due 02/17/2015. Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi opening brief due 03/30/2015. Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc. answering brief due 04/30/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9358087] (RT) [Entered: 12/22/2014 11:43 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026643899 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/29/2014. Transcript ordered by 01/20/2015. Transcript due 02/17/2015. Appellants Kazim Acar, William Landrum and Pankaj Modi opening brief due 03/30/2015. Appellees Elon Musk and Tesla Motors, Inc. answering brief due 04/30/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9358087] (RT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 459 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?