Advanced Media Networks LLC v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00420
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2021 at 5:17 PM DT (1.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
v.
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                    Joint PROPOSED ORDER / Proposed Scheduling Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/1/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File the Joint Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline to file the Joint Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Advanced Media Networks LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/7/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/15/2015. (asw) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Crompton, Dawn) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Advanced Media Networks LLC by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Crompton, Dawn) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                  Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 14, 2015 - filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Crompton, Dawn) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susan A. Smith - filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Taylor, James) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Lennon - filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Taylor, James) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to November 13, 2015 - filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Crompton, Dawn) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 9/23/2015, answer due 10/14/2015. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Buether, Christopher M. Joe, Brian A. Carpenter, Niknaz Bukovcan, and Mark D. Perantie - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eric W. Buether, # 2 Certification of Christopher M. Joe, # 3 Certification of Brian A. Carpenter, # 4 Certification of Niknaz Bukovcan, # 5 Certification of Mark D. Perantie)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AMHC, Inc. for Advanced Media Networks LLC filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,960,074. (klc) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (klc) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1727549.) - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet)(klc) Modified on 5/26/2015 (klc). (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?