Alexander v. Nixon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Western District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-02300

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 6:39 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT adopting 20 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 10] filed by Defendant Christine W. Nixon is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff Matthew Edward Alexanders state law defamation claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature, but his state law tort claims for intentional infliction of emotional distress and false arrest/wrongful imprisonment are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/3/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christine W Nixon, RECOMMENDING that the motion be GRANTED, and that plaintiff's state law defamation claim be DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature, but that his state law tort claims for intentional infliction of emotional distress and false arrest/wrongful imprisonment be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/15/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order - James
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Motion Setting (without date)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Corrective Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Corrective Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Motion Setting (without date)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Case Management Order - Judge James
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Corrective Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?