Advanced Media Networks LLC v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00410
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 12:00 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Brian Williams +1 302 622 4211 +1 302 656 8920 gwilliams@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
v.
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany Geyer Lydon +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tlydon@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan Richard DeFosse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Richard DeFosse

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott W. Doyle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W. Doyle
No Logo Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Brian Williams +1 302 622 4211 +1 302 656 8920 gwilliams@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
    Joint PROPOSED ORDER / Proposed Scheduling Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/1/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
      EXHIBIT re 18 Status Report by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/1/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/29/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
        Joint STATUS REPORT by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
          Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Joint Status Report to January 29, 2016 - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            SO ORDERED - re 15 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Lift Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/23/2015. (mdb) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Stipulation
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 So Ordered
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2015, Entered: 9/5/2015 Stipulation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/10/2015. (asw) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Advanced Media Networks LLC.(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott W. Doyle and Jonathan R. DeFosse - filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Advanced Media Networks LLC by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Balick, Steven) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC on June 26, 2015, filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Beuther, Christopher M. Joe, Brian A. Carpenter, Mark D. Perantie, and Niknaz Bukovcan - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AMHC, Inc. for Advanced Media Networks LLC filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,960,074;. (sar) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Mercedes-Benz USA LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-8, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/20/2015) (sar). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2015) (sar). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/20/2015) (sar). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/20/2015) (sar). Fee Paid $400. Receipt #0311-1725521. (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?