Advanced Media Networks LLC v. General Motors LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00403
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 9:07 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Brian Williams +1 302 622 4211 +1 302 656 8920 gwilliams@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
v.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Motors Company"
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
No Logo Onstar, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 ~Notice (other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Beuther, Christopher M. Joe, Brian A. Carpenter, Mark D. Perantie, and Niknaz Bukovcan - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AMHC, Inc. for Advanced Media Networks LLC filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,960,074. (mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with jury demand against General Motors Company, OnStar LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1724985.) - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-9, # 3 Exhibit 10-12, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 87 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?